Fleming Grain Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429041376294) was registered on 21 Aug 2014. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 336 Broadway Avenue, Palmerston North, Palmerston North, 4414 (type: registered, physical). 336 Broadway Avenue, Palmerston North, Palmerston North had been their physical address, up until 02 Mar 2018. 5000 shares are allocated to 5 shareholders who belong to 4 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 600 shares (12% of shares), namely:
Fleming, Gennavieve Waverley Ann (an individual) located at Rd 3, Rongotea postcode 4473. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 1% of all shares (50 shares); it includes
Fleming, Lorna May (an individual) - located at Rongotea. The third group of shareholders, share allotment (3750 shares, 75%) belongs to 2 entities, namely:
Fleming, Russell David, located at Palmerston North (an individual),
Fleming, Russell David, located at Palmerston North (a director). "Grain storage" (business classification I530130) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Fleming Grain Limited. The Businesscheck database was last updated on 21 Mar 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
336 Broadway Avenue, Palmerston North, Palmerston North, 4414 | Registered & physical & service | 02 Mar 2018 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Dion Russell Fleming
Rd 3, Rongotea, 4473
Address used since 24 Apr 2021
Rd 3, Palmerston North, 4473
Address used since 21 Aug 2014
Rd 3, Rongotea, 4473
Address used since 01 Sep 2017 |
Director | 21 Aug 2014 - current |
Russell David Fleming
Palmerston North, 4479
Address used since 06 Sep 2022
Rd 3, Palmerston North, 4473
Address used since 21 Aug 2014 |
Director | 21 Aug 2014 - 21 Jul 2023 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
336 Broadway Avenue, Palmerston North, Palmerston North, 4414 | Physical & registered | 20 Sep 2016 - 02 Mar 2018 |
277 Broadway Ave, Terrace End, Palmerston North, 4410 | Registered & physical | 21 Aug 2014 - 20 Sep 2016 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Fleming, Gennavieve Waverley Ann Individual |
Rd 3 Rongotea 4473 |
21 Aug 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Fleming, Lorna May Individual |
Rongotea 4479 |
21 Aug 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Fleming, Russell David Individual |
Palmerston North 4479 |
21 Aug 2014 - current |
Fleming, Russell David Director |
Palmerston North 4479 |
21 Aug 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Fleming, Dion Russell Director |
Rd 3 Rongotea 4473 |
21 Aug 2014 - current |
Lo-ke Investments Limited 336 Broadway Avenue |
|
Kylierose Limited 336 Broadway Avenue |
|
Cycling Plastic Reprocess Limited 336 Broadway Avenue |
|
Lone Sheep Investments Limited 336 Broadway Avenue |
|
Myst Holdings Limited 336 Broadway Avenue |
|
Duncan & Mary Jane Scott Trustees Limited 336 Broadway Avenue |
Central Silo Systems Limited 240 Ruahine Street |
Grainstor Limited 79 Elginshire Street |