Windfall Trustees Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429041375327) was started on 20 Aug 2014. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: Flat 4, 78 Greys Avenue, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 (type: physical, service). 4/78 Greys Avenue, Auckland Central, Auckland had been their registered address, until 25 Feb 2020. 1 share is issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 1 share (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Walker, Gregory Thomas (a director) located at Auckland Central, Auckland postcode 1010. "Trustee service" (ANZSIC K641965) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Windfall Trustees Limited. The Businesscheck database was last updated on 16 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Flat 4, 78 Greys Avenue, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Physical & service & registered | 25 Feb 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Gregory Thomas Walker
Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010
Address used since 17 Feb 2020
Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010
Address used since 15 Jan 2015 |
Director | 20 Aug 2014 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
4/78 Greys Avenue, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical | 26 Jan 2015 - 25 Feb 2020 |
23 Ferryhill Road, Epsom, Auckland, 1023 | Registered & physical | 20 Aug 2014 - 26 Jan 2015 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Walker, Gregory Thomas Director |
Auckland Central Auckland 1010 |
20 Aug 2014 - current |
Glab Trustee Limited Flat 4, 78 Greys Avenue |
|
Leuven Trustee Limited Flat 4, 78 Greys Avenue |
|
Freedom Trustee Services Limited Flat 4, 78 Greys Avenue |
|
The Massive Company Trust Level 2, Silo Theatre |
|
Fringe Auckland 2004 Trust Board Level 1, Silo Theatre |
|
The P3 Foundation 1d/68 Greys Ave |
Glab Trustee Limited Flat 4, 78 Greys Avenue |
Leuven Trustee Limited Flat 4, 78 Greys Avenue |
Freedom Trustee Services Limited Flat 4, 78 Greys Avenue |
Robert Burnes Trustee (2016) Limited Level 10 |
Jarvis Burnes Trustee Limited Level 10 |
Parker Family Trustee Company Limited Level 8 |