Tyndall Productions Nz Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429041285947) was started on 30 Jun 2014. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: Level 18, Hsbc Tower, 188 Quay Street, Auckland, 1010 (type: registered, physical). Level 18, Pricewaterhousecoopers Tower, 188 Quay Street, Auckland had been their physical address, up to 19 Feb 2021. 100 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Disney Enterprises, Inc. (an other) located at Burbank, California postcode 91521. Our database was updated on 26 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 18, Hsbc Tower, 188 Quay Street, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical & service | 19 Feb 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Paul Donovan Steinke
Los Angeles, California, 90069
Address used since 01 Aug 2018 |
Director | 01 Aug 2018 - current |
Kylie Jane Wheeler
Black Rock, Victoria, 3193
Address used since 23 Jun 2023 |
Director | 23 Jun 2023 - current |
Charles Edward Ort
Milford, Auckland, 0620
Address used since 12 Jan 2023 |
Director | 12 Jan 2023 - 23 Jun 2023 |
Timothy Giles Young
658 Church Street, Richmond, Victoria, 3121
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
650 Chapel Street, South Yarra, Victoria, 3141
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Sandringham, Victoria, 3191
Address used since 29 Jun 2015 |
Director | 29 Jun 2015 - 25 Jan 2023 |
Michael Howard Salama
Beverly Hills, California, 90211
Address used since 15 Oct 2014 |
Director | 15 Oct 2014 - 01 Aug 2018 |
Marsha Leigh Reed
Altadena, California, 91001
Address used since 30 Jun 2014 |
Director | 30 Jun 2014 - 01 Apr 2018 |
Paul Donovan Steinke
Los Angeles, California, 90069
Address used since 30 Jun 2014 |
Director | 30 Jun 2014 - 14 Oct 2014 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 18, Pricewaterhousecoopers Tower, 188 Quay Street, Auckland, 1010 | Physical & registered | 07 Aug 2018 - 19 Feb 2021 |
97 Huia Road, Point Chevalier, Auckland, 1022 | Physical & registered | 07 Oct 2014 - 07 Aug 2018 |
C/- Buddle Findlay, 188 Quay Street, Level 18, Pricewaterhousecoopers Tower, Auckland, 1010 | Physical & registered | 30 Jun 2014 - 07 Oct 2014 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Disney Enterprises, Inc. Other (Other) |
Burbank California 91521 |
30 Jun 2014 - current |
Effective Date | 11 Apr 2019 |
Name | The Walt Disney Company |
Type | Overseas Company |
Ultimate Holding Company Number | 6931540 |
Country of origin | US |
Address |
500 South Buena Vista Street Burbank, California 91521 |
Warner Bros. Features NZ Limited 97 Huia Road |
|
Dwtt Productions Limited 97 Huia Road |
|
Mtv NZ Limited 97 Huia Road |
|
Visual Productions Ff Limited 97 Huia Road |
|
Lbo Productions 97 Huia Road |
|
Washtub Productions NZ Limited 97 Huia Road |