Pandora Trustees Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429041233832) was incorporated on 19 May 2014. 4 addresses are in use by the company: 65 Clyde Road, Browns Bay, Auckland, 0630 (type: registered, service). 81 Swann Beach Road, Stanmore Bay, Whangaparaoa had been their physical address, up to 17 Aug 2022. 100 shares are allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Holgate, Jean Marion (a director) located at Browns Bay, Auckland postcode 0630. Businesscheck's data was last updated on 01 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Floor 35 Vero Centre, 48 Shortland Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Physical & service & registered | 17 Aug 2022 |
65 Clyde Road, Browns Bay, Auckland, 0630 | Registered & service | 15 Nov 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Jean Marion Holgate
Browns Bay, Auckland, 0630
Address used since 07 Nov 2023
Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010
Address used since 09 Aug 2022
Stanmore Bay, Whangaparaoa, 0932
Address used since 19 May 2014 |
Director | 19 May 2014 - current |
Brendan John Robinson
Browns Bay, Auckland, 0630
Address used since 07 Nov 2023
Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010
Address used since 09 Aug 2022
Rothesay Bay, Auckland, 0630
Address used since 21 Nov 2016 |
Director | 19 May 2014 - current |
Timothy Brian Ford Holgate
Browns Bay, Auckland, 0630
Address used since 07 Nov 2023
Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010
Address used since 09 Aug 2022
Manly, Whangaparaoa, 0930
Address used since 20 Oct 2014 |
Director | 20 Oct 2014 - current |
Brian George Holgate
Stanmore Bay, Whangaparaoa, 0932
Address used since 19 May 2014 |
Director | 19 May 2014 - 29 Sep 2019 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
81 Swann Beach Road, Stanmore Bay, Whangaparaoa, 0932 | Physical & registered | 19 May 2014 - 17 Aug 2022 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Holgate, Jean Marion Director |
Browns Bay Auckland 0630 |
19 May 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Holgate, Brian George Individual |
Stanmore Bay Whangaparaoa 0932 |
19 May 2014 - 28 Nov 2019 |
Ivaluer Limited 79 Swann Beach Road |
|
Rope & Co. Limited 79 Swann Beach Road |
|
Think Round Corners Limited 65 Swann Beach Road |
|
Metro Mowing Services Limited 64 Swann Beach Road |
|
S & M Mcdowall Enterprises Limited 64 Swann Beach Road |
|
Metro Mowing Services Central Limited 64 Swann Beach Road |