Vip Trustee Services No. 5 Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429041233641) was registered on 13 May 2014. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: Level 1, 45 Heaton Street, Timaru, 7910 (type: registered, physical). 5/45 Heaton Street, Timaru had been their physical address, until 15 Feb 2019. 60 shares are allotted to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 20 shares (33.33% of shares), namely:
Harwood, Samuel Brian (a director) located at Pleasant Point, Pleasant Point postcode 7903. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 33.33% of all shares (exactly 20 shares); it includes
Drummond, Steven Basil (a director) - located at Pleasant Point, Pleasant Point. The 3rd group of shareholders, share allocation (20 shares, 33.33%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Caswell, Shona Denise, located at Rd 5, Timaru (a director). Businesscheck's database was updated on 05 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 1, 45 Heaton Street, Timaru, 7910 | Registered & physical & service | 15 Feb 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Steven Basil Drummond
Pleasant Point, Pleasant Point, 7903
Address used since 13 May 2014 |
Director | 13 May 2014 - current |
Samuel Brian Harwood
Pleasant Point, Pleasant Point, 7903
Address used since 01 Apr 2018 |
Director | 01 Apr 2018 - current |
Shona Denise Caswell
Rd 5, Timaru, 7975
Address used since 01 Apr 2018 |
Director | 01 Apr 2018 - current |
Tanya Frances Flett
Marchwiel, Timaru, 7910
Address used since 01 Apr 2019 |
Director | 01 Apr 2019 - current |
Ronald Grant Taylor
Gleniti, Timaru, 7910
Address used since 13 May 2014 |
Director | 13 May 2014 - 31 Mar 2018 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
5/45 Heaton Street, Timaru, 7910 | Physical & registered | 11 Dec 2017 - 15 Feb 2019 |
100 Sophia Street, Timaru, Timaru, 7910 | Physical & registered | 13 May 2014 - 11 Dec 2017 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Harwood, Samuel Brian Director |
Pleasant Point Pleasant Point 7903 |
06 Jul 2018 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Drummond, Steven Basil Director |
Pleasant Point Pleasant Point 7903 |
13 May 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Caswell, Shona Denise Director |
Rd 5 Timaru 7975 |
06 Jul 2018 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Taylor, Ronald Grant Individual |
Gleniti Timaru 7910 |
13 May 2014 - 06 Jul 2018 |
Adapt Data Solutions Limited 5/45 Heaton Street |
|
Kieran Chamberlain Building Limited 5/45 Heaton Street |
|
Living Developers Limited 5/45 Heaton Street |
|
Burnlea Holdings Limited 5/45 Heaton Street |
|
Adapt Solutions Limited 5/45 Heaton Street |
|
Baxter Farms Limited 5/45 Heaton Street |