Word Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429041201480) was registered on 24 Apr 2014. 7 addresess are currently in use by the company: 5 Jackson Street, Island Bay, Wellington, 6023 (type: registered, service). 37 Forres Street, Seatoun, Wellington had been their physical address, up to 06 Nov 2015. 1 share is allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 1 share (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Burgess, Ashley (a director) located at Albert Town, Wanaka postcode 9305. "Sporting club or association - community sport nec" (business classification R911258) is the category the ABS issued Word Limited. Our database was last updated on 20 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
146 Darlington Road, Miramar, Wellington, 6022 | Physical & registered & service | 06 Nov 2015 |
146 Darlington Road, Miramar, Wellington, 6022 | Postal & office & delivery | 07 Oct 2019 |
5 Jackson Street, Island Bay, Wellington, 6023 | Registered & service | 07 Nov 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Ashley Peters
Albert Town, Wanaka, 9305
Address used since 01 Oct 2020
Miramar, Wellington, 6022
Address used since 29 Oct 2015 |
Director | 24 Apr 2014 - current |
Ashley Burgess
Miramar, Wellington, 6022
Address used since 29 Oct 2015 |
Director | 24 Apr 2014 - current |
Mandy Jane Hancock
Wadestown, Wellington, 6012
Address used since 01 Apr 2018 |
Director | 01 Apr 2018 - current |
Stephen Reid
Crofton Downs, Wellington, 6035
Address used since 01 Apr 2018 |
Director | 01 Apr 2018 - 20 Sep 2022 |
Rowan Hannah
Glenside, Wellington, 6037
Address used since 01 Apr 2018 |
Director | 01 Apr 2018 - 20 Sep 2022 |
Amanda Jane Hancock
Wadestown, Wellington, 6012
Address used since 01 Apr 2018 |
Director | 01 Apr 2018 - 30 Sep 2019 |
Wendy Pannett
Seatoun, Wellington, 6022
Address used since 01 Apr 2018 |
Director | 01 Apr 2018 - 31 Mar 2019 |
Paul Smith
Karori, Wellington, 6012
Address used since 01 Apr 2018 |
Director | 01 Apr 2018 - 31 Mar 2019 |
Mandy Hancock
Wadestown, Wellington, 6012
Address used since 22 May 2014 |
Director | 22 May 2014 - 30 Oct 2017 |
146 Darlington Road , Miramar , Wellington , 6022 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
37 Forres Street, Seatoun, Wellington, 6022 | Physical & registered | 24 Apr 2014 - 06 Nov 2015 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Burgess, Ashley Director |
Albert Town Wanaka 9305 |
24 Apr 2014 - current |
Banzona Music Limited 145 Totara Road |
|
Platinum Business Services Limited 1 Greenview Way |
|
Willow M&j Limited 173 Darlington Road6022 |
|
P & B Clark Trustee Limited 177 Darlington Road |
|
Capital Inline Hockey Club (incorporated) 157 Totara Road |
|
Moggey Limited 165 Darlington Road |
Kelly Sports Mt Wellington Limited Ground Floor, 271-277 Willis Street |
Tranzformus Limited 34c Paremata Crescent |
Karaka Club Limited 372 Blackbridge Road |
Next 90 Limited 310 Harbourside Drive |
Ievent Limited 24 Stephen Avenue |
City Leegar Limited 198 Dominion Road |