Tencent Travel Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429041084540) was incorporated on 07 Feb 2014. 4 addresses are currently in use by the company: 286A St Heliers Bay Road, St Heliers, Auckland, 1071 (type: registered, physical). 11 Haigh Access Road, Rd 4, Auckland had been their registered address, up to 21 Nov 2022. 100 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 20 shares (20% of shares), namely:
Wan, Na (an individual) located at St Heliers, Auckland postcode 1071. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 80% of all shares (exactly 80 shares); it includes
Zheng, Gang (a director) - located at Newmarket, Auckland. "Internet retailing" (ANZSIC G431050) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Tencent Travel Limited. Our information was updated on 05 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Flat 36,118 Broadway, Auckalnd, 1023 | Other (Address For Share Register) & shareregister (Address For Share Register) | 12 Nov 2022 |
286a St Heliers Bay Road, St Heliers, Auckland, 1071 | Registered & physical & service | 21 Nov 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Gang Zheng
Broadway Newmarket, Auckland, 1023
Address used since 12 Nov 2022
Browns Bay, Auckland, 0630
Address used since 26 May 2021 |
Director | 26 May 2021 - current |
Na Wan
Browns Bay, Auckland, 0630
Address used since 22 Sep 2015 |
Director | 07 Feb 2014 - 27 May 2021 |
6 Malters Place , Brownsbay Bay , Auckland , 0630 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
11 Haigh Access Road, Rd 4, Auckland, 0794 | Registered | 27 May 2022 - 21 Nov 2022 |
118 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 | Physical | 27 May 2022 - 21 Nov 2022 |
6 Malters Place, Brownsbay Bay, Auckland, 0630 | Physical & registered | 09 Oct 2015 - 27 May 2022 |
647 Beach Road, Rothesay Bay, Auckland, 0630 | Physical & registered | 17 Feb 2015 - 09 Oct 2015 |
29b Stewart Road, Mount Albert, Auckland, 1025 | Registered & physical | 07 Feb 2014 - 17 Feb 2015 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wan, Na Individual |
St Heliers Auckland 1071 |
12 Nov 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Zheng, Gang Director |
Newmarket Auckland 1023 |
27 May 2021 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wan, Na Individual |
Newmarket Auckland 1023 |
22 Oct 2021 - 13 Jun 2022 |
Wan, Na Individual |
Browns Bay Auckland 0630 |
07 Feb 2014 - 27 May 2021 |
J & R Woodriffe Limited 8 Malters Place |
|
Auckland Data Limited 8 Malters Place |
|
John Woodriffe Electrical Limited 8 Malters Place |
|
Carlisle Laboratories Limited 9 Helvetia Drive |
|
Chen Guang Investment Limited 13 Helvetia Drive |
|
Garner Developments Limited 29 Malters Place |
Socool NZ Limited 32 Helvetia Drive |
Metalspear Enterprises Limited 41 Landvale Court |
Global Vision NZ Private Limited 59a Oaktree Avenue |
Vista Global Trading Limited 523 East Coast Road |
Ideaful Limited 84 Killybegs Drive |
Decor Hq Limited 26 Mulroy Place |