Proat South Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429041075449) was registered on 03 Feb 2014. 4 addresses are in use by the company: 511 Frasers Road, Rd 2, Dunsandel, 7682 (type: registered, service). Level 2, 161 Burnett Street, Ashburton had been their service address, until 03 Aug 2023. Proat South Limited used more aliases, namely: Mcc Farms Limited from 29 Jan 2014 to 20 Jul 2022. 1200 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 600 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Mccallum, Hitomi (a director) located at Rd 2, Dunsandel postcode 7682. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (exactly 600 shares); it includes
Mccallum, Glenn James (an individual) - located at Rd 2, Dunsandel. "Milk production - dairy cattle" (ANZSIC A016020) is the classification the ABS issued to Proat South Limited. Our information was updated on 04 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 2, 161 Burnett Street, Ashburton, 7700 | Physical | 03 Feb 2014 |
134 Clutha River Road, Rd 4, Clydevale, 9274 | Registered & service | 03 Aug 2023 |
511 Frasers Road, Rd 2, Dunsandel, 7682 | Registered & service | 26 Sep 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Glenn James Mccallum
Rd 2, Dunsandel, 7682
Address used since 18 Sep 2023
Rd 4, Balclutha, 9274
Address used since 22 Sep 2021
Rd 4, Clydevale, 9274
Address used since 27 May 2021
Rd 2, Darfield, 7572
Address used since 04 Jun 2020
Rd 8, Ashburton, 7778
Address used since 01 Jun 2016
Rd 1, Darfield, 7571
Address used since 29 Jul 2019 |
Director | 03 Feb 2014 - current |
Glen James Mccallum
Rd 8, Ashburton, 7778
Address used since 01 Jun 2016 |
Director | 03 Feb 2014 - current |
Hitomi Mccallum
Rd 2, Dunsandel, 7682
Address used since 18 Sep 2023
Rd 4, Balclutha, 9274
Address used since 22 Sep 2021
Rd 4, Clydevale, 9274
Address used since 27 May 2021
Rd 2, Darfield, 7572
Address used since 04 Jun 2020
Rd 8, Ashburton, 7778
Address used since 01 Jun 2016
Rd 1, Darfield, 7571
Address used since 29 Jul 2019 |
Director | 03 Feb 2014 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 2, 161 Burnett Street, Ashburton, 7700 | Service & registered | 03 Feb 2014 - 03 Aug 2023 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mccallum, Hitomi Director |
Rd 2 Dunsandel 7682 |
03 Feb 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mccallum, Glenn James Individual |
Rd 2 Dunsandel 7682 |
08 Aug 2018 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mccallum, Glen James Director |
Rd 8 Ashburton 7778 |
03 Feb 2014 - 08 Aug 2018 |
Chris Bennett Limited Level 2, 161 Burnett Street |
|
Get Wired Electrical Limited Level 1, 161 Burnett Street |
|
Viable Agriculture Limited Level 1, 208 Havelock Street |
|
Craigellachie Group Advisory Limited Level 1, 161 Burnett Street |
|
Methven Pubs Limited Level 1, 161 Burnett Street |
|
Wilce Engineering Limited Level 2, 161 Burnett Street |
Rosewill Dairies Limited Level 2, 161 Burnett Street |
Bluerock Farm 2021 Limited Level 2, 161 Burnett Street |
Breadings Dairies Limited Level 2, 161 Burnett Street |
Farming Future Limited Level 2, 161 Burnett Street |
A K Simpson Limited Level 2, 161 Burnett Street |
Ross-shire Dairies Limited Level 2, 161 Burnett Street |