Chapel West Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429041037966) was started on 20 Dec 2013. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 234 Fairway Drive, Kamo, Whangarei 0112, Kamo, Whangarei, 0112 (type: registered, physical). 18 Church Street, Swanson, Auckland had been their registered address, up until 18 Jan 2022. 100 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Dean, Luke (an individual) located at Swanson, Auckland postcode 0612. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (exactly 50 shares); it includes
Delaney, Adria Jane (a director) - located at Swanson, Auckland. "Investment - residential property" (business classification L671150) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Chapel West Limited. Businesscheck's database was updated on 21 May 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
234 Fairway Drive, Kamo, Whangarei 0112, Kamo, Whangarei, 0112 | Registered & physical & service | 18 Jan 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Adria Jane Delaney
Kamo, Whangarei, 0110
Address used since 10 Jan 2022
Swanson, Auckland, 0612
Address used since 27 May 2015 |
Director | 20 Dec 2013 - current |
Luke Dean
Kamo, Auckland, 0612
Address used since 10 Jan 2022
Swanson, Auckland, 0612
Address used since 22 May 2015 |
Director | 22 May 2015 - current |
Emillie Delaney
Henderson, Auckland, 0614
Address used since 20 Dec 2013 |
Director | 20 Dec 2013 - 22 May 2015 |
18 Church Street , Swanson , Auckland , 0612 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
18 Church Street, Swanson, Auckland, 0612 | Registered & physical | 27 May 2015 - 18 Jan 2022 |
20 Clark Street, New Lynn, Auckland, 0600 | Physical & registered | 20 Dec 2013 - 27 May 2015 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Dean, Luke Individual |
Swanson Auckland 0612 |
12 Jun 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Delaney, Adria Jane Director |
Swanson Auckland 0612 |
20 Dec 2013 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Emillie Delaney Director |
Henderson Auckland 0614 |
20 Dec 2013 - 12 Jun 2015 |
Delaney, Emillie Individual |
Henderson Auckland 0614 |
20 Dec 2013 - 12 Jun 2015 |
Tatai Services Limited 15 Church Street |
|
Share The Love Waitakere 6 Church Street |
|
Bunratty Limited 717a Swanson Road |
|
G & K Allen Investments Limited 3a Church Street |
|
Design 180 Limited 3a Church Street |
|
Target Communications Limited 6a Church Street |
G & K Allen Investments Limited 3a Church Street |
Mpw Property Investments Limited 93 Sunnyvale Rd |
Sirous Property Limited 471 Swanson Road |
Dhilon Investments Limited 6 Bradnor Meadows Drive |
Dalriada Ventures Limited 29 Waitakere Road |
Wanes Investments Limited 57 Platinum Rise |