The Maples (Auckland) Limited (issued a business number of 9429041037416) was registered on 17 Dec 2013. 2 addresses are in use by the company: Level 1, The Hub, 525 Cameron Road, Tauranga, 3110 (type: registered, physical). 2 Cameron Road, Tauranga had been their physical address, up to 03 Oct 2014. 100 shares are issued to 5 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group includes 3 entities and holds 98 shares (98% of shares), namely:
Pc Stuart Trustees Limited (an entity) located at Tauranga,
Navanua, Aaron Warren (an individual) located at Pirongia, Pirongia postcode 3802,
Navanua, Petra Frances (an individual) located at Pirongia, Pirongia postcode 3802. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 1% of all shares (exactly 1 share); it includes
Navanua, Aaron Warren (a director) - located at Pirongia, Pirongia. Moving on to the next group of shareholders, share allotment (1 share, 1%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Navanua, Petra Frances, located at Pirongia, Pirongia (an individual). "Children's home operation" (business classification Q860910) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to The Maples (Auckland) Limited. Our information was updated on 02 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 1, The Hub, 525 Cameron Road, Tauranga, 3110 | Registered & physical & service | 03 Oct 2014 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Aaron Warren Navanua
Pirongia, Pirongia, 3802
Address used since 16 Feb 2017 |
Director | 09 Jul 2014 - current |
Petra Frances Navanua
Pirongia, Pirongia, 3802
Address used since 21 Mar 2019 |
Director | 21 Mar 2019 - current |
Patrick Charles Stuart
Tauranga, 3110
Address used since 01 Jan 1970 |
Director | 17 Dec 2013 - 09 Jul 2014 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
2 Cameron Road, Tauranga, 3110 | Physical & registered | 17 Dec 2013 - 03 Oct 2014 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Pc Stuart Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036608171 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Tauranga |
03 Dec 2015 - current |
Navanua, Aaron Warren Individual |
Pirongia Pirongia 3802 |
16 Feb 2015 - current |
Navanua, Petra Frances Individual |
Pirongia Pirongia 3802 |
16 Feb 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Navanua, Aaron Warren Director |
Pirongia Pirongia 3802 |
16 Feb 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Navanua, Petra Frances Individual |
Pirongia Pirongia 3802 |
16 Feb 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Stuart, Patrick Charles Individual |
Tauranga 3110 |
17 Dec 2013 - 12 Mar 2015 |
Navanua, Filimone Individual |
Pirongia Pirongia 3802 |
12 Mar 2015 - 26 Mar 2019 |
Stuart Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036890385 Company Number: 1140209 Entity |
16 Feb 2015 - 03 Dec 2015 | |
Patrick Charles Stuart Director |
Tauranga 3110 |
17 Dec 2013 - 12 Mar 2015 |
Stuart Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036890385 Company Number: 1140209 Entity |
16 Feb 2015 - 03 Dec 2015 |
The Artgame Limited Level 1, The Hub, 525 Cameron Road |
|
Mcknight Medical Limited Level 1, The Hub, 525 Cameron Road |
|
The Maples (head Office) Limited Level 1, The Hub, 525 Cameron Road |
|
Ocean View Sports Mount Limited Level 1, The Hub, 525 Cameron Road |
|
Bdo Tauranga Limited Level 1, The Hub, 525 Cameron Road |
|
Clm Trustees (benes) Limited Level 3, 247 Cameron Road |
Virtue Tribe Trustee Limited 135 Baverstock Road |
Tender Hearts Limited 1 Campile Close |