Tunnel Hill Limited (NZBN 9429040966335) was incorporated on 23 Sep 1943. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 53-55 Manchester St, Feilding (type: physical, registered). 23000 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 22998 shares (99.99% of shares), namely:
Redmayne, Susan Emma (an individual) located at Wanganui. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 0% of all shares (exactly 1 share); it includes
Redmayne, Susan Emma (an individual) - located at Wanganui. The Businesscheck information was updated on 06 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
53-55 Manchester St, Feilding | Physical & registered & service | 01 Jul 1997 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Gaylyn Violet Redmayne
Taupo, 3330
Address used since 24 May 2016 |
Director | 24 Nov 1988 - current |
Richard Wilfrid Redmayne
Rd 11, Wanganui, 4581
Address used since 24 May 2016 |
Director | 24 Nov 1988 - current |
Susan Emma Dossor Redmayne
R.d.11, Wanganui, 4581
Address used since 24 May 2016 |
Director | 25 Dec 2002 - current |
Wilfrid Gerard Redmayne
Taupo, 3330
Address used since 24 May 2016 |
Director | 24 Nov 1988 - 26 Jul 2020 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Redmayne, Susan Emma Individual |
Wanganui |
23 Sep 1943 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Redmayne, Susan Emma Individual |
Wanganui |
23 Sep 1943 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Redmayne, Wilfred Gerard Individual |
Taupo |
23 Sep 1943 - 20 May 2021 |
Redmayne, Richard Wilfrid Individual |
Taupo |
23 Sep 1943 - 20 May 2021 |
Redmayne, Richard Wilfrid Individual |
Taupo |
23 Sep 1943 - 20 May 2021 |
Harding, Wayne Benjamin Denis Individual |
Palmerston North |
23 Sep 1943 - 20 May 2021 |
Redmayne, Richard Wilfrid Individual |
Taupo |
23 Sep 1943 - 20 May 2021 |
Redmayne, Wilfrid Gerard Individual |
Taupo |
23 Sep 1943 - 20 May 2021 |
Harding, Wayne Benjamin Denis Individual |
Palmerston North |
23 Sep 1943 - 20 May 2021 |
Harding, Wayne Benjamin Denis Individual |
Palmerston North |
23 Sep 1943 - 20 May 2021 |
Redmayne, Gaylyn Violet Individual |
Taupo |
23 Sep 1943 - 09 Nov 2015 |
Redmayne, Wilfrid G Individual |
Taupo |
23 Sep 1943 - 20 May 2021 |
Redmayne, Richard Wilfrid Individual |
Wanganui |
23 Sep 1943 - 20 May 2021 |
Redmayne, Gaylyn Violet Individual |
Taupo |
23 Sep 1943 - 09 Nov 2015 |
Robinsons Veterinary Services Limited 53-55 Manchester Street |
|
Grassmere Dairy Limited 53-55 Manchester Street |
|
Kamind Properties Limited 53-55 Manchester Street |
|
Mark Duncan Livestock Limited 53-55 Manchester Street |
|
Focal Point Hastings Limited 53- 55 Manchester Street |
|
Kensington Investments Limited 53-55 Manchester Street |