J D Cleghorn Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429040829647) was started on 24 Feb 1976. 4 addresses are currently in use by the company: Devlin Cameron & Hayes Ltd, 165 Broadway Avenue, Palmerston North, 4410 (type: office, delivery). Devlin Cameron & Hayes Ltd, 16 Victoria Avenue, Palmerston North had been their registered address, up until 07 Apr 2014. 5100 shares are allocated to 3 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 2 entities and holds 200 shares (3.92 per cent of shares), namely:
Cleghorn, Paul Michael (an individual) located at Rd 3, Woodville postcode 4999,
Dch2A Trustee Company Limited (an entity) located at 165 Broadway Avenue, Palmerston North postcode 4410. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 96.08 per cent of all shares (4900 shares); it includes
Cleghorn, John Desmond (an individual) - located at R D 3 Woodville. "Beef cattle and sheep farming" (ANZSIC A014410) is the category the ABS issued J D Cleghorn Limited. Our information was last updated on 01 May 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
165 Broadway Avenue, Palmerston North, 4410 | Registered & physical & service | 07 Apr 2014 |
Devlin Cameron & Hayes Ltd, 165 Broadway Avenue, Palmerston North, 4410 | Office | 02 Jun 2023 |
165 Broadway Avenue, Palmerston North, 4410 | Delivery | 02 Jun 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Murray Dean Cleghorn
Rd 5, Feilding, 4775
Address used since 27 Mar 2023 |
Director | 27 Mar 2023 - current |
John Desmond Cleghorn
Rd 3, Woodville, 4999
Address used since 24 Jun 1986 |
Director | 24 Jun 1986 - 12 Apr 2023 |
Valerie Jean Cleghorn
Rd3 Woodville,
Address used since 24 Jun 1986 |
Director | 24 Jun 1986 - 29 Sep 2014 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Devlin Cameron & Hayes Ltd, 16 Victoria Avenue, Palmerston North | Registered | 25 Jun 2005 - 07 Apr 2014 |
16 Victoria Ave, Palmerston North | Physical | 05 Jul 2000 - 07 Apr 2014 |
Same As Registered Office | Physical | 05 Jul 2000 - 05 Jul 2000 |
C/o J H Devlin & Associates, 16 Victoria Ave, Box 1595, Palm Nth | Registered | 20 Jun 1997 - 25 Jun 2005 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Cleghorn, Paul Michael Individual |
Rd 3 Woodville 4999 |
10 Jun 2016 - current |
Dch2a Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032363265 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
165 Broadway Avenue Palmerston North 4410 |
28 Jun 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Cleghorn, John Desmond Individual |
R D 3 Woodville |
24 Feb 1976 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Cleghorn, Valerie Jean Individual |
R D 3 Woodville |
24 Feb 1976 - 12 Jun 2015 |
Saunders, Graeme Thomas Individual |
24 Feb 1976 - 13 Jun 2011 | |
Cleghorn, Valerie Jean Individual |
R D 3 Woodville |
24 Feb 1976 - 12 Jun 2015 |
Cameron, Wayne Patrick Individual |
Palmerston North |
24 Feb 1976 - 28 Jun 2012 |
Betacraft NZ Limited 165 Broadway Avenue |
|
Hiamoe Trustee Company Limited 165 Broadway Avenue |
|
Dch4b Trustee Company Limited 165 Broadway Avenue |
|
Toad Designs Limited 165 Broadway Avenue |
|
Batchelar Centre Limited 165 Broadway Avenue |
|
Nupend Holdings Limited 165 Broadway Avenue |
Rawea Farms Limited 15 Oram Drive |
Ashhurst Agriculture Limited 38b Grove Road |
Arnold Farming Limited 76 Fergusson Street |
Duncrine Holdings Limited 269 Lethbridge Road |
Bellawood Limited 578 Mount Stewart Halcombe Road |
Fairholm Farming Limited 139 Main Street |