Pavlovich Coachlines Limited (NZBN 9429040726632) was registered on 13 May 1952. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 5 Pua Street, Westgate, Auckland, 0814 (type: registered, physical). 58B Carr Road, Mt Roskill, Auckland had been their registered address, up to 27 Oct 2022. Pavlovich Coachlines Limited used more names, namely: Pavlovich Services Limited from 21 Aug 1979 to 06 Jun 2014, Brosnan Motors Limited (13 May 1952 to 21 Aug 1979). 1827854 shares are allotted to 5 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 3 entities and holds 182785 shares (10 per cent of shares), namely:
Spear, Marisa Anne (an individual) located at St Albans, Christchurch postcode 8052,
Pavlovich, Kathryn Mary (an individual) located at Rotokauri, Hamilton postcode 3289,
Pavlovich, Alison Jane (an individual) located at Bluff Hill, Napier postcode 4110. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 2 shareholders hold 90 per cent of all shares (exactly 1645069 shares); it includes
Cadzow, Brian John (an individual) - located at Parnell, Auckland,
Pavlovich, Bernard Ivan (an individual) - located at Mount Eden, Auckland. The Businesscheck information was updated on 15 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
5 Pua Street, Westgate, Auckland, 0814 | Registered & physical & service | 27 Oct 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Bernard Ivan Pavlovich
Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024
Address used since 09 Feb 2011 |
Director | 30 May 1997 - current |
Ivan Salvadore Pavlovich
Frankton, Hamilton, 3204
Address used since 05 Feb 2010 |
Director | 28 Feb 1990 - 05 Jul 2022 |
Kathryn Pavlovich
Rd 9, Hamilton, 3289
Address used since 29 Nov 2016 |
Director | 29 Nov 2016 - 05 Jul 2022 |
Mary Lucy Pavlovich
Hamilton,
Address used since 30 May 1997 |
Director | 30 May 1997 - 16 Mar 2003 |
Jon Anders Jonson
Hamilton,
Address used since 12 Feb 1990 |
Director | 12 Feb 1990 - 30 May 1997 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
58b Carr Road, Mt Roskill, Auckland, 1440 | Registered & physical | 06 Nov 2012 - 27 Oct 2022 |
Cleland Hancox Ltd, Level 3, 18 London Street, Hamilton | Registered & physical | 19 Oct 2005 - 06 Nov 2012 |
Suite A, Chancellors Court, 26 Liverpool Street, Hamilton | Registered | 18 Mar 1999 - 19 Oct 2005 |
Wakatu House, 11 Clifton Road, Hamilton | Physical | 13 Mar 1998 - 19 Oct 2005 |
Suite A, Chancellors Court, 26 Liverpool St, Hamilton | Physical | 13 Mar 1998 - 13 Mar 1998 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Spear, Marisa Anne Individual |
St Albans Christchurch 8052 |
15 Nov 2019 - current |
Pavlovich, Kathryn Mary Individual |
Rotokauri Hamilton 3289 |
15 Nov 2019 - current |
Pavlovich, Alison Jane Individual |
Bluff Hill Napier 4110 |
15 Nov 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Cadzow, Brian John Individual |
Parnell Auckland 1052 |
03 Apr 2008 - current |
Pavlovich, Bernard Ivan Individual |
Mount Eden Auckland 1024 |
13 May 1952 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Pavlovich, Ivan Salvadore Individual |
Hamilton |
13 May 1952 - 15 Nov 2019 |
Eltan Trust Management Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033134772 Company Number: 1985104 Entity |
19 Knox Street Hamilton 3204 |
15 Feb 2016 - 07 Jul 2022 |
Pavlovich, Mary Lucy Individual |
Hamilton |
13 May 1952 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Eltan Trust Management Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033134772 Company Number: 1985104 Entity |
19 Knox Street Hamilton 3204 |
15 Feb 2016 - 07 Jul 2022 |
Eltan Trust Management Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033134772 Company Number: 1985104 Entity |
19 Knox Street Hamilton 3204 |
15 Feb 2016 - 07 Jul 2022 |
Cleland, Clive Basil Individual |
R D 6 Hamilton 3286 |
13 May 1952 - 15 Nov 2019 |
Cleland, Clive Basil Individual |
R D 6 Hamilton 3286 |
13 May 1952 - 15 Nov 2019 |
Pavlovich, Ivan Salvadore Individual |
Hamilton |
13 May 1952 - 15 Nov 2019 |
House Of Grace Co Limited 54a Carr Road |
|
House Of Grace Family Church 54a Carr Road |
|
Almanar Trust 72 Carr Road |
|
Keith Hay Homes Limited 73 Carr Road |
|
Keith Hay Enterprises Limited 73 Carr Rd |