Mangawhai Supply Stores Limited (issued a business number of 9429040711317) was registered on 03 Aug 1956. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 2/1C Molesworth Drive, Mangawhai, Mangawhai, 0505 (type: registered, physical). Shop 9, 6 Molesworth Drive, Mangawhai, Mangawhai had been their registered address, up to 10 Jul 2019. Mangawhai Supply Stores Limited used more names, namely: Mangawai Supply Stores Limited from 03 Aug 1956 to 05 Nov 1992. 9000 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 7875 shares (87.5% of shares), namely:
Markwick, Desma May (an individual) located at Mangawhai Heads, Mangawhai postcode 0505. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 12.5% of all shares (exactly 1125 shares); it includes
Markwick, Desma May (an individual) - located at Mangawhai Heads, Mangawhai. Our data was updated on 03 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
2/1c Molesworth Drive, Mangawhai, Mangawhai, 0505 | Registered & physical & service | 10 Jul 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Desma May Markwick
Mangawhai Heads, Mangawhai, 0505
Address used since 01 Mar 2012 |
Director | 15 Aug 1978 - current |
Barry George Markwick
Mangawhai, 0505
Address used since 13 Jul 2004 |
Director | 15 Aug 1978 - 01 Nov 2010 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Shop 9, 6 Molesworth Drive, Mangawhai, Mangawhai, 0505 | Registered & physical | 09 May 2013 - 10 Jul 2019 |
The Hub, Unit 9, 6 Molesworth Drive, Mangawhai, 0540 | Registered & physical | 07 Jun 2011 - 09 May 2013 |
C/-lyndsay Strong Ltd, The Hub, Unit 9, 6 Molesworth Drive, Mangawhai 0540 | Registered | 10 Jun 2010 - 07 Jun 2011 |
C/-lyndsay Strong Ltd, The Hub, Unit 9, 6 Molesworth Drive, Mangawhai9 0540 | Physical | 10 Jun 2010 - 07 Jun 2011 |
C/-lyndsay Strong Ca, The Hub, Unit 9, 6 Molesworth Drive, Mangawhai 0540 | Registered & physical | 13 Nov 2007 - 10 Jun 2010 |
Patten Brumby, 627 Te Atatu Road, Te Atatu Peninsula, Auckland | Physical & registered | 09 Nov 2005 - 13 Nov 2007 |
Pattern Brumby, 627 Te Atatu Road, Te Atatu Peninsula, Auckland | Registered & physical | 08 Nov 2005 - 09 Nov 2005 |
293 Lincoln Road, Henderson, Auckland | Physical | 30 Nov 2000 - 08 Nov 2005 |
387-391 Great North Rd, Henderson | Registered | 30 Nov 2000 - 08 Nov 2005 |
387-391 Great North Rd, Henderson | Physical | 30 Nov 2000 - 30 Nov 2000 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Markwick, Desma May Individual |
Mangawhai Heads Mangawhai 0505 |
03 Aug 1956 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Markwick, Desma May Individual |
Mangawhai Heads Mangawhai 0505 |
03 Aug 1956 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Markwick, Barry George Individual |
Mangawhai |
03 Aug 1956 - 27 May 2011 |
Frog And Kiwi Limited 1/6 Molesworth Drive |
|
Five Dogs Holdings Limited 44 Moir Street |
|
Todd The Builder Limited Flat 2, 36 Moir Street |
|
Kim Munro Design Limited 19 Molesworth Drive |
|
Jv Limited 12 Pearson Street |
|
Frigate International (nz) Limited 34 Moir Street |