Deh Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429040490779) was started on 13 Mar 1975. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: Suite 4, 188 Great South Road, Papakura, Papakura, 2110 (type: registered, physical). 123 Ormistion Road, Botany Junction, Auckland had been their registered address, until 08 Nov 2021. Deh Limited used other aliases, namely: Deh Limited from 30 Aug 2018 to 30 Aug 2018, Jesmond Construction Limited (23 May 1994 to 30 Aug 2018) and G.w. and D.e. Harris Investments Limited (15 Jul 1983 - 23 May 1994). 12000 shares are issued to 7 shareholders who belong to 5 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 2 shares (0.02 per cent of shares), namely:
Harris, Dianne Ethel (an individual) located at Orakei, Auckland postcode 1071. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 5 per cent of all shares (600 shares); it includes
Harris, Dean James (an individual) - located at Rd 1, Pukekohe. The third group of shareholders, share allocation (600 shares, 5%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Woolliams, Colin Frank, located at Rd 3, Pukekohe (an individual). The Businesscheck information was last updated on 27 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Suite 4, 188 Great South Road, Papakura, Papakura, 2110 | Registered & physical & service | 08 Nov 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Dianne Ethel Harris
Orakei, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 03 Dec 2013 |
Director | 03 Dec 2013 - current |
Gary William Harris
Orakei, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 27 Oct 2010 |
Director | 30 Mar 1981 - 03 Dec 2013 |
Dianne Ethel Harris
Orakei, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 27 Oct 2010 |
Director | 30 Mar 1981 - 15 Feb 2013 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
123 Ormistion Road, Botany Junction, Auckland, 2019 | Registered & physical | 04 Aug 2017 - 08 Nov 2021 |
16 Burrows Avenue, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Registered & physical | 05 Oct 2012 - 04 Aug 2017 |
C/- Markhams Auckland, Level 10, 203 Queen Street, Auckland, 1010 | Physical | 19 Oct 2011 - 05 Oct 2012 |
C/-markhams Mri Auckland Ltd, Level 10, Q&v Building, 203 Queen Street, Auckland | Physical | 26 Oct 2005 - 19 Oct 2011 |
5 Norrie Road, Drury, Auckland | Registered | 12 Dec 2003 - 05 Oct 2012 |
C/o G W Harris, Jesmond Road, R D 2 Drury, Auckland | Registered | 10 Oct 2001 - 12 Dec 2003 |
6th Floor, 369 Queen Street, Auckland | Physical | 13 Nov 1997 - 26 Oct 2005 |
C/- G W Harris, Jesmond Road, R D 2, Drury | Physical | 13 Nov 1997 - 13 Nov 1997 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Harris, Dianne Ethel Individual |
Orakei Auckland 1071 |
13 Mar 1975 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Harris, Dean James Individual |
Rd 1 Pukekohe 2676 |
12 Nov 2013 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Woolliams, Colin Frank Individual |
Rd 3 Pukekohe 2678 |
12 Nov 2013 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Nausbaum, Nigel Phillip Individual |
Boardman Lane, Auckland Central Auckland 1010 |
15 Feb 2013 - current |
Anderson, Wayne Derek Individual |
Saint Marys Bay Auckland 1011 |
15 Feb 2013 - current |
Harris, Dianne Ethel Individual |
Orakei Auckland 1071 |
13 Mar 1975 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Jones, Tania Maree Individual |
Waiuku Waiuku 2683 |
13 Mar 1975 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Harris, Gary William Individual |
Orakei Auckland 1071 |
13 Mar 1975 - 02 May 2014 |
Stewart, David Barry Individual |
Titirangi Auckland |
13 Mar 1975 - 18 Oct 2005 |
Harris, Gary William Individual |
Orakei Auckland 1071 |
13 Mar 1975 - 02 May 2014 |
Generation Trustees Limited Unit Gb, Botany Junction |
|
Srk Group Limited Unit 10, 123 Ormiston Road |
|
Seoul House Trading Limited Unit 12 Botany Junction |
|
Stanley Loo Limited 125 Ormiston Road |
|
Flame Pizza Limited Unit 15, 125 Ormiston Road |
|
Ormiston Surgeons Limited Ground Floor, Ormiston Hospital |