Daytona Indoor Raceway Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429040207100) was started on 23 Aug 1977. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 205 Hastings Street South, Hastings, 4122 (type: registered, physical). Staples Rodway House, 205 Hastings Street South, Hastings had been their registered address, until 24 Apr 2019. Daytona Indoor Raceway Limited used more aliases, namely: Jean House Limited from 15 May 1984 to 05 Apr 1993, Clive Motordrome Limited (23 Aug 1977 to 15 May 1984). 5000 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 1250 shares (25 per cent of shares), namely:
King, Karen Jane (an individual) located at Milson, Palmerston North postcode 4414. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 75 per cent of all shares (exactly 3750 shares); it includes
King, Stephen Ernest (an individual) - located at Milson, Palmerston North. The Businesscheck database was updated on 25 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
205 Hastings Street South, Hastings, 4122 | Registered & physical & service | 24 Apr 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Stephen Ernest King
Milson, Palmerston North, 4414
Address used since 12 Apr 2016 |
Director | 18 Apr 1990 - current |
Karen Jane King
Palmerston North, 4414
Address used since 31 Mar 2006 |
Director | 18 Apr 1990 - 08 Nov 2011 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Staples Rodway House, 205 Hastings Street South, Hastings | Registered | 07 Apr 2006 - 24 Apr 2019 |
23c Bennett Street, Palmerston North | Physical | 07 Apr 2006 - 24 Apr 2019 |
31 Washington Parade, Palmerston North | Physical | 16 Mar 2005 - 07 Apr 2006 |
C/- Ernst & Young, Chartered Accountants, Cnr Marine Parade & Vautier Str, Napier | Registered | 10 Mar 2000 - 07 Apr 2006 |
10 Parnell Heights, Palmerston North | Physical | 17 Feb 1992 - 16 Mar 2005 |
- | Physical | 17 Feb 1992 - 17 Feb 1992 |
C/- Ernst & Young, Cnr Marine Parade & Vautier Street, Napier | Registered | 05 Feb 1992 - 10 Mar 2000 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
King, Karen Jane Individual |
Milson Palmerston North 4414 |
23 Aug 1977 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
King, Stephen Ernest Individual |
Milson Palmerston North 4414 |
23 Aug 1977 - current |
Rtl Consulting Limited 205 Hastings Street South |
|
Bruce Trustee Company Limited 205 Hastings Street South |
|
Bay Rheumatology Limited 205 Hastings Street |
|
Bate Hallett Trustees (no. 4) Limited 205 Hastings Street South |
|
W & D Woodward Family Trustee Company Limited 205 Hastings Street |
|
Jrmd Trustees (bg) Limited 205 Hastings Street South |