The Scottish and Northern Investment Company Limited (NZBN 9429039998811) was started on 22 Aug 1983. 1 address is in use by the company: 8 Owens Road, Waiuku, Auckland, 2123 (type: registered, physical). 33A Caulton Street, Saint Johns, Auckland had been their registered address, up to 11 Apr 2022. 6697 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 6697 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Provenance Trustees Limited (an entity) located at Waiuku, Auckland postcode 2123. The Businesscheck information was last updated on 18 Aug 2022.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
8 Owens Road, Waiuku, Auckland, 2123 | Registered & physical | 11 Apr 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Djarne Frith Mcquillan
Saint Johns, Auckland, 1072
Address used since 06 Dec 2021 |
Director | 06 Dec 2021 - current |
Dion Michael Murphy
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 17 Mar 2020
Glendowie, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 09 Jun 1992 |
Director | 09 Jun 1992 - 06 Dec 2021 |
Robert Hendry Luke
Saint Johns, Auckland, 1072
Address used since 02 Mar 2010 |
Director | 09 Jun 1992 - 14 Oct 2013 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
33a Caulton Street, Saint Johns, Auckland, 1072 | Registered & physical | 14 Dec 2021 - 11 Apr 2022 |
Apartment Ia191 Ross, 221 Abbotts Way, Remuera, Auckland, 1050 | Registered & physical | 07 Jul 2021 - 14 Dec 2021 |
Unit 104, 10 Turua Street, St Heliers, Auckland, 1071 | Physical & registered | 12 Apr 2017 - 07 Jul 2021 |
2/27 Gillies Ave, Newmarket | Registered & physical | 31 Mar 2006 - 12 Apr 2017 |
- | Physical | 01 Aug 1996 - 01 Aug 1996 |
Level 9, Arthur Andersen Tower, 209 Queen Street, Auckland | Physical | 01 Aug 1996 - 31 Mar 2006 |
44 Anzac Avenue, Auckland | Registered | 01 Aug 1996 - 31 Mar 2006 |
130 Main Highway, Ellerslie | Registered | 11 Dec 1991 - 01 Aug 1996 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Provenance Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036634064 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Waiuku Auckland 2123 |
24 Mar 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mg Bell Individual |
Castor Bay Auckland |
24 Mar 2004 - 24 Mar 2004 |
Dm Murphy Individual |
Castor Bay Auckland |
24 Mar 2004 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Midlothian Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039990358 Company Number: 209327 Entity |
22 Aug 1983 - 09 Jun 2016 | |
Dion Michael Murphy Individual |
Glendowie Auckland |
22 Aug 1983 - 09 Jun 2016 |
Midlothian Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039990358 Company Number: 209327 Entity |
22 Aug 1983 - 09 Jun 2016 |
J & K Grocer Limited Suite 104, 10 Turua St |
|
Bexley Clinic Limited 10 Maheke Street |
|
Indian Taste (nz) Limited 3/429 Tamaki Drive |
|
Sm Global International Limited 409 Tamaki Drive |
|
Eden Wines NZ Limited 409 Tamaki Drive |
|
Eden Bistro & Bar Limited 409 Tamaki Drive |