Shotover Heliraft Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429039901323) was incorporated on 23 Nov 1984. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: Level 5, 229 Moray Place, Dunedin Central, Dunedin, 9016 (type: registered, physical). Level 5, 229 Moray Place, Dunedin had been their registered address, up until 27 Sep 2016. 1000 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 1000 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Fiordland Expeditions Limited (an entity) located at Dunedin Central, Dunedin postcode 9016. Businesscheck's information was last updated on 21 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 5, 229 Moray Place, Dunedin Central, Dunedin, 9016 | Registered & physical & service | 27 Sep 2016 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Richard Thomas Abernethy
Te Anau, 9600
Address used since 07 Sep 2015 |
Director | 29 Apr 2004 - current |
Amanda Jane Abernethy
Te Anau, 9600
Address used since 07 Sep 2015 |
Director | 29 Apr 2004 - current |
Gregory John West
Salisbury Heights 5109, Adelaide, Sa,
Address used since 29 Apr 2004
Eastwood, S A, 5112
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Eastwood, S A, 5112
Address used since 01 Jan 1970 |
Director | 29 Apr 2004 - current |
Robert Christian Eymann
R.d.1, Queenstown,
Address used since 28 Jul 1992 |
Director | 28 Jul 1992 - 29 Apr 2004 |
Roger Phillip Lanham
Otaki,
Address used since 12 Aug 1999 |
Director | 12 Aug 1999 - 26 Mar 2004 |
Gerald Alexander Hay
Queenstown,
Address used since 11 Nov 1993 |
Director | 11 Nov 1993 - 04 Jun 1999 |
Robin Samuel Anderson Chaffey
Rd2 Christchurch,
Address used since 28 Jul 1992 |
Director | 28 Jul 1992 - 11 Nov 1993 |
Robert Christian Eymann
Rd1 Queenstown,
Address used since 14 Aug 1990 |
Director | 14 Aug 1990 - 28 Jul 1992 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 5, 229 Moray Place, Dunedin, 9016 | Registered & physical | 25 Sep 2012 - 27 Sep 2016 |
Mgi Auckland Limited, Level 2, Fidelity House, 81 Carlton Gore Rd, Newmarket, Auckland | Registered & physical | 18 Jul 2008 - 25 Sep 2012 |
Mgi Wilson Eliott Limited, Level 2, Fidelity House, 81 Carton Gore Road, Newmarket, Auckland | Physical | 04 Jul 2006 - 18 Jul 2008 |
Mgi Wilson Eliott Limited, Level 2, Fidelity House, 81 Carlton Gore Rd, Newmarket, Auckland | Registered | 04 Jul 2006 - 18 Jul 2008 |
8a Waiau Court, Te Anau | Registered & physical | 03 Apr 2006 - 04 Jul 2006 |
31b Riverside Road, Frankton | Registered & physical | 06 May 2004 - 03 Apr 2006 |
C/- Colbert Cooper Ltd, 275 Oxford Street, Levin | Physical & registered | 04 Sep 2002 - 06 May 2004 |
35 Shotover Street, Queenstown | Registered | 04 Sep 1996 - 04 Sep 2002 |
Lakeland House, 34 Camp St, Queenstown | Registered | 20 Apr 1995 - 04 Sep 1996 |
- | Physical | 19 Feb 1992 - 04 Sep 2002 |
Alpine Chambers, Athol Street, Queenstown | Registered | 12 Aug 1991 - 20 Apr 1995 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Fiordland Expeditions Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037568238 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Dunedin Central Dunedin 9016 |
17 Aug 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Eymann, Robert Christian Individual |
Queenstown |
23 Nov 1984 - 17 Aug 2004 |
Lanham, Roger Phillip Individual |
Otaki |
23 Nov 1984 - 17 Aug 2004 |
Effective Date | 21 Jul 1991 |
Name | Fiordland Expeditions Limited |
Type | Ltd |
Ultimate Holding Company Number | 963136 |
Country of origin | NZ |
Innovative Health Technologies (n Z ) Limited Level 5, 229 Moray Place |
|
Farm 18 Limited Level 1, 205 Princes Street |
|
Lasered By Lynette Limited Level 1, 243 Princes Street |
|
Ben Ledi Farming Limited Level 5, 229 Moray Place |
|
Hbx Limited Level 3, 258 Stuart Street |
|
B J D Trustee Company Limited Level 7, Forsyth Barr House, The Octagon |