Wayne & Anne Thomas Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429039827005) was incorporated on 19 Jul 1985. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 7 Hakanoa Street, Huntly, 3700 (type: registered, physical). 39 Thackeray Street,, Hamilton. had been their registered address, until 02 Apr 2009. Wayne & Anne Thomas Limited used other aliases, namely: Waikato Cleaning Supplies Limited from 19 Jul 1985 to 04 Aug 2016. 10000 shares are allotted to 4 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 1 share (0.01% of shares), namely:
Thomas, Anne Maree (an individual) located at Hamilton. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 0.01% of all shares (1 share); it includes
Thomas, Mervyn Wayne (an individual) - located at Hamilton. The 3rd group of shareholders, share allocation (9998 shares, 99.98%) belongs to 2 entities, namely:
Thomas, Anne Maree, located at Hamilton (an individual),
Thomas, Mervyn Wayne, located at Hamilton (an individual). Businesscheck's database was last updated on 04 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
7 Hakanoa Street, Huntly, 3700 | Registered & physical & service | 02 Apr 2009 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Mervyn Wayne Thomas
Hamilton, Hamilton, 3200
Address used since 23 Sep 2015 |
Director | 28 Apr 2005 - current |
Anne Maree Thomas
Hamilton, Hamilton, 3200
Address used since 23 Sep 2015 |
Director | 28 Apr 2005 - current |
Avis Theodora Parker
Hamilton,
Address used since 30 May 2008 |
Director | 23 Jul 1987 - 31 Mar 2009 |
Edward George Parker
Hamilton,
Address used since 30 May 2008 |
Director | 23 Jul 1987 - 31 Mar 2009 |
Susan Mary Moir Parker
Hamilton,
Address used since 20 Jul 1987 |
Director | 20 Jul 1987 - 18 Jul 1994 |
Gregory Edward Parker
Hamilton,
Address used since 20 Jul 1987 |
Director | 20 Jul 1987 - 18 Jul 1994 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
39 Thackeray Street,, Hamilton. | Registered & physical | 01 Jul 1997 - 02 Apr 2009 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Thomas, Anne Maree Individual |
Hamilton |
31 May 2005 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Thomas, Mervyn Wayne Individual |
Hamilton |
31 May 2005 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Thomas, Anne Maree Individual |
Hamilton |
31 May 2005 - current |
Thomas, Mervyn Wayne Individual |
Hamilton |
31 May 2005 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Parker, Avis Theodora Individual |
R D 1 Hamilton |
19 Jul 1985 - 31 May 2005 |
Parker, Edward George Individual |
R D 1 Hamilton |
19 Jul 1985 - 31 May 2005 |
Parker, Egeat Individual |
P O Box 1069 Hamilton |
19 Jul 1985 - 31 May 2005 |
Porters Grassroots Limited 7 Hakanoa St |
|
Troy Garrett Painters Limited 7 Hakanoa Street |
|
O'hara Mining Limited 7 Hakanoa Street |
|
Ede Investments Limited 7 Hakanoa Street |
|
B & J Pearson 2009 Limited 7 Hakanoa Street |
|
Peter Wright Builders Limited 7 Hakanoa Street |