Curnow Realty Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429039684127) was registered on 20 Feb 1987. 5 addresess are in use by the company: 18 New Street, Nelson, Nelson, 7010 (type: postal, office). 58 Oriental Parade, Oriental Bay, Wellington had been their physical address, up to 05 Nov 2015. Curnow Realty Limited used other names, namely: Culmer Realty Limited from 31 Oct 1997 to 20 Jul 2004, R L Culmer & Associates Limited (02 Sep 1988 to 31 Oct 1997) and Estate Realties (Ponsonby) Limited (20 Feb 1987 - 02 Sep 1988). 1000 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 1000 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Curnow, Mary Teresa (an individual) located at Oneroa, Waiheke Island, Auckland postcode 1081. "Real estate agency service" (business classification L672010) is the classification the ABS issued to Curnow Realty Limited. Businesscheck's database was last updated on 27 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
18 New Street, Nelson, Nelson, 7010 | Physical & registered & service | 05 Nov 2015 |
18 New Street, Nelson, Nelson, 7010 | Postal & office & delivery | 24 Jun 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Mary Teresa Curnow
Oneroa, Waiheke Island, 1081
Address used since 28 Jun 2016 |
Director | 22 Jun 1994 - current |
Richard Leighton Culmer
Oneroa, Waiheke,
Address used since 01 Dec 1991 |
Director | 01 Dec 1991 - 22 Apr 2004 |
18 New Street , Nelson , Nelson , 7010 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
58 Oriental Parade, Oriental Bay, Wellington, 6011 | Physical & registered | 30 Jun 2014 - 05 Nov 2015 |
Level 2, 1 Woodward Street, Wellington, 6143 | Physical & registered | 15 Dec 2011 - 30 Jun 2014 |
C/- Sudburys Limited, 20 Commerce Street, Whangarei, 0110 | Registered & physical | 08 Jul 2010 - 15 Dec 2011 |
Sudburys Limited, 1st Floor, 25 Rathbone Street, Whangarei | Registered & physical | 27 Jun 2007 - 08 Jul 2010 |
Withers Tsang & Co, 23 Williamson Avenue, Ponsonby, Auckland | Registered | 21 Dec 1999 - 27 Jun 2007 |
Withers Tsang & Co Limited, 23 Williamson Avenue, Ponsonby, Auckland | Physical | 20 Dec 1999 - 27 Jun 2007 |
Sudbury's Ltd, 1st Floor Michael Hill Building, 25 Rathbone Street, Whangarei | Physical | 20 Dec 1999 - 20 Dec 1999 |
C/- Davidson & Associates, Level 5, Elders House, 60 Khyber Pass Road, Grafton Auckland | Registered | 10 Jul 1998 - 21 Dec 1999 |
Davidson & Associates, Level 5 Elders House, 60 Khyber Pass Road, Grafton, Auckland | Physical | 10 Jul 1998 - 20 Dec 1999 |
Withers Tsang & Co, 23 Williamson Avenue, Ponsonby, Auckland | Physical | 10 Jul 1998 - 10 Jul 1998 |
7th Floor, Air New Zealand House, 1 Queen Street, Auckland | Registered | 29 Jan 1993 - 10 Jul 1998 |
Suite 1, 33 Mokoia Rd, Birkenhead, Auckland | Registered | 26 Jun 1992 - 29 Jan 1993 |
- | Physical | 19 Feb 1992 - 10 Jul 1998 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Curnow, Mary Teresa Individual |
Oneroa, Waiheke Island Auckland 1081 |
30 Jun 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Culmer, Richard Leighton Individual |
Oneroa Waiheke |
30 Jun 2004 - 30 Jun 2004 |
Waiheke Property Co. Limited 18 New Street |
|
Fence It Nelson Limited Level 1 |
|
F F Rentals Limited Level 1 |
|
Ben Max Contracting Limited Level 1 |
|
Barryhoganplace Limited 18 New Street |
|
Locarno Investments Limited Level 1 |
Summit Real Estate Limited Whitby House, Level 3, 7 Alma Street |
Craig And Kellie Hamilton Real Estate Limited 54 Montgomery Square |
Team Turner 2024 Limited 315a Hardy Street |
Vining Realty Group Limited Level 1, 18 New Street |
Stevenson Limited 442 Appleby Highway |
Rebecca K Limited 29 Wallace Street |