Tungsten & Tool Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429039640819) was launched on 06 Jul 1987. 7 addresess are in use by the company: 32 Taupo Quay, Wanganui, 4500 (type: registered, service). Level 1, 4 Vinery Lane, Whangarei had been their registered address, until 10 Oct 2014. 10000 shares are issued to 18 shareholders who belong to 12 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 2 entities and holds 1998 shares (19.98 per cent of shares), namely:
Mcgaveston, Steven Andrew (an individual) located at Prebbleton, Christchurch postcode 7604,
Mcgaveston, Laura Beth (an individual) located at Prebbleton, Christchurch postcode 7604. In the second group, a total of 2 shareholders hold 19.98 per cent of all shares (1998 shares); it includes
Mcgaveston, Desmond John (an individual) - located at Rd 9, Whangarei,
Mcgareston, Theresa Anne (an individual) - located at Rd 9, Whangarei. Next there is the third group of shareholders, share allotment (1 share, 0.01%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Mcgaveston, Desmond John, located at Rd 9, Whangarei (an individual). Businesscheck's data was last updated on 03 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
32 Taupo Quay, Wanganui, Wanganui, 4500 | Records & other (Address For Share Register) & shareregister | 02 Oct 2014 |
32 Taupo Quay, Wanganui, 4500 | Physical & registered & service | 10 Oct 2014 |
32 Taupo Quay, Wanganui, 4500 | Registered & service | 13 Oct 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Desmond John Mcgaveston
Rd 9, Whangarei, 0179
Address used since 11 Jun 2018 |
Director | 11 Jun 2018 - current |
Steven Andrew Mcgaveston
Prebbleton, Christchurch, 7604
Address used since 12 Oct 2022
Rd 6, Whangarei, 0176
Address used since 11 Jun 2018 |
Director | 11 Jun 2018 - current |
Michael Glen Mcgaveston
Maunu, Whangarei, 0110
Address used since 11 Jun 2018 |
Director | 11 Jun 2018 - current |
Susan Elizabeth Mcgaveston
Whangarei, 0110
Address used since 09 Sep 2015 |
Director | 11 Jul 1991 - 11 Jun 2018 |
Michael James Mcgaveston
Whangarei, 0110
Address used since 09 Sep 2015 |
Director | 11 Jul 1991 - 11 Jun 2018 |
John Plant Mcgaveston
Whangarei,
Address used since 11 Jul 1991 |
Director | 11 Jul 1991 - 31 Mar 2004 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 1, 4 Vinery Lane, Whangarei | Registered & physical | 09 Apr 2009 - 10 Oct 2014 |
16 Maunu Rd, Whangarei | Registered & physical | 18 Oct 2006 - 09 Apr 2009 |
7 Maunu Road, Whangarei | Physical | 10 Nov 1997 - 18 Oct 2006 |
7 Maunu Rd, Whangarei | Registered | 19 May 1997 - 18 Oct 2006 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mcgaveston, Steven Andrew Individual |
Prebbleton Christchurch 7604 |
07 Jul 2014 - current |
Mcgaveston, Laura Beth Individual |
Prebbleton Christchurch 7604 |
07 Jul 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mcgaveston, Desmond John Individual |
Rd 9 Whangarei 0179 |
07 Jul 2014 - current |
Mcgareston, Theresa Anne Individual |
Rd 9 Whangarei 0179 |
07 Jul 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mcgaveston, Desmond John Individual |
Rd 9 Whangarei 0179 |
07 Jul 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mcgaveston, Laura Beth Individual |
Prebbleton Christchurch 7604 |
07 Jul 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mcgareston, Theresa Anne Individual |
Rd 9 Whangarei 0179 |
07 Jul 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mcgaveston, Roxanna Mary Individual |
Maunu Whangarei 0110 |
07 Jul 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mcgaveston, Steven Andrew Individual |
Prebbleton Christchurch 7604 |
07 Jul 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mcgaveston, Susan Elizabeth Individual |
Whangarei 0110 |
18 Oct 2016 - current |
Susan Elizabeth Mcgaveston Director |
Whangarei 0110 |
18 Oct 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mcgaveston, Michael Glen Individual |
Maunu Whangarei 0110 |
07 Jul 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mcgaveston, Michael Glen Individual |
Maunu Whangarei 0110 |
07 Jul 2014 - current |
Mcgaveston, Roxanna Mary Individual |
Maunu Whangarei 0110 |
07 Jul 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mcgaveston, Michael James Individual |
Whangarei |
06 Jul 1987 - current |
Mcgaveston, Susan Elizabeth Individual |
Whangarei 0110 |
18 Oct 2016 - current |
Susan Elizabeth Mcgaveston Director |
Whangarei 0110 |
18 Oct 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mcgaveston, Michael James Individual |
Whangarei |
06 Jul 1987 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mcgaveston, Elizabeth Susan Individual |
Whangarei |
06 Jul 1987 - 18 Oct 2016 |
Mcgaveston, John Plant Individual |
Whangarei |
06 Jul 1987 - 28 Oct 2004 |
Mcintosh Family Trustee Limited 32 Taupo Quay |
|
Wibstone Limited 32 Taupo Quay |
|
Huntingdale Lodge 2012 Limited 32 Taupo Quay |
|
Urban Effects Limited 32 Taupo Quay |
|
Gok Limited 32 Taupo Quay |
|
Townsend Construction Limited 32 Taupo Quay |