Pavilion Enterprises Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429039574305) was registered on 20 Jul 1987. 1 address is in use by the company: 222 Dairy Flat Highway, Albany, Auckland, 0632 (type: physical, registered). 222 Main Road, Albany, Auckland had been their physical address, until 15 Oct 2012. Pavilion Enterprises Limited used more aliases, namely: Roslyn Holdings Limited from 20 Jul 1987 to 22 Jun 2007. 1000 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 999 shares (99.9% of shares), namely:
Sarah Macmillan (an individual) located at One Tree Hill, Auckland postcode 1061. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 0.1% of all shares (1 share); it includes
Anthony Macmillan (an individual) - located at One Tree Hill, Auckland. Our information was last updated on 22 Sep 2020.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
222 Dairy Flat Highway, Albany, Auckland, 0632 | Physical & registered | 15 Oct 2012 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Sarah Jane Macmillan
One Tree Hill, Auckland, 1061
Address used since 12 Oct 2009 |
Director | 22 Jun 2007 - current |
Anthony Edward Faed Macmillan
One Tree Hill, Auckland, 1061
Address used since 12 Jul 2015 |
Director | 12 Jul 2015 - current |
Stuart Alexander Comber
St Marys Bay, Auckland,
Address used since 20 Jul 1987 |
Director | 20 Jul 1987 - 22 Jun 2007 |
Quentin Neil Oram Macmillan
Parnell, Auckland,
Address used since 20 Jul 1987 |
Director | 20 Jul 1987 - 22 Jun 2007 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
222 Main Road, Albany, Auckland | Physical & registered | 16 Oct 2007 - 15 Oct 2012 |
1b/104b Gladstone Road, Panmure, Auckland | Registered & physical | 09 Feb 2005 - 16 Oct 2007 |
52a Brighton Road, Parnell, Auckland | Physical | 01 Jul 1997 - 09 Feb 2005 |
22 Domett Ave, Epsom, Auckland 3 | Registered | 12 Nov 1993 - 09 Feb 2005 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Sarah Jane Macmillan Individual |
One Tree Hill Auckland 1061 |
20 Jul 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Anthony Edward Faed Macmillan Individual |
One Tree Hill Auckland 1061 |
29 Oct 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Stuart Alexander Comber Individual |
Devonport Auckland |
20 Jul 1987 - 14 Dec 2004 |
Stuart Alexander Comber Individual |
St Marys Bay Auckland |
14 Dec 2004 - 14 Dec 2004 |
Quentin Neil Oram Macmillan Individual |
Parnell Auckland |
20 Jul 1987 - 14 Dec 2004 |
Quentin Neil Oram Macmillan Individual |
Parnell Auckland |
14 Dec 2004 - 14 Dec 2004 |
P R Hooton Individual |
Epsom Auckland |
20 Jul 1987 - 14 Dec 2004 |
About Fire (nz) Limited 222 Dairy Flat Highway |
|
Exempt Bloodstock Limited 222 Dairy Flat Highway |
|
Rand Rescue 2013 Limited 222 Dairy Flat Highway |
|
Kdc Enterprises Limited 222 Dairy Flat Highway |
|
Employers Assistance Limited 222 Dairy Flat Highway |
|
Tough Guard NZ Limited 222 Dairy Flat Highway |