Engineering Geology Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429039497291) was started on 29 Feb 1988. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: Unit 7C, 331 Rosedale Road, Albany, Auckland, 0632 (type: registered, physical). Unit 7C, 331 Rosedale Road, Albany, Auckland had been their registered address, up to 27 Jul 2022. 1000 shares are allocated to 10 shareholders who belong to 6 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 283 shares (28.3 per cent of shares), namely:
Torvelainen Holdings Limited (an entity) located at Newmarket, Auckland postcode 1023. In the second group, a total of 3 shareholders hold 9.6 per cent of all shares (96 shares); it includes
Dht (2018) 6 Limited (an entity) - located at Albany, North Shore City,
Wei, Na (an individual) - located at Albany, Auckland,
Carter, Paul (an individual) - located at Birkdale, Auckland. Moving on to the third group of shareholders, share allocation (96 shares, 9.6%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Lorier-May, David, located at Albany, Auckland (an individual). Businesscheck's information was last updated on 07 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Unit 7c, 331 Rosedale Road, Albany, Auckland, 0632 | Registered & physical & service | 27 Jul 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Trevor Matuschka
Rd 2, Waimauku, 0882
Address used since 13 Mar 2010
Rd2, Waimauku, 0882
Address used since 01 May 2020 |
Director | 21 Jul 1989 - current |
Eric Petteri Torvelainen
Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024
Address used since 30 May 2022 |
Director | 30 May 2022 - current |
Anthony Fairclough
Rd 2, Wainui, 0992
Address used since 01 Feb 2024 |
Director | 01 Feb 2024 - 01 Feb 2024 |
Rambod Amigh
Unsworth Heights, Auckland, 0632
Address used since 01 Apr 2014
Albany, Auckland, 0632
Address used since 01 May 2020 |
Director | 01 Apr 2014 - 09 Nov 2021 |
Jeremy Yeats
Browns Bay, Auckland, 0630
Address used since 21 Apr 2006 |
Director | 21 Apr 2006 - 31 Dec 2019 |
Christopher Pym Gulliver
Campbells Bay, Auckland, 0630
Address used since 21 Jul 1989 |
Director | 21 Jul 1989 - 01 Apr 2014 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Unit 7c, 331 Rosedale Road, Albany, Auckland | Registered & physical | 17 Mar 2004 - 27 Jul 2022 |
2 Esmonde Road, Takapuna, Auckland | Physical | 09 Mar 1998 - 17 Mar 2004 |
2 Esmonde Road, Takapuna, Auckland | Registered | 23 Jun 1997 - 17 Mar 2004 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Torvelainen Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429047859173 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Newmarket Auckland 1023 |
02 Apr 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Dht (2018) 6 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429047071056 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Albany North Shore City 0632 |
28 Jul 2020 - current |
Wei, Na Individual |
Albany Auckland 0632 |
28 Jul 2020 - current |
Carter, Paul Individual |
Birkdale Auckland 0626 |
02 Apr 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Lorier-may, David Individual |
Albany Auckland 0632 |
02 Apr 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Fairclough Geotechnical Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429051671587 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Takapuna Auckland 0622 |
20 Feb 2024 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Cbca Trustees (matuschka) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429048806725 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Takapuna North Shore City 0622 |
19 Apr 2021 - current |
Matuschka, Linda May Individual |
Rd 2 Waimauku 0882 |
29 Feb 1988 - current |
Matuschka, Trevor Individual |
Rd 2 Waimauku 0882 |
29 Feb 1988 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Matuschka, Trevor Individual |
Rd 2 Waimauku 0882 |
29 Feb 1988 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Dht (2017) 8 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429046354846 Company Number: 6444215 Entity |
24 Sep 2018 - 02 Apr 2020 | |
Wu, Muyu Individual |
Albany Auckland 0632 |
02 Apr 2020 - 14 Aug 2022 |
Amigh, Rambod Individual |
Albany Auckland 0632 |
24 Apr 2014 - 07 Jul 2022 |
Amigh, Rambod Individual |
Albany Auckland 0632 |
24 Apr 2014 - 07 Jul 2022 |
O'toole, Patrick John Individual |
Takapuna Auckland 0622 |
29 Feb 1988 - 19 Apr 2021 |
O'toole, Patrick John Individual |
Takapuna Auckland 0622 |
29 Feb 1988 - 19 Apr 2021 |
Yeats, Jeremy Individual |
Browns Bay Auckland 0630 |
13 Mar 2007 - 02 Apr 2020 |
Yeats, Jeremy Individual |
Browns Bay Auckland 0630 |
13 Mar 2007 - 02 Apr 2020 |
Gulliver, Christopher Pym Individual |
Campbells Bay Auckland 0630 |
29 Feb 1988 - 24 Apr 2014 |
Dht (2018) 2 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429046705327 Company Number: 6796213 Entity |
17 Jun 2019 - 07 Jul 2022 | |
Chiou, Biebie Individual |
Albany Auckland 0632 |
08 Apr 2016 - 07 Jul 2022 |
Gulliver, Christopher Pym Individual |
Campbells Bay Auckland 0630 |
29 Feb 1988 - 24 Apr 2014 |
Dht (2018) 2 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429046705327 Company Number: 6796213 Entity |
Albany North Shore City 0632 |
17 Jun 2019 - 07 Jul 2022 |
Dht (2018) 2 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429046705327 Company Number: 6796213 Entity |
Albany North Shore City 0632 |
17 Jun 2019 - 07 Jul 2022 |
Chiou, Biebie Individual |
Albany Auckland 0632 |
08 Apr 2016 - 07 Jul 2022 |
Chiou, Biebie Individual |
Albany Auckland 0632 |
08 Apr 2016 - 07 Jul 2022 |
Yeats, Susan Marjorie Individual |
Browns Bay Auckland 0630 |
13 Mar 2007 - 02 Apr 2020 |
Dht (2017) 8 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429046354846 Company Number: 6444215 Entity |
Albany Auckland 0632 |
24 Sep 2018 - 02 Apr 2020 |
Yeats, Jeremy Individual |
Browns Bay Auckland 0630 |
13 Mar 2007 - 02 Apr 2020 |
Yeats, Susan Marjorie Individual |
Browns Bay Auckland 0630 |
13 Mar 2007 - 02 Apr 2020 |
Gulliver, Marilyn Helen Individual |
Campbells Bay Auckland 0630 |
29 Feb 1988 - 24 Apr 2014 |
O'toole, Patrick John Individual |
Takapuna Auckland 0622 |
29 Feb 1988 - 19 Apr 2021 |
Phoenix Flooring Specialists Limited Unit 7a |
|
Trade Professionals NZ Limited Unit 7a, 331 Rosedale Road |
|
Dht (2013) 5 Limited 331 Rosedale Road |
|
Workotel Limited Unit 7a |
|
Aeds New Zealand Limited Unit 7a, 331 Rosedale Road |
|
Iridium-technology Limited Unit 7a |