Treffers Holdings Limited (issued a business number of 9429039459978) was registered on 27 May 1988. 4 addresses are in use by the company: 6 Marama Crescent, Mount Pleasant, Christchurch, 8081 (type: registered, service). C/-Searell & Co Ltd, Level 1, 148 Victoria Street, Christchurch had been their registered address, up until 22 Jun 2009. 1000 shares are allotted to 4 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 2 entities and holds 500 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Atkinson, Deborah Erin (a director) located at Mount Pleasant, Christchurch postcode 8081,
Brown, David Kenneth (an individual) located at Halswell, Christchurch postcode 8025. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 2 shareholders hold 50% of all shares (exactly 500 shares); it includes
Atkinson, Ivan Rennell (an individual) - located at Christchurch Central, Christchurch,
Brown, David Kenneth (an individual) - located at Halswell, Christchurch. The Businesscheck information was updated on 17 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
918 Colombo Street, Christchurch | Registered & physical & service | 22 Jun 2009 |
6 Marama Crescent, Mount Pleasant, Christchurch, 8081 | Registered & service | 27 Jul 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Deborah Erin Atkinson
Mount Pleasant, Christchurch, 8081
Address used since 24 Jul 2023 |
Director | 24 Jul 2023 - current |
Ivan Rennell Atkinson
Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8013
Address used since 29 Aug 2018
Christchurch, New Zealand, 8022
Address used since 13 Jul 2015 |
Director | 22 Mar 1993 - 25 Jul 2023 |
John Anthony Wheelans
Christchurch,
Address used since 20 May 1994 |
Director | 20 May 1994 - 19 Mar 1999 |
Wilhelmus Johannes Maria Van Schaijik
Christchurch,
Address used since 01 Jul 1990 |
Director | 01 Jul 1990 - 20 May 1994 |
David Kenneth Brown
Christchurch,
Address used since 01 Jul 1990 |
Director | 01 Jul 1990 - 22 Mar 1993 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
C/-searell & Co Ltd, Level 1, 148 Victoria Street, Christchurch | Registered & physical | 02 Oct 2006 - 22 Jun 2009 |
Level 4, 728 Colombo Street, Christchurch | Physical & registered | 09 Apr 2005 - 02 Oct 2006 |
Terrace House, 4 Oxford Terrace, Christchurch | Registered | 27 May 1997 - 09 Apr 2005 |
4 Oxford Terrace, Christchurch | Physical | 27 May 1997 - 09 Apr 2005 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Atkinson, Deborah Erin Director |
Mount Pleasant Christchurch 8081 |
09 Aug 2023 - current |
Brown, David Kenneth Individual |
Halswell Christchurch 8025 |
27 May 1988 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Atkinson, Ivan Rennell Individual |
Christchurch Central Christchurch 8013 |
27 May 1988 - current |
Brown, David Kenneth Individual |
Halswell Christchurch 8025 |
27 May 1988 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Visser, Deborah Erin Individual |
Mount Pleasant Christchurch 8081 |
10 Oct 2006 - 09 Aug 2023 |
Major, Grant Thomas Individual |
Christchurch |
27 May 1988 - 10 Oct 2006 |
Hillat Holdings Limited 918 Colombo Street |
|
Montat Holdings Limited 918 Colombo Street |
|
Durat Holdings Limited 918 Colombo Street |
|
Trefkot Holdings Limited 918 Colombo Street |
|
Atkinson Group Limited 918 Colombo Street |
|
Sunvale Holdings Limited 918 Colombo Street |