Tricorbraun Nz Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429039425584) was registered on 12 Aug 1988. 4 addresses are currently in use by the company: 34, Apollo Drive, Mairangi Bay, Auckland, 0632 (type: physical, service). 2H, 3 Ceres Court, Albany, Auckland had been their registered address, up to 04 Aug 2015. Tricorbraun Nz Limited used other names, namely: O.r. Cormack (N.z.) Limited from 12 Aug 1988 to 14 Aug 1995. 100 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Tricorbraun Anz Pty Ltd (an other) located at Condell Park, Nsw postcode 2200. "Sales agent for manufacturer or wholesaler" (business classification F380050) is the classification the ABS issued Tricorbraun Nz Limited. Our information was updated on 27 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
34 Apollo Drive, Mairangi Bay, Auckland, 0632 | Other (Address For Share Register) & shareregister (Address For Share Register) | 27 Jul 2015 |
34, Apollo Drive, Mairangi Bay, Auckland, 0632 | Physical & service & registered | 04 Aug 2015 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Mathew Archer Croft Cormack
Wilberforce, N.s.w 2756,
Address used since 24 Sep 1994
Condell Park, 2200
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Condell Park, 2200
Address used since 01 Jan 1970 |
Director | 24 Sep 1994 - current |
Keith James Strope | Director | 01 Oct 2021 - current |
Courtney David Carruthers | Director | 01 Oct 2021 - current |
Andrew John Allsop
Surrey Hills, Vic, 3127
Address used since 25 Oct 2023 |
Director | 25 Oct 2023 - current |
Scott David Jamroz | Director | 07 May 2024 - current |
Brandi Kay Mathews | Director | 12 Sep 2022 - 07 May 2024 |
Kenneth S Kranzberg | Director | 01 Oct 2021 - 25 Oct 2023 |
Timothy Bruce Cormack
Condell Park, 2200
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Mosman, 2088
Address used since 05 Dec 2020
Bayview Nsw, 2104
Address used since 18 Jun 2008
Condell Park, 2200
Address used since 01 Jan 1970 |
Director | 24 Sep 1994 - 01 Oct 2021 |
Peter William Davis
Condell Park, 2200
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Naremburn Nsw, 2065
Address used since 04 May 2018
Condell Park, 2200
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Concord Nsw, 2137
Address used since 16 Jan 2014 |
Director | 04 Oct 2011 - 01 Oct 2021 |
Elvis Joseph Kalabric
Sylvania Nsw, 2224
Address used since 22 Jun 2016
Condell Park Nsw, 2200
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Condell Park Nsw, 2200
Address used since 01 Jan 1970 |
Director | 22 Jun 2016 - 01 Oct 2021 |
Robert Alexander Smith
15 Old Glenhaven Road, Glenhaven Nsw, 2156
Address used since 17 Nov 2014
Condell Park, 2200
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Condell Park, 2200
Address used since 01 Jan 1970 |
Director | 04 Oct 2011 - 22 Jun 2016 |
Donald Bruce Cormack
113/6 Hale Road, Mosman Nsw 2088, Australia,
Address used since 20 Apr 2010 |
Director | 01 Feb 1992 - 04 Oct 2011 |
Peter Allison
Devonport, Auckland, 0624
Address used since 01 Jul 1995 |
Director | 01 Jul 1995 - 04 Oct 2011 |
Owen Roy Cormack
Wilberforce, N.s.w. 2756, Australia,
Address used since 01 Feb 1992 |
Director | 01 Feb 1992 - 24 Sep 1994 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
2h, 3 Ceres Court, Albany, Auckland, 0632 | Registered & physical | 25 Jan 2012 - 04 Aug 2015 |
1/39 Porana Road, Takapuna, Auckland | Registered & physical | 21 Oct 1997 - 21 Oct 1997 |
Unit B, 2 Rothwell Avenue, Albany, Auckland | Physical & registered | 21 Oct 1997 - 25 Jan 2012 |
Coopers & Lybrand, Coopers & Lybrand Tower, 23-29 Albert Street, Auckland | Registered | 20 Feb 1992 - 21 Oct 1997 |
Coopers & Lybrand, Cml Centre, 157-165 Queen Street, Auckland | Registered | 23 Jan 1992 - 20 Feb 1992 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Tricorbraun Anz Pty Ltd Other (Other) |
Condell Park, Nsw 2200 |
17 Oct 2003 - current |
Effective Date | 11 Aug 1988 |
Name | Tricorbraun Inc. |
Type | American Incorporated Company |
Ultimate Holding Company Number | 91524515 |
Country of origin | US |
Delta Valves And Controls Limited Unit B, 36 Apollo Drive |
|
Iter8 Limited Unit 2, 43 Apollo Drive |
|
By's Trustee Limited Unit 2, 43 Apollo Drive |
|
Kowhai Limited Unit 2, 43 Apollo Drive |
|
Burmester Realty Limited Unit 2, 43 Apollo Drive |
|
Jelr Services Limited Unit 2, 43 Apollo Drive |
Leading Solutions NZ Limited Unit 7, 11orbit Drive |
Korbond Industries Limited 13 Orbit Drive |
Wellington Drive Sales Limited 21 Arrenway Drive |
Miter Displays Limited 25 Bellbird Rise |
Willesden Down Enterprises Limited 5 William Laurie Place |
Autoseen Accessories Limited Suite 4, 2b/1 William Pickering Drive |