Kiwi Gutter Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429039386106) was launched on 17 Jan 1989. 4 addresses are currently in use by the company: 8 Lauren Grove, Papakura, 2582 (type: service, registered). 28 Kerwyn Avenue, East Tamaki, Auckland had been their registered address, up until 17 Mar 2003. Kiwi Gutter Limited used more names, namely: Auckland Business Services Limited from 17 Mar 2014 to 04 May 2018, Superior Baby Limited (30 Mar 2012 to 17 Mar 2014) and Auckland Business Services Limited (04 May 1992 - 30 Mar 2012). 1000 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 1 share (0.1% of shares), namely:
Rolston, Alan Clive (an individual) located at Flat Bush, Manukau. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 99.9% of all shares (999 shares); it includes
Rolston, Alan C-Rht (an individual) - located at Flat Bush, Manukau. The Businesscheck database was last updated on 16 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
320 Ti Rakau Drive, East Tamaki, Auckland | Registered & physical & service | 25 Nov 2005 |
8 Lauren Grove, Papakura, Auckland, 2582 | Registered | 05 Dec 2023 |
8 Lauren Grove, Papakura, 2582 | Service | 12 Jan 2024 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Alan Clive Rolston
Papakura, Auckland, 2582
Address used since 27 Nov 2023
Flat Bush, Manukau, 2016
Address used since 01 Mar 2008 |
Director | 22 Feb 1990 - current |
David Paul Mills
Rd 1, Howick, 2571
Address used since 25 Oct 2012 |
Director | 25 Oct 2012 - 14 Jul 2014 |
Tony Neil Hayes
Somerville, Auckland, 2014
Address used since 25 Oct 2012 |
Director | 25 Oct 2012 - 14 Jul 2014 |
John Warren Stanton
Torbay,
Address used since 22 Feb 1990 |
Director | 22 Feb 1990 - 28 Feb 1993 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
28 Kerwyn Avenue, East Tamaki, Auckland | Registered | 17 Mar 2003 - 17 Mar 2003 |
Auckland Business Services Ltd, 28 Kerwyn Avenue, East Tamaki | Registered | 17 Mar 2003 - 25 Nov 2005 |
28 Kerwyn Avenue, East Tamaki, Auckland | Physical | 17 Mar 2003 - 25 Nov 2005 |
Auckland Business Services Ltd, 28 Kerwyn Avenue, East Tamaki | Physical | 14 May 2002 - 17 Mar 2003 |
John W.stanton & Assoc, First Floor, 20 Northcroft Street, Takakpuna | Physical | 01 Jul 1997 - 14 May 2002 |
John W.stanton & Assoc, Ground Floor, 11 Huron St, Takapuna | Registered | 04 May 1994 - 17 Mar 2003 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Rolston, Alan Clive Individual |
Flat Bush Manukau |
17 Jan 1989 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Rolston, Alan C-rht Individual |
Flat Bush Manukau |
17 Jan 1989 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mills, David Paul Individual |
Rd 1 Howick 2571 |
25 Oct 2012 - 14 Jul 2014 |
Construction Cost Consultants NZ Limited 320 Ti Rakau Drive |
|
Botany Chiropractors & Acupuncturists Limited Unit 4/ 320 Ti Rakau Drive |
|
Kkl Trustee Company Limited 320 Ti Rakau Drive |
|
M D Motorsports Limited 320 Ti Rakau Drive |
|
Waikopua Limited 320 Ti Rakau Drive |
|
G & R Edwards Investments Limited 320 Ti Rakau Drive |