Uniweld Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429039368256) was launched on 22 Mar 1989. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 101 Main South Road, Christchurch (type: physical, registered). Uniweld Limited used more aliases, namely: Uniweld Mufflers Limited from 22 Mar 1989 to 30 Nov 2015. 10000 shares are allocated to 4 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 500 shares (5 per cent of shares), namely:
Oneill, Grant Edward (an individual) located at Fendalton, Christchurch postcode 8014. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 5 per cent of all shares (exactly 500 shares); it includes
O'neill, Nicola Faye (an individual) - located at Fendalton, Christchurch. Next there is the 3rd group of shareholders, share allotment (9000 shares, 90%) belongs to 2 entities, namely:
O'neill, Nicola Faye, located at Fendalton, Christchurch (an individual),
O'neill, Grant Edward, located at Fendalton, Christchurch (an individual). Our information was updated on 09 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
101 Main South Road, Christchurch | Physical & registered & service | 01 Jul 1997 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Grant Edward O'neill
Fendalton, Christchurch, 8014
Address used since 29 Feb 2024
Ilam, Christchurch, 8053
Address used since 03 Mar 2016 |
Director | 15 Jun 2001 - current |
Rosalie Winnifred Oneill
Christchurch,
Address used since 01 Apr 1991 |
Director | 01 Apr 1991 - 31 May 2003 |
Anthony John O'neill
Christchurch,
Address used since 08 Apr 1991 |
Director | 08 Apr 1991 - 31 May 2003 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Oneill, Grant Edward Individual |
Fendalton Christchurch 8014 |
22 Mar 1989 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
O'neill, Nicola Faye Individual |
Fendalton Christchurch 8014 |
22 Mar 1989 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
O'neill, Nicola Faye Individual |
Fendalton Christchurch 8014 |
22 Mar 1989 - current |
O'neill, Grant Edward Individual |
Fendalton Christchurch 8014 |
22 Mar 1989 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
O'neill, Rosalie Winnifred Individual |
Christchurch |
19 Jun 2004 - 19 Jun 2004 |
Heritage Trust Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037773564 Company Number: 922803 Entity |
22 Mar 1989 - 03 Mar 2010 | |
Heritage Trust Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037773564 Company Number: 922803 Entity |
22 Mar 1989 - 03 Mar 2010 | |
Certane (nz) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037773564 Company Number: 922803 Entity |
22 Mar 1989 - 03 Mar 2010 | |
O'neill, Anthony John Individual |
Christchurch |
19 Jun 2004 - 19 Jun 2004 |
Heritage Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037773564 Company Number: 922803 Entity |
22 Mar 1989 - 03 Mar 2010 | |
Heritage Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037773564 Company Number: 922803 Entity |
22 Mar 1989 - 03 Mar 2010 | |
Sargon (nz) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037773564 Company Number: 922803 Entity |
22 Mar 1989 - 03 Mar 2010 |
Canterbury Cars (1980) Limited 97 Main South Road |
|
Vikings Swim Club Incorporated 109 Main South Road |
|
Roadways Limited 113 Main South Road |
|
Quintessential Property Management Limited Unit 5/93 Main South Road |
|
Mcc & Rmc Limited 121c Main South Road |
|
Musculoskeletal Group Incorporated 2 Craven Street |