Tookey Enterprises Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429039235633) was registered on 07 Mar 1990. 3 addresses are in use by the company: 160A Clovelly Road, Bucklands Beach, Auckland, 2012 (type: registered, service). 7 Patros Place, Bucklands Beach, Auckland had been their physical address, until 19 Jun 2017. 500 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 250 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
Tookey, Carl Wesley (an individual) located at Rd 2, Cambridge postcode 3494. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50 per cent of all shares (exactly 250 shares); it includes
Tookey, Denise May (an individual) - located at Rd 2, Cambridge. "Computer consultancy service" (ANZSIC M700010) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Tookey Enterprises Limited. Our data was updated on 17 Jan 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
2415 Maungatautari Road, Rd 2, Cambridge, 3494 | Registered & physical | 19 Jun 2017 |
160a Clovelly Road, Bucklands Beach, Auckland, 2012 | Registered & service | 01 Dec 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Carl Wesley Tookey
Rd 2, Cambridge, 3494
Address used since 11 Jun 2017 |
Director | 28 Jun 1990 - current |
Denise May Tookey
Rd 2, Cambridge, 3494
Address used since 11 Jun 2017 |
Director | 28 Jun 1990 - current |
Shane George Nelson Howe
Howick, Auckland,
Address used since 20 Apr 1990 |
Director | 20 Apr 1990 - 31 Dec 1993 |
Diane Margaret Howe
Howick, Auckland,
Address used since 20 Apr 1990 |
Director | 20 Apr 1990 - 31 Dec 1993 |
7 Patros Place , Bucklands Beach , Auckland , 2012 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
7 Patros Place, Bucklands Beach, Auckland, 2012 | Physical | 27 May 2015 - 19 Jun 2017 |
7 Patros Place, Bucklands Beach, Auckland, 2012 | Registered | 23 Sep 2014 - 19 Jun 2017 |
2304 -171 Queen St, Auckland 1001 | Physical | 01 Apr 2005 - 27 May 2015 |
2304 -171 Queen St, Auckland 1001 | Registered | 01 Apr 2005 - 23 Sep 2014 |
3 Coates Road, Howick, Auckland | Physical | 01 Jul 1997 - 01 Apr 2005 |
97-101 Hobson Street, Auckland | Registered | 06 Mar 1995 - 01 Apr 2005 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Tookey, Carl Wesley Individual |
Rd 2 Cambridge 3494 |
07 Mar 1990 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Tookey, Denise May Individual |
Rd 2 Cambridge 3494 |
07 Mar 1990 - current |
Remlap Enterprises Limited Cambridge Road |
|
Pjs Construction & Maintenance Limited 2379a State Highway 1 |
|
Lakeview Lodge Limited 263 Horahora Road |
Thirdrock Limited 618h Maungatautari Road |
Dreamspinner Limited 128 Maungakawa Road |
System Consulting Solutions Limited 49 Campbell Street |
Success Monkey Limited 6 Tiaki Way |
Smart Click Limited 180 Shakespeare Street |
Technology Consulting Limited 169 Tirau Street |