Barrock Securities Limited (issued a business number of 9429039159236) was started on 01 Nov 1990. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 17/30 Heather Street, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 (type: physical, registered). 302/100 Parnell Road, Parnell, Auckland had been their physical address, until 14 Mar 2019. Barrock Securities Limited used other aliases, namely: Chet-N Limited from 22 Mar 1995 to 28 May 2009, N-Tech Limited (07 Mar 1991 to 22 Mar 1995) and Strauss Holdings (No.71) Limited (01 Nov 1990 - 07 Mar 1991). 100 shares are allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
D. Comms Management Limited (an entity) located at Parnell, Auckland postcode 1052. Our data was updated on 10 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
17/30 Heather Street, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Physical & registered & service | 14 Mar 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Kerry Bryan Dobson
Gonville, Whanganui, 4501
Address used since 27 Oct 2023
Mount Roskill, Auckland, 1041
Address used since 22 Aug 2016 |
Director | 14 May 2013 - current |
John Anthony Reid
Trentham, Upper Hutt, 5018
Address used since 14 Jul 2023 |
Director | 14 Jul 2023 - current |
Samuel John Anton Reid
Trentham, Upper Hutt, 5018
Address used since 14 Jul 2023 |
Director | 14 Jul 2023 - current |
John Anthony Reid
Parnell, Auckland, 1052
Address used since 12 Jan 2012 |
Director | 06 Mar 1991 - 18 Jul 2013 |
Hugh Milloy
Parnell, Auckland, 1052
Address used since 17 Feb 2011 |
Director | 06 Mar 1991 - 14 Dec 2011 |
Jilnaught Wong
Remuera, Auckland,
Address used since 06 Mar 1991 |
Director | 06 Mar 1991 - 23 Oct 2001 |
Hui Ai Adriana Tong
Kumeu,
Address used since 06 Mar 1991 |
Director | 06 Mar 1991 - 21 Jul 1994 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
302/100 Parnell Road, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Physical | 20 Aug 2014 - 14 Mar 2019 |
302/100 Parnell Road, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Registered | 20 Aug 2013 - 14 Mar 2019 |
L 2, Windsor Court, 128-136 Parnell Rd, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Physical | 20 Jan 2012 - 20 Aug 2014 |
L 2, Windsor Court, 128-136 Parnell Rd, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Registered | 20 Jan 2012 - 20 Aug 2013 |
33 Bath Street, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Physical & registered | 25 Feb 2011 - 20 Jan 2012 |
Level 15, Bank Of New Zealand Tower, 125 Queen Street, Auckland | Registered | 30 Oct 2001 - 30 Oct 2001 |
Level 3, 33 Bath St, Parnell, Auckland | Registered & physical | 30 Oct 2001 - 25 Feb 2011 |
Same As Registered Office | Physical | 30 Oct 2001 - 30 Oct 2001 |
Level 17, Bank Of New Zealand Tower, 125 Queen Street, Auckland | Registered | 10 Jun 1996 - 30 Oct 2001 |
22 Fanshawe Street, Auckland | Registered | 16 Feb 1993 - 10 Jun 1996 |
- | Physical | 21 Feb 1992 - 30 Oct 2001 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
D. Comms Management Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038374319 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Parnell Auckland 1052 |
16 Oct 2009 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Milloy, Hugh Individual |
Heretaunga Upper Hutt 5018 |
01 Nov 1990 - 15 Sep 2009 |
Reid, John Anthony Individual |
33 Bath Street Parnell, Auckland |
01 Nov 1990 - 15 Sep 2009 |
E2e Ss Limited 205/100 Parnell Road |
|
Network Access Services Limited 205/100 Parnell Road |
|
Bayne Friedlander Limited 102/100 Parnell Road |
|
The Exercise Space Limited Flat G05, 100 Parnell Road |
|
Myhomeware Limited Suite 106 |
|
Film And Video Labelling Body Incorporated Level 1 |