Brierley Holdings Limited (NZBN 9429039098078) was started on 21 Jun 1991. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: Level 4, Bdo Centre, 4 Graham Street, Auckland, 1010 (type: registered, physical). 144 St Johns Road, Saint Johns, Auckland had been their physical address, up until 19 Jul 2018. Brierley Holdings Limited used other aliases, namely: Treasurysub1 Limited from 11 Oct 1999 to 27 Jul 2000, Hatchet Investments Limited (21 Jun 1991 to 11 Oct 1999). 100 shares are allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Bil Nz Treasury Limited (an entity) located at 4 Graham Street, Auckland postcode 1010. Businesscheck's data was updated on 03 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 4, Bdo Centre, 4 Graham Street, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical & service | 19 Jul 2018 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Philip Ralph Burdon
50 Carlton Mill Road, Christchurch 8001, 8014
Address used since 20 Jun 2002 |
Director | 20 Jun 2002 - current |
Cynthia Cheng
88 Castle Peak Road, Kwu Tung, Sheung Shui, N.t.,
Address used since 14 Oct 2022
Riva, 1 Ying Ho Road, Kam Tin, New Territories,
Address used since 01 Jun 2021 |
Director | 01 Jun 2021 - current |
Kah Meng Ho
#03-10, Singapore, 669559
Address used since 01 Aug 2014 |
Director | 01 Aug 2014 - 01 Jun 2021 |
Francis Brent Leigh
Saint Johns, Auckland, 1072
Address used since 29 Jun 2012 |
Director | 01 Oct 2001 - 30 Jun 2018 |
Premod Paul Thomas
Singapore, 297744
Address used since 27 Jul 2011 |
Director | 27 Jul 2011 - 01 Aug 2014 |
Andrew Chew Kwang Ming
Singapore, 416827
Address used since 20 Jul 2010 |
Director | 01 Sep 2009 - 01 Jul 2011 |
Richard Lim Kia Hee
Singapore 589473,
Address used since 01 Jul 2009 |
Director | 03 Apr 2008 - 01 Sep 2009 |
Linda Hoon Siew Kin
Singapore 276506,
Address used since 30 Nov 2006 |
Director | 30 Nov 2006 - 03 Apr 2008 |
Philip James Gunn
Singapore 286970,
Address used since 18 May 2005 |
Director | 15 Sep 2004 - 30 Nov 2006 |
Siang Chye Roch Low
Singapore 559979,
Address used since 01 Mar 2002 |
Director | 01 Mar 2002 - 15 Sep 2004 |
Peter Alexander Nicholas
Herne Bay, Auckland,
Address used since 21 Dec 2000 |
Director | 21 Dec 2000 - 30 Jun 2002 |
Andrew George Shepherd
Singapore 269887,
Address used since 20 Feb 2002 |
Director | 21 Dec 2000 - 31 Mar 2002 |
Hamish Paul Sisson
Hataitai, Wellington,
Address used since 21 Dec 2000 |
Director | 21 Dec 2000 - 31 Dec 2001 |
Arun Amarsi
Singapore 259955,
Address used since 30 Nov 1999 |
Director | 30 Nov 1999 - 12 Nov 2001 |
Mark Bradbury Horton
#17-04 The Colonnade, Singapore 249587,
Address used since 20 Jul 1994 |
Director | 20 Jul 1994 - 28 Mar 2001 |
John Morris Green
#24-06 Leonie Condotel, Singapore 239192,
Address used since 21 Dec 2000 |
Director | 21 Dec 2000 - 28 Mar 2001 |
John Anthony Payne
Khandallah, Wellington,
Address used since 30 Jun 1998 |
Director | 30 Jun 1998 - 21 Dec 2000 |
Murray Robert Weston
Thorndon, Wellington,
Address used since 30 Jun 1998 |
Director | 30 Jun 1998 - 21 Dec 2000 |
Herman Charles Rockefeller
Ngaio, Wellington,
Address used since 30 Jun 1998 |
Director | 30 Jun 1998 - 11 Apr 2000 |
Gerald Charles Gibbard
Hataitai, Wellington,
Address used since 17 Aug 1992 |
Director | 17 Aug 1992 - 30 Jun 1998 |
Paul David Collins
Barclays House, 36 Customhouse Quay, Wellington,
Address used since 17 Aug 1992 |
Director | 17 Aug 1992 - 30 Jun 1998 |
Bryan Somervell Patrick Marra
Wellington,
Address used since 17 Aug 1992 |
Director | 17 Aug 1992 - 06 Dec 1996 |
Robert Harry Matthew
Khandallah, Wellington,
Address used since 17 Aug 1992 |
Director | 17 Aug 1992 - 20 Jul 1994 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
144 St Johns Road, Saint Johns, Auckland, 1072 | Physical | 05 Jul 2013 - 19 Jul 2018 |
144 St Johns Road, Saint Johns, Auckland, 1072 | Registered | 09 Jul 2012 - 19 Jul 2018 |
Level 5, 70 Shortland Street, Auckland | Physical | 01 Dec 2005 - 05 Jul 2013 |
Level 5, 70 Shortland Street, Auckland | Registered | 01 Dec 2005 - 09 Jul 2012 |
Level 20, A.s.b. Centre, 135 Albert St, Auckland | Registered & physical | 08 Oct 2003 - 01 Dec 2005 |
Level 26, N.z.i House, 151 Queen St, Auckland | Physical | 01 Oct 2001 - 08 Oct 2003 |
Level 12, 117 Customhouse Quay, Wellington | Registered | 01 Oct 2001 - 08 Oct 2003 |
Level 12, 117 Customhouse Quay, Wellington | Physical | 01 Oct 2001 - 01 Oct 2001 |
Level 12 Colonial Building, 117 Customhouse Quay, Wellington | Physical & registered | 01 Jul 2001 - 01 Oct 2001 |
Level 28, Majestic Centre, 100 Willis Street, Wellington | Physical & registered | 13 Nov 2000 - 01 Jul 2001 |
Level 26, Majestic Centre, 100 Willis Street, Wellington | Physical | 01 Oct 1998 - 13 Nov 2000 |
Level 26, Majrstic Centre, 100 Willis Street, Wellington | Registered | 01 Oct 1998 - 13 Nov 2000 |
Level 6, 22-24 Victoria Street, Wellington | Physical | 12 Jan 1998 - 01 Oct 1998 |
Level 6, Cml Building, 22-24 Victoria Street, Wellington | Registered | 12 Jan 1998 - 01 Oct 1998 |
Level 9, Cml Building, 22-24 Victoria Street, Wellington | Registered | 01 Mar 1996 - 12 Jan 1998 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Bil NZ Treasury Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039343253 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
4 Graham Street Auckland 1010 |
21 Jun 1991 - current |
Effective Date | 15 Apr 2021 |
Name | Guoline Capital Assets Limited |
Type | Company |
Ultimate Holding Company Number | 54333 |
Country of origin | JE |
Address |
144 St Johns Road Saint Johns Auckland 1072 |
Mindworks Limited St Johns Road |
|
School To Skills Foundation 129 St Johns Road |
|
Nomad Consulting Services Limited 123 St Johns Road |
|
Staples Vaughan Limited 3 Truman Street |
|
Te Reikura Charitable Trust 1 / 130 St Johns Rd |
|
Motion Rentals Limited 29 Rutherford Terrace |