Ostend Village Pharmacy Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429039089724) was launched on 23 Sep 1991. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 9A Belgium Street, Ostend, Waiheke Island, 1081 (type: physical, service). 1000 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 567 shares (56.7 per cent of shares), namely:
Turnbull, Judy (an individual) located at Palm Beach, Waiheke Island, Auckland postcode 1081. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 43.3 per cent of all shares (433 shares); it includes
Hall, Stephen Andrew (an individual) - located at Palm Beach, Waiheke Island. Our database was last updated on 24 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
9a Belgium Street, Ostend, Waiheke Island, 1081 | Registered | 09 Oct 1991 |
9a Belgium Street, Ostend, Waiheke Island, 1081 | Physical & service | 01 Jul 1997 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Judy Turnbull
Palm Beach, Waiheke Island, Auckland, 1081
Address used since 24 Apr 2013 |
Director | 04 Jun 1998 - current |
Stephen Andrew Hall
Palm Beach, Waiheke Island, 1081
Address used since 01 May 2019 |
Director | 01 May 2019 - current |
Christine Mary Horrocks
Rd 1, Waiheke Island, 1971
Address used since 13 Aug 2012 |
Director | 01 Dec 1992 - 26 Mar 2018 |
Michael John Poland
Rd 1, Waiheke Island, 1971
Address used since 13 Aug 2012 |
Director | 10 Oct 2006 - 26 Mar 2018 |
Peter Jeffrey Ingle
Kennedy Point, Waiheke Island,
Address used since 23 Sep 1991 |
Director | 23 Sep 1991 - 30 Sep 1996 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Turnbull, Judy Individual |
Palm Beach Waiheke Island, Auckland 1081 |
23 Sep 1991 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hall, Stephen Andrew Individual |
Palm Beach Waiheke Island 1081 |
03 Apr 2018 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Alberon Trustees 2017 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429046175182 Company Number: 6304872 Entity |
19 Mar 2018 - 03 Apr 2018 | |
Poland, Michael John Individual |
Rd 1 Waiheke Island 1971 |
24 Jun 2005 - 03 Apr 2018 |
Alberon Trustees 2017 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429046175182 Company Number: 6304872 Entity |
19 Mar 2018 - 03 Apr 2018 | |
Poland, Christine Mary Individual |
Rd 1 Waiheke Island 1971 |
24 Jun 2005 - 03 Apr 2018 |
Horrocks, Christine Mary Individual |
Rd 1 Waiheke Island 1971 |
23 Sep 1991 - 03 Apr 2018 |
Poland, Michael John Individual |
Rd 1 Waiheke Island 1971 |
24 Jun 2005 - 03 Apr 2018 |
Toplis, Russell Martin Individual |
Remuera Auckland |
24 Jun 2005 - 19 Mar 2018 |
Planit Eco Store Limited 7 Belgium Street |
|
Waiheke Health Limited 5 Belgium Street |
|
Coalition For Disability Services Trust 5 Belgium Street |
|
Waiheke Linen Limited 16 Putiki Road |
|
Wylie Quixote Limited Suite 1, 2 Belgium Street |
|
Rotary Club Of Waiheke Island Incorporated C/o Harrop Hargrave |