Rocaven Downs Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429038838781) was launched on 02 Aug 1993. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 11 Tuhoro Street, Otorohanga, 3900 (type: physical, registered). 42 Moorhouse Street, Morrinsville had been their registered address, up until 27 Jul 2016. 10000 shares are allocated to 4 shareholders who belong to 4 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 8400 shares (84 per cent of shares), namely:
Bonnar, Graeme Leonard (an individual) located at Rd 1, Hamilton postcode 3281. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 6 per cent of all shares (exactly 600 shares); it includes
Bonnar, Karen (an individual) - located at Rd 1, Hamilton. The third group of shareholders, share allocation (990 shares, 9.9%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Bonnar, Diann Shirley, located at R D 1, Morrinsville (an individual). Businesscheck's data was updated on 30 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
11 Tuhoro Street, Otorohanga, 3900 | Physical & registered & service | 27 Jul 2016 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Karen Leanne Bonnar
Rd 1, Hamilton, 3281
Address used since 03 May 2022
R D 1, Hamilton, 3281
Address used since 24 May 2013 |
Director | 24 May 2013 - current |
Graeme Leonard Bonnar
Rd 1, Hamilton, 3281
Address used since 03 May 2022
R D 1, Hamilton, 3281
Address used since 24 May 2013 |
Director | 24 May 2013 - current |
Frederick Leonard Bonnar
R D 1, Morrinsville, 3371
Address used since 20 Jul 2010 |
Director | 02 Aug 1993 - 24 May 2013 |
Diann Shirley Bonnar
R D 1, Morrinsville, 3371
Address used since 20 Jul 2010 |
Director | 02 Aug 1993 - 24 May 2013 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
42 Moorhouse Street, Morrinsville, 3300 | Registered & physical | 13 Oct 2011 - 27 Jul 2016 |
Cooper Aitken & Partners Limited, 42 Moorhouse Street, Morrinsville | Registered | 14 Aug 2000 - 13 Oct 2011 |
Bannin Cooper & Partners, 42 Moorhouse Street, Morrinsville | Registered | 14 Aug 2000 - 14 Aug 2000 |
Bannin Cooper & Partners, Chartered Accountants, 41 Moorhouse Street, Morrinsville | Physical | 22 Sep 1997 - 22 Sep 1997 |
Messrs Bannin Cooper & Partners, Chartered Accountants, 41 Moorhouse Street, Morrinsville | Registered | 22 Sep 1997 - 14 Aug 2000 |
As Per Registered Office | Physical | 22 Sep 1997 - 13 Oct 2011 |
Kiwitahi Road, Rd1, Morrinsville | Physical | 30 Jul 1997 - 22 Sep 1997 |
Messrs Cave Bannin Sexton Cooper, Chartered Accountants, 41 Moorhouse Street, Morrinsville | Registered | 30 Jul 1997 - 22 Sep 1997 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Bonnar, Graeme Leonard Individual |
Rd 1 Hamilton 3281 |
02 Aug 1993 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Bonnar, Karen Individual |
Rd 1 Hamilton 3281 |
02 Aug 1993 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Bonnar, Diann Shirley Individual |
R D 1 Morrinsville 3371 |
02 Aug 1993 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Bonnar, Diann Shirley Individual |
R D 1 Morrinsville 3371 |
02 Aug 1993 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Bonnar, Frederick Leonard Individual |
R D 1 Morrinsville 3371 |
02 Aug 1993 - 26 Sep 2019 |
Bonnar, Frederick Leonard Individual |
R D 1 Morrinsville 3371 |
02 Aug 1993 - 26 Sep 2019 |
Shalimar Trustee Company Limited 11 Tuhoro Street |
|
Rangitoto Lands Limited 11 Tuhoro Street |
|
Les Young Trustee Limited 11 Tuhoro Street |
|
Cumpstone Independent Trustee Company Limited 11 Tuhoro Street |
|
North Pine Dairy Limited 11 Tuhoro Street |
|
A & L Bricklaying Limited 11 Tuhoro Street |