Fliway International Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429038697067) was registered on 19 Apr 1994. 8 addresess are in use by the company: Ground Floor, 7Wq, 7 Waterloo Quay, Wellington, 6011 (type: registered, physical). 66 Westney Road, Mangere, Auckland had been their physical address, up until 31 Mar 2022. Fliway International Limited used other names, namely: Casington Investments Limited from 19 Apr 1994 to 13 Jun 1994. 100 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Fliway Transport Limited (an entity) located at Wellington postcode 6011. "Freight brokerage service (no goods handling)" (business classification I529930) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Fliway International Limited. The Businesscheck information was updated on 24 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
66 Westney Road, Mangere, Auckland | Other (Address for Records) | 31 Jul 2008 |
66 Westeny Road, Mangere, Auckland, 2022 | Delivery & office | 09 Jul 2019 |
P O Box 73011, Auckland International Airport, Mangere, Auckland, 2022 | Postal | 09 Jul 2019 |
66 Westney Road, Mangere, Auckland, 2022 | Other (Address for Records) & records (Address for Records) | 09 Jul 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
David James Walsh
Ngaio, Wellington, 6035
Address used since 01 Mar 2022 |
Director | 01 Mar 2022 - current |
Richie James Smith
Lake Tekapo, 7945
Address used since 01 Mar 2022 |
Director | 01 Mar 2022 - current |
Rhonda Anne Richardson
Northland, Wellington, 6012
Address used since 01 Aug 2024 |
Director | 01 Aug 2024 - current |
Suzanne Maree Tindal
Tauranga, 3110
Address used since 01 Mar 2022 |
Director | 01 Mar 2022 - 30 Jun 2022 |
Sandra Fairchild
Sandringham, Victoria, 3191
Address used since 04 Jan 2018
Balwyn, Victoria, 3103
Address used since 01 Jan 1970 |
Director | 04 Jan 2018 - 01 Mar 2022 |
Kien Chon Koh
Singapore, 119522
Address used since 04 Jan 2018 |
Director | 04 Jan 2018 - 01 Mar 2022 |
Ter Chiang Cheng
Singapore, 640688
Address used since 04 Jan 2018 |
Director | 04 Jan 2018 - 01 Mar 2022 |
Duncan John Hawkesby
Glendowie, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 06 Oct 2006 |
Director | 06 Oct 2006 - 04 Jan 2018 |
Craig Hamilton John Magee
Chatswood, Auckland,
Address used since 01 Jul 2004 |
Director | 27 May 1994 - 06 Oct 2006 |
Nigel Claude Fisher
Remuera, Auckland,
Address used since 01 Jul 2004 |
Director | 28 Mar 1996 - 06 Oct 2006 |
Richard John Carson Black
Remuera, Auckland,
Address used since 27 May 1994 |
Director | 27 May 1994 - 28 Mar 1996 |
Gavin John Macdonald
Herne Bay, Auckland,
Address used since 19 Apr 1994 |
Director | 19 Apr 1994 - 27 May 1994 |
Phillip Robert Thorpe Taylor
Remuera, Auckland,
Address used since 19 Apr 1994 |
Director | 19 Apr 1994 - 27 May 1994 |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
66 Westney Road, Mangere, Auckland, 2022 | Other (Address for Records) & records (Address for Records) | 09 Jul 2019 |
Ground Floor, 7wq, 7 Waterloo Quay, Wellington, 6011 | Registered & physical & service | 31 Mar 2022 |
66 Westeny Road , Mangere , Auckland , 2022 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
66 Westney Road, Mangere, Auckland, 2022 | Physical & registered | 17 Jul 2019 - 31 Mar 2022 |
66 Westeny Road, Mangere, Auckland | Physical | 07 Aug 2008 - 17 Jul 2019 |
66 Westney Road, Mangere, Auckland | Registered | 07 Aug 2008 - 17 Jul 2019 |
Crn Tom Pearce & Geoffrey Roberts Roads, Auckland International Airport | Registered | 18 Sep 1997 - 07 Aug 2008 |
Crn Tom Pearce & Geoffrey Roberts Roads, Auckland International Airport | Physical | 01 Jul 1997 - 01 Jul 1997 |
Cnr Tom Pearce & Geoffrey Roberts Roads, Auckland International Airport | Physical | 01 Jul 1997 - 07 Aug 2008 |
Messrs Bell Gully Buddle Weir, Level 12, The Auckland Club Tower, 34 Shortland Street, Auckland | Registered | 10 Apr 1996 - 18 Sep 1997 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Fliway Transport Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032151336 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Wellington 6011 |
19 Apr 1994 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Magee, Craig Hamilton John Individual |
Birkenhead Auckland |
19 Apr 1994 - 18 Oct 2006 |
Effective Date | 28 Feb 2022 |
Name | New Zealand Post Limited |
Type | Ltd |
Ultimate Holding Company Number | 315766 |
Country of origin | NZ |
Marken New Zealand Limited 66 Westney Road |
|
Ups New Zealand Limited 66 Westney Road |
|
Green Vegetables Limited 101 Westney Road |
|
Saads Tasty Food Limited 99 Westney Road |
|
Getfresh Vege & Spices Limited 99 Westney Road |
|
Skybus NZ Limited 64 Westney Road |
NZ Baggage Movers Limited 3 Margot Street |
On Jet Logistic Limited Suite 2, 8 Rennie Drive |
Paccon Logistics New Zealand Limited Unit 2 197 Montgomerie Road |
Sea & Air Freight Shipping Limited 34 Allenby Road |
Go Air Land Sea Limited 8a Sylvia Park Road |
Sweetspot Group Limited 41 Station Road |