Kina Properties Limited (NZBN 9429038686023) was launched on 14 Oct 1993. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 29 Wallace Street, Motueka, 7120 (type: physical, registered). Milnes Beatson Limited, Chartered Accountants, 29 Wallace Street, Motueka had been their registered address, up to 05 Apr 2013. Kina Properties Limited used other names, namely: A.r. & H.y. Clark Limited from 04 Sep 1995 to 22 Mar 2004, Pakim Holdings (No. 7) Limited (14 Oct 1993 to 04 Sep 1995). 100 shares are issued to 5 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group includes 3 entities and holds 98 shares (98% of shares), namely:
Miller, Shelley Christina (a director) located at Rd 1, Upper Moutere postcode 7173,
Mbl Trustee Company No 3 Limited (an entity) located at Motueka postcode 7120,
Miller, Bruce James (an individual) located at Rd 1, Upper Moutere postcode 7173. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 1% of all shares (1 share); it includes
Miller, Shelley Christina (a director) - located at Rd 1, Upper Moutere. Next there is the next group of shareholders, share allotment (1 share, 1%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Miller, Bruce James, located at Rd 1, Upper Moutere (an individual). Our data was last updated on 19 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
29 Wallace Street, Motueka, 7120 | Physical & registered & service | 05 Apr 2013 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Bruce James Miller
Rd 1, Upper Moutere, 7173
Address used since 20 Sep 2022
Tasman, R D 1 Upper Moutere, 7173
Address used since 07 Mar 2012 |
Director | 20 Dec 2004 - current |
Shelley Christina Miller
Rd 1, Upper Moutere, 7173
Address used since 20 Sep 2022 |
Director | 20 Sep 2022 - current |
Shelley Clark-miller
Tasman, R D 1 Upper Moutere, 7173
Address used since 07 Mar 2012 |
Director | 20 Dec 2004 - 08 Mar 2016 |
Alister Raymond Clark
Motueka,
Address used since 11 Mar 1996 |
Director | 11 Mar 1996 - 20 Dec 2004 |
Helen Yvonne Clark
Motueka,
Address used since 11 Mar 1996 |
Director | 11 Mar 1996 - 20 Dec 2004 |
Geoffrey Robert Milnes
Motueka, Nelson,
Address used since 05 Apr 1995 |
Director | 05 Apr 1995 - 11 Mar 1996 |
Nigel Alexander Mcfadden
Richmond,
Address used since 05 Apr 1995 |
Director | 05 Apr 1995 - 11 Mar 1996 |
Alister Raymond Clark
Nelson,
Address used since 20 Jun 1994 |
Director | 20 Jun 1994 - 05 Apr 1995 |
Pamela Lorraine Mccrae
Nelson,
Address used since 20 Jun 1994 |
Director | 20 Jun 1994 - 05 Apr 1995 |
Carl Henry Mccrae
Nelson,
Address used since 20 Jun 1994 |
Director | 20 Jun 1994 - 05 Apr 1995 |
Helen Yvonne Clark
Nelson,
Address used since 20 Jun 1994 |
Director | 20 Jun 1994 - 05 Apr 1995 |
Kim Penketh
Nelson,
Address used since 14 Oct 1993 |
Director | 14 Oct 1993 - 20 Jun 1994 |
Paul Donald Le Gros
Brightwater, Nelson,
Address used since 14 Oct 1993 |
Director | 14 Oct 1993 - 20 Jun 1994 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Milnes Beatson Limited, Chartered Accountants, 29 Wallace Street, Motueka | Registered & physical | 14 Mar 2007 - 05 Apr 2013 |
Milnes & Lockhart, 29 Wallace Street, Motueka, Nelson | Registered | 20 Jul 1998 - 14 Mar 2007 |
Milnes Beatson & Associates, 29 Wallace Street, Motueka | Physical | 19 Apr 1997 - 14 Mar 2007 |
Milnes & Lockhart, 29 Wallace Street, Motueka, Nelson | Physical | 19 Apr 1997 - 19 Apr 1997 |
Landcorp House, 11 Selwyn Place, Nelson | Registered | 01 May 1995 - 01 May 1995 |
Milnes & Lockhart, Chartered Accountants, 29 Wallace Street, Nelson | Registered | 01 May 1995 - 20 Jul 1998 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Miller, Shelley Christina Director |
Rd 1 Upper Moutere 7173 |
17 Oct 2022 - current |
Mbl Trustee Company No 3 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041201411 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Motueka 7120 |
11 Aug 2014 - current |
Miller, Bruce James Individual |
Rd 1 Upper Moutere 7173 |
25 Mar 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Miller, Shelley Christina Director |
Rd 1 Upper Moutere 7173 |
17 Oct 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Miller, Bruce James Individual |
Rd 1 Upper Moutere 7173 |
25 Mar 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mc Fadden, Nigel Alexander Individual |
Richmond 7020 |
14 Oct 1993 - 11 Aug 2014 |
Milnes, Geoffrey Robert Individual |
Motueka 7143 |
14 Oct 1993 - 11 Aug 2014 |
Clark-miller, Shelley Individual |
Rd 1 Upper Moutere 7173 |
14 Oct 1993 - 17 Oct 2022 |
Clark-miller, Shelley Individual |
Tasman R D 1 Upper Moutere 7173 |
14 Oct 1993 - 17 Oct 2022 |
Clark-miller, Shelley Individual |
Rd 1 Upper Moutere 7173 |
14 Oct 1993 - 17 Oct 2022 |
Clark, Alister Raymond Individual |
Ruby Bay Mapua 7005 |
14 Oct 1993 - 19 Jul 2015 |
Clark, Helen Yvonne Individual |
Motueka |
14 Oct 1993 - 23 Mar 2011 |
Blackenbrook Wines Limited 29 Wallace Street |
|
Tasman Gowland Surveyors Limited 29 Wallace Street |
|
Kaiteriteri Kayaks Limited 29 Wallace Street |
|
Plant Barn Propagators Limited 29 Wallace Street |
|
The Pink Cider Press Co Limited 29 Wallace Street |
|
Ocean View Holiday Park Limited 29 Wallace Street |