N-Tech Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429038593437) was registered on 22 Mar 1995. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 17/30 Heather Street, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 (type: physical, registered). 302/100 Parnell Rd, Parnell, Auckland had been their physical address, until 14 Mar 2019. 62802999 shares are allotted to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 17286217 shares (27.52% of shares), namely:
Googol Amore Limited (an entity) located at Parnell, Auckland postcode 1052. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 26.03% of all shares (exactly 16350516 shares); it includes
Melby & Company Limited (an entity) - located at Parnell, Auckland. The third group of shareholders, share allotment (29166266 shares, 46.44%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Clusevau Holdings Limited, located at Parnell, Auckland (an entity). Our information was updated on 08 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
17/30 Heather Street, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Physical & registered & service | 14 Mar 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Kerry Bryan Dobson
Gonville, Whanganui, 4501
Address used since 23 Jan 2024
Mount Roskill, Auckland, 1041
Address used since 25 Nov 2016 |
Director | 14 May 2013 - current |
John Anthony Reid
Trentham, Upper Hutt, 5018
Address used since 14 Jul 2023 |
Director | 14 Jul 2023 - current |
Samuel John Anton Reid
Trentham, Upper Hutt, 5018
Address used since 14 Jul 2023 |
Director | 14 Jul 2023 - current |
John Anthony Reid
Parnell, Auckland, 1052
Address used since 27 Nov 2012 |
Director | 22 Mar 1995 - 10 Oct 2013 |
Hugh Milloy
Parnell, Auckland, 1052
Address used since 24 Feb 2011 |
Director | 22 Mar 1995 - 14 Dec 2011 |
Jilnaught Wong
Remuera, Auckland,
Address used since 09 Apr 1999 |
Director | 09 Apr 1999 - 23 Oct 2001 |
Peter David Atkins
Seatoun, Wellington,
Address used since 22 Mar 1995 |
Director | 22 Mar 1995 - 18 Nov 1999 |
Dennis Vernon Rowe
Oriental Bay, Wellington,
Address used since 22 Mar 1995 |
Director | 22 Mar 1995 - 04 Jun 1999 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
302/100 Parnell Rd, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Physical & registered | 05 Dec 2012 - 14 Mar 2019 |
L 2, Windsor Court, 128-136 Parnell Rd, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Registered & physical | 17 Jan 2012 - 05 Dec 2012 |
33 Bath Street, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Registered & physical | 10 Nov 2010 - 17 Jan 2012 |
Level 15, B N Z Tower, 125 Queen Street, Auckland | Physical | 30 Oct 2001 - 30 Oct 2001 |
Level 3, 33 Bath St, Parnell, Auckland | Physical & registered | 30 Oct 2001 - 10 Nov 2010 |
Level 15, Bnz Tower, 125 Queen Streeet, Auckland | Registered | 30 Oct 2001 - 30 Oct 2001 |
Level 17, B N Z Tower, 125 Queen Street, Auckland | Registered | 20 Mar 1999 - 30 Oct 2001 |
Level 17, B N Z Tower, 125 Queen Street, Auckland | Physical | 22 Mar 1995 - 30 Oct 2001 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Googol Amore Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038224133 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Parnell Auckland 1052 |
22 Mar 1995 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Melby & Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038223983 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Parnell Auckland 1052 |
22 Mar 1995 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Clusevau Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038505393 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Parnell Auckland 1052 |
22 Mar 1995 - current |
E2e Ss Limited 205/100 Parnell Road |
|
Network Access Services Limited 205/100 Parnell Road |
|
Bayne Friedlander Limited 102/100 Parnell Road |
|
The Exercise Space Limited Flat G05, 100 Parnell Road |
|
Myhomeware Limited Suite 106 |
|
Film And Video Labelling Body Incorporated Level 1 |