Brunswick Water Supply Limited (NZBN 9429038537028) was incorporated on 26 Jan 1995. 4 addresses are in use by the company: 7 Essendon Place, Rd 4, Rotorua, 3074 (type: registered, service). 68 Brunswick Drive, Rd 4, Rotorua had been their physical address, up until 28 Jun 2021. 410 shares are allocated to 83 shareholders who belong to 41 shareholder groups. The first group contains 2 entities and holds 10 shares (2.44% of shares), namely:
Reymond, Frederic (an individual) located at Rd 4, Rotorua postcode 3074,
Besancon, Nathalie (an individual) located at Rd 4, Rotorua postcode 3074. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 2 shareholders hold 2.44% of all shares (exactly 10 shares); it includes
Hinton, Ian William (an individual) - located at Rd 4, Rotorua,
Mckechnie, Rachel Leigh (an individual) - located at Rd 4, Rotorua. Moving on to the 3rd group of shareholders, share allocation (10 shares, 2.44%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Kedian, Matthew John, located at Rd 4, Rotorua (an individual). The Businesscheck information was updated on 27 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
94 Brunswick Drive, Rd 4, Rotorua, 3074 | Registered & physical & service | 28 Jun 2021 |
7 Essendon Place, Rd 4, Rotorua, 3074 | Registered & service | 16 May 2024 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Craig Peter Woodhouse
Rd 4, Rotorua, 3074
Address used since 12 May 2016 |
Director | 14 Nov 2000 - current |
Peter Paul Spanbroek
Rd 4, Rotorua, 3074
Address used since 01 Oct 2019 |
Director | 01 Oct 2019 - current |
Hamish John Owen
Rd 4, Rotorua, 3074
Address used since 09 Jul 2020 |
Director | 09 Jul 2020 - current |
Darryl John Hodson
Rd 4, Rotorua, 3074
Address used since 09 Jul 2020 |
Director | 09 Jul 2020 - current |
Donald Paul Lock
Rd 4, Rotorua, 3074
Address used since 28 Sep 2021 |
Director | 28 Sep 2021 - current |
Christopher Neville Ussher
Rd 4, Rotorua, 3074
Address used since 03 May 2023
Rd 4, Rotorua, 3074
Address used since 28 Sep 2021 |
Director | 28 Sep 2021 - current |
Matthew John Kedian
Rd 4, Rotorua, 3074
Address used since 01 May 2024 |
Director | 01 May 2024 - current |
Shane Stephen Hooker
Rd 4, Rotorua, 3074
Address used since 23 Mar 2016 |
Director | 23 Mar 2016 - 08 May 2024 |
Daniel Garth Jones
Rd 4, Rotorua, 3074
Address used since 23 Mar 2016 |
Director | 23 Mar 2016 - 28 Sep 2021 |
Raymond Clive Jones
Rd 4, Rotorua, 3074
Address used since 23 Mar 2016 |
Director | 23 Mar 2016 - 31 Mar 2021 |
Richard Joseph Conroy
Rd 4, Rotorua, 3074
Address used since 28 Sep 2017 |
Director | 28 Sep 2017 - 31 Mar 2021 |
Richard Allan Evans
Rd 4, Rotorua, 3074
Address used since 23 Mar 2016 |
Director | 23 Mar 2016 - 01 Oct 2019 |
Robert Duncan Stevenson Kent
Ongaonga, 4278
Address used since 27 Jan 2018
Rd 4, Rotorua, 3074
Address used since 23 Mar 2016 |
Director | 23 Mar 2016 - 31 Oct 2018 |
Richard Ian Huston
Rd 4, Rotorua, 3074
Address used since 23 Mar 2016 |
Director | 23 Mar 2016 - 13 Mar 2017 |
Alan Gordon Murrell
Rd 4, Rotorua,
Address used since 28 Sep 2004 |
Director | 28 Sep 2004 - 23 Mar 2016 |
Deryck Alister Hintz
Rd 4, Rotorua,
Address used since 28 Sep 2004 |
Director | 28 Sep 2004 - 23 Mar 2016 |
Paula Ellis
Rd 4, Rotorua,
Address used since 20 Sep 2006 |
Director | 20 Sep 2006 - 23 Mar 2016 |
Michael Francis Curreen
Rd 4, Rotorua,
Address used since 02 Oct 2007 |
Director | 02 Oct 2007 - 23 Mar 2016 |
Paul Eric Jefford
R D 4, Rotorua,
Address used since 22 Oct 2008 |
Director | 22 Oct 2008 - 23 Mar 2016 |
Donald Bryce Tayler
Rd 4, Rotorua,
Address used since 27 Sep 2005 |
Director | 27 Sep 2005 - 26 Mar 2015 |
William Robert Matches
Rd 4, Rotorua,
Address used since 20 Sep 2006 |
Director | 20 Sep 2006 - 22 Oct 2008 |
Robert Elliott Murray
R D 4, Rotorua,
Address used since 14 Nov 2000 |
Director | 14 Nov 2000 - 10 Mar 2006 |
Phillip Bruce Todd
Rd4, Rotorua,
Address used since 21 Jun 2001 |
Director | 21 Jun 2001 - 27 Sep 2005 |
Wayne Patrick Cameron
Rd 4, Rotorua,
Address used since 01 Oct 2002 |
Director | 01 Oct 2002 - 14 Mar 2005 |
Martin Frank Hawke
R D 4, Rotorua,
Address used since 30 Oct 1997 |
Director | 30 Oct 1997 - 28 Sep 2004 |
Alison Lynne Astwood
R D 4, Rotorua,
Address used since 14 Nov 2000 |
Director | 14 Nov 2000 - 28 Sep 2004 |
Brian Tregilgas
R D 4, Rotorua,
Address used since 14 Nov 2000 |
Director | 14 Nov 2000 - 28 Sep 2004 |
John Edward Borren
R D 4, Rotorua,
Address used since 14 Nov 2000 |
Director | 14 Nov 2000 - 05 May 2002 |
David Paul Robinson
Rotorua,
Address used since 30 Oct 1997 |
Director | 30 Oct 1997 - 14 Nov 2000 |
Alexander Glen Wellwood Stevens
R D 4, Rotorua,
Address used since 30 Oct 1997 |
Director | 30 Oct 1997 - 14 Nov 2000 |
Kevin Lloyd Andrews
R D 4, Rotorua,
Address used since 30 Oct 1997 |
Director | 30 Oct 1997 - 14 Nov 2000 |
Peter John Jenkins
R D 4, Rotorua,
Address used since 30 Oct 1997 |
Director | 30 Oct 1997 - 14 Nov 2000 |
Allan John Bidwell
R D 4, Rotorua,
Address used since 10 Nov 1998 |
Director | 10 Nov 1998 - 14 Nov 2000 |
Stuart George Searle
Mauku, R D 3, Pukekohe,
Address used since 26 Jan 1995 |
Director | 26 Jan 1995 - 30 Oct 1997 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
68 Brunswick Drive, Rd 4, Rotorua, 3074 | Physical & registered | 09 Feb 2018 - 28 Jun 2021 |
63 Brunswick Drive, Rd 4, Rotorua, 3074 | Registered & physical | 09 Oct 2017 - 09 Feb 2018 |
1231 Ranolf Street, Rotorua | Registered & physical | 11 Feb 2010 - 09 Oct 2017 |
C/-len Watson Chartered Accountants Ltd, 1231 Ranolf Street, Rotorua | Physical & registered | 19 May 2008 - 11 Feb 2010 |
659b Hamurana Road, Rd 2, Rotorua | Physical & registered | 16 Jan 2007 - 19 May 2008 |
C/-27 Essendon Place, Rd 4, Rotorua | Registered & physical | 09 Jun 2006 - 16 Jan 2007 |
86 Brunswick Drive, R D 4, Rotorua | Physical | 21 May 2001 - 09 Jun 2006 |
27 Essendon Place, R D 4, Rotorua | Physical | 21 May 2001 - 21 May 2001 |
27 Essendon Place, R D 4, Rotorua | Registered | 03 Jan 2001 - 09 Jun 2006 |
Union Road, Mauku, R D 3, Pukekohe | Physical | 02 Feb 1998 - 21 May 2001 |
Union Road, Mauku, R D 3, Pukekohe | Registered | 02 Feb 1998 - 03 Jan 2001 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Reymond, Frederic Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
25 Mar 2018 - current |
Besancon, Nathalie Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
25 Mar 2018 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hinton, Ian William Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
10 Jan 2007 - current |
Mckechnie, Rachel Leigh Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
10 Jan 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Kedian, Matthew John Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
10 Feb 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Ellis, Paula Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
10 Jan 2007 - current |
Ellis, Clinton Douglas Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
10 Jan 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Williams, Sharon Anne Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
16 Oct 2014 - current |
Williams, David Tukairangi Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
16 Oct 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Woodhouse, Craig Peter Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
10 Jan 2007 - current |
Thomas, Jillian Anne Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
10 Jan 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hooker, Shane Stephen Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
10 Jan 2007 - current |
Hooker, Antonia Miria Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
10 Jan 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Whitaker, Alice Maree Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
10 Jan 2007 - current |
Whitaker, Matthew Paul Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
10 Jan 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Bala, Manjula Ashok Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
10 Jan 2007 - current |
Bala, Ashok Magan Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
10 Jan 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Aratema-owen, Rachel Anne Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
05 Oct 2019 - current |
Aratema, David Jack Tokoaitua Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
05 Oct 2019 - current |
Aratema, Parahuia Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
05 Oct 2019 - current |
Owen, Hamish John Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
05 Oct 2019 - current |
Bedford, Victor Ross Alexander Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
05 Oct 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Spanbroek, Peter Paul Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
20 May 2018 - current |
Spanbroek, Briar Jane Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
20 May 2018 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Lock, Donald Paul Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
25 Mar 2018 - current |
Lock, Catherine Amanda Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
25 Mar 2018 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Garmonsway, Deana Maree Individual |
R D 4 Rotorua 3074 |
26 Jan 1995 - current |
Garmonsway, Trevor Harold Individual |
R D 4 Rotorua 3074 |
26 Jan 1995 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Madden, Corinne June Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
18 Dec 2020 - current |
Arnold Trustees 2017 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429046003041 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Tauranga Tauranga 3110 |
18 Dec 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Jing, Jing Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
25 Mar 2018 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Seaman, Alison Ruth Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
08 Apr 2015 - current |
Seaman, Christopher Alan Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
08 Apr 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Austin, Kevin Paul Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
22 Jun 2023 - current |
Louder, Jessica Anne Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
22 Jun 2023 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Parata, Samuel Winara Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
21 Jul 2023 - current |
Parata, Krystie Skye Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
21 Jul 2023 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Macfarlane, Ezekiel Wharepapa Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
01 Feb 2023 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Katrina Vdg Trust Other (Other) |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
06 Apr 2016 - current |
Bilbe, Damian John Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
06 Apr 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Rong, Hao Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
18 Sep 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Stevens, Judith Ann Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
25 Mar 2018 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Grbich, Gary John Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
21 Nov 2014 - current |
Grbich, Rose Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
21 Nov 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hodson, Julie Elaine Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
10 Jan 2007 - current |
Hodson, Gerrald Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
10 Jan 2007 - current |
Hodson, Darryl John Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
10 Jan 2007 - current |
Hodson, Gwen Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
10 Jan 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
King, Tania Louise Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
10 Jan 2007 - current |
King, Jason Carter Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
10 Jan 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Stewart-king, Stephanie Fay Irene Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
16 Feb 2022 - current |
Stewart, Dale Robert Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
16 Feb 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hancock, Christopher William Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
10 Jan 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Willemsen, Sharlene Sylvia Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
21 Oct 2020 - current |
Willemsen, Adrian Charles Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
21 Oct 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Van Der Westhuizen, Francois Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
04 Nov 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Tabs Trustee 24 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032942422 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Matua Tauranga 3110 |
25 Jul 2016 - current |
Conroy, Richard Joseph Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
25 Jul 2016 - current |
Conroy, Jenna Kiley Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
25 Jul 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
East Brewster Trustees 2012 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030805682 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Rotorua 3010 |
18 Aug 2016 - current |
Ussher, Christopher Neville Individual |
R D 4 Rotorua 3074 |
26 Jan 1995 - current |
Ussher, Lynn Elizabeth Individual |
R D 4 Rotorua 3074 |
26 Jan 1995 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Bridgens, Eileen Agnes Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
16 Oct 2014 - current |
Monk, Philip Charles Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
16 Oct 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Brown, Fiona Mary Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
16 Jan 2013 - current |
Hulton Patchell Support Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038019210 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
2nd Floor, Pukeroa Oruawhata House 2/1176 Amohau St, Rotorua 3010 |
16 Jan 2013 - current |
Brown, Martin John Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
16 Jan 2013 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Blakey, Stephen Carl Individual |
Tikitere Rotorua 3074 |
10 Mar 2017 - current |
Blakey, Susan Carl Individual |
Tikitere Rotorua 3074 |
10 Mar 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Garmonsway, Gordon Trevor Individual |
R D 4 Rotorua 3074 |
26 Jan 1995 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Marsh, Jane Elizabeth Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
26 Aug 2010 - current |
Marsh, Andrew Lee Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
26 Aug 2010 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Curreen, Michael Individual |
R D 4 Rotorua 3074 |
01 May 2009 - current |
Curreen, Tracey Lea Individual |
R D 4 Rotorua 3074 |
01 May 2009 - current |
Gibson, Anthony Individual |
R D 4 Rotorua 3074 |
26 Jan 1995 - current |
Gibson, Karen Roslyn Individual |
R D 4 Rotorua 3074 |
26 Jan 1995 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Worboys, Hamish Neil Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
25 Mar 2018 - current |
Worboys, Jessica May Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
25 Mar 2018 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Marzocchi, Josiane Genevieve Noella Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
04 Jun 2018 - current |
Suchet, Gilles Edouard Henri Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
19 Oct 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Armstrong, Alison Louise Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
04 May 2011 - current |
Armstrong, Jonathon Winchester Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
04 Jun 2018 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Iwata, Toshihiro Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
04 Jun 2018 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Tls Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031896849 Company Number: 2326848 Entity |
Rotorua Rotorua 3010 |
27 Jan 2016 - 25 Mar 2018 |
Foster & Milroy Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035471929 Company Number: 1494692 Entity |
Hamilton Central Hamilton 3204 |
21 Mar 2016 - 21 Jul 2023 |
Jones, Daniel Garth Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
14 Oct 2015 - 22 Jun 2023 |
Young, Annette Joy Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
10 Jan 2007 - 01 Feb 2023 |
Andrews, Kevin Lloyd Individual |
R D 4 Rotorua |
26 Jan 1995 - 10 Jan 2007 |
Williams, Ronald James Individual |
R D 4 Rotorua |
26 Jan 1995 - 10 Jan 2007 |
Colebert, Gloria Jean Individual |
R D 4 Rotorua |
26 Jan 1995 - 10 Jan 2007 |
Jenkins, Janet Sue Individual |
R D 4 Rotorua |
26 Jan 1995 - 10 Jan 2007 |
Gray, Jennifer Anne Individual |
R D 4 Rotorua |
26 Jan 1995 - 10 Jan 2007 |
Gray, Brendon William Individual |
R D 4 Rotorua |
26 Jan 1995 - 10 Jan 2007 |
Colebert, Gary Lance Individual |
R D 4 Rotorua |
26 Jan 1995 - 10 Jan 2007 |
Keen, Michael Barry Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
25 Jul 2016 - 04 Nov 2019 |
Keen, Mary Noreen Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
25 Jul 2016 - 04 Nov 2019 |
Marzocchi, Josiane Genevieve Noelle Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
19 Oct 2007 - 04 Jun 2018 |
Katipa, Debra Louise Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
26 Jan 1995 - 25 Jul 2016 |
Robson, Terri Milisa Individual |
R D 4 Rotorua |
26 Jan 1995 - 10 Jan 2007 |
Steadman, Jennifer Anne Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
16 Oct 2014 - 21 Oct 2020 |
Murrell, Annette Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua |
10 Jan 2007 - 21 Mar 2016 |
Hewlett, Raymond Basil Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
07 May 2007 - 27 Jan 2016 |
Hewlett, Lesley Judith Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
07 May 2007 - 27 Jan 2016 |
Mcgregor, Aimee Elizabeth Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
10 Jan 2007 - 21 Nov 2014 |
Packer, David Arthur Individual |
R D 4 Rotorua 3074 |
26 Jan 1995 - 16 Oct 2014 |
Green, Peter Edward Maurice Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
10 Jan 2007 - 03 Oct 2013 |
Iwata, Thomas Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
26 Jan 1995 - 04 Jun 2018 |
Graham, Deborah Clare Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
27 Jan 2016 - 25 Mar 2018 |
Graham, Deborah Clare Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
27 Jan 2016 - 25 Mar 2018 |
Robson, Darrel Trevor Individual |
R D 4 Rotorua |
26 Jan 1995 - 10 Jan 2007 |
Young, Allen Herbert Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
10 Jan 2007 - 01 Feb 2023 |
Katipa, Dean Timothy Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
26 Jan 1995 - 25 Jul 2016 |
Katipa, Dean Timothy Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
26 Jan 1995 - 25 Jul 2016 |
Deuchars, James Murray Individual |
15 Hawthornden Drive Rd 4, Rotorua 3074 |
10 Jan 2007 - 28 Aug 2012 |
Cameron, Raewyn Lesley Individual |
R D 4 Rotorua |
26 Jan 1995 - 10 Jan 2007 |
Alemann, Kerry Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
21 Mar 2016 - 21 Jul 2023 |
Fraser, Phillippa Anne Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
10 Jan 2007 - 16 Oct 2014 |
Robson, Terri Milisa Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
10 Jan 2007 - 06 Apr 2016 |
Jones, Amanda Jane Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
14 Oct 2015 - 22 Jun 2023 |
Cross, Anthony Estlin Nicol Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua |
10 Jan 2007 - 07 May 2007 |
Fraser, Jacqueline Leigh Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua |
10 Jan 2007 - 07 May 2007 |
Fraser, Robert Sydney Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua |
10 Jan 2007 - 07 May 2007 |
Alemann, Kerry Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
21 Mar 2016 - 21 Jul 2023 |
Alemann, Daniel Maurice Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
21 Mar 2016 - 21 Jul 2023 |
Alemann, Daniel Maurice Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
21 Mar 2016 - 21 Jul 2023 |
Jones, Raymond Clive Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
14 Oct 2015 - 22 Jun 2023 |
Cameron, Wayne Patrick Individual |
R D 4 Rotorua |
26 Jan 1995 - 10 Jan 2007 |
Spiers, Leigh Clifford Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
10 Jan 2007 - 20 May 2018 |
Ferguson, John William Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
13 Nov 2014 - 25 Mar 2018 |
Matches, Gael Kathren Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
10 Jan 2007 - 25 Mar 2018 |
Clare, Christopher John Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
10 Jan 2007 - 25 Jul 2016 |
Katipa, Debra Louise Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
26 Jan 1995 - 25 Jul 2016 |
Wilkinson-fuller, Jill Margaret Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
10 Jan 2007 - 21 Mar 2016 |
Fuller, Andrew John Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
10 Jan 2007 - 21 Mar 2016 |
Al-maridi, Mohammad Samir Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
03 Oct 2013 - 21 Mar 2016 |
Mcgregor, Jared Malcolm Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
10 Jan 2007 - 21 Nov 2014 |
Fraser, Kyle William Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
10 Jan 2007 - 16 Oct 2014 |
Madden, Rosalie Margaret Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua |
10 Jan 2007 - 04 May 2011 |
Ramson, Juliet Katherine Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
13 Nov 2018 - 16 Feb 2022 |
Quay Trustee Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037519582 Company Number: 972170 Entity |
Whakatane Whakatane 3120 |
17 Feb 2014 - 10 Feb 2019 |
Van Der Gulik, Katrina Maria Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
06 Apr 2016 - 04 Jun 2018 |
Spiers, Susan Mary Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
10 Jan 2007 - 20 May 2018 |
Mclean, Vicki Elizabeth Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
27 Oct 2015 - 25 Mar 2018 |
Graham, Adrian Eruera Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
27 Jan 2016 - 25 Mar 2018 |
Voysey, Nicholas Mark Individual |
R D 4 Rotorua 3074 |
26 Jan 1995 - 25 Jul 2016 |
Earle, Bryan Ralph Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
16 Oct 2014 - 25 May 2016 |
Murrell, Alan Gordon Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
10 Jan 2007 - 21 Mar 2016 |
Al-mraidi, Shafouqa Mohammad Yacoub Individual |
R D 4 Rotorua 3074 |
03 Oct 2013 - 21 Mar 2016 |
Hintz, Vonne Irene Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
26 Jan 1995 - 27 Oct 2015 |
Tregilgas, Anne Individual |
R D 4 Rotorua 3074 |
26 Jan 1995 - 16 Oct 2014 |
Watt, Martin Lyth Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua |
10 Jan 2007 - 04 May 2011 |
Farquhar, Clyde Henry Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua |
10 Jan 2007 - 07 May 2007 |
Stewart-king, Stephanie Faye Irene Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
16 Feb 2022 - 16 Feb 2022 |
Psa Nominees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037076504 Company Number: 1102008 Entity |
04 Jun 2018 - 05 Oct 2019 | |
Evans, Richard Allan Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
17 Feb 2014 - 10 Feb 2019 |
Van Der Gulik, Katrina Maria Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
06 Apr 2016 - 04 Jun 2018 |
Hanson, Gail Claire Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
21 Mar 2016 - 18 Dec 2020 |
Psa Nominees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037076504 Company Number: 1102008 Entity |
Rotorua 3010 |
04 Jun 2018 - 05 Oct 2019 |
Phipps, Joanne Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
10 Jan 2007 - 16 Oct 2014 |
Green, Norma Lillian Individual |
Ostend Waiheke Island |
26 Jan 1995 - 10 Jan 2007 |
Hammond, Timothy Edwin Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
21 Mar 2016 - 18 Dec 2020 |
Evans, Lynette Anne Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
17 Feb 2014 - 10 Feb 2019 |
Hintz, Deryck Alister Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
26 Jan 1995 - 27 Oct 2015 |
Hawkins, Cynthia Dorothy Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua |
10 Jan 2007 - 07 May 2007 |
Penny, Maureen Rita Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua |
10 Jan 2007 - 10 Jan 2007 |
Penny, Brian Eric Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua |
10 Jan 2007 - 10 Jan 2007 |
Ramson, Gareth Allan Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
27 Nov 2018 - 16 Feb 2022 |
Hustoon, Rick Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
04 May 2011 - 18 Sep 2017 |
Hill, Louise-marie Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
21 Mar 2016 - 10 Mar 2017 |
Clare, Shirley Dawn Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
10 Jan 2007 - 25 Jul 2016 |
Douch, Andrew Michael Individual |
R D 4 Rotorua |
26 Jan 1995 - 10 Jan 2007 |
Robson, Darrel Trevor Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
10 Jan 2007 - 06 Apr 2016 |
Armstrong, Johnathon Winchester Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
04 May 2011 - 04 Jun 2018 |
Tayler, Donald Bryce Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
10 Jan 2007 - 08 Apr 2015 |
Partelow, Duane Noel Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
25 Jul 2016 - 13 Nov 2018 |
Jefford, Paul Eric Individual |
Rd 2 Rotorua 3074 |
07 May 2007 - 14 Oct 2015 |
Earle, Bryan Ralph Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
25 Mar 2018 - 21 Oct 2020 |
Smith, Gaylene Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
10 Jan 2007 - 05 Oct 2019 |
Smith, Gaylene Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
10 Jan 2007 - 05 Oct 2019 |
Kent, Robert Duncan Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
27 Oct 2015 - 25 Mar 2018 |
O'keeffe, Mark Andrew Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
16 Oct 2014 - 13 Nov 2014 |
Madden, Barry Alan Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua |
10 Jan 2007 - 04 May 2011 |
Buckthought, Kenneth Walter Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua |
10 Jan 2007 - 26 Aug 2010 |
Steadman, Jennifer Anne Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
16 Oct 2014 - 21 Oct 2020 |
Smith, Gregory Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
10 Jan 2007 - 05 Oct 2019 |
Ramson, Gareth Allen Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
13 Nov 2018 - 27 Nov 2018 |
Partelow, Olwen Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
25 Jul 2016 - 13 Nov 2018 |
Matches, William Robert Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
10 Jan 2007 - 25 Mar 2018 |
Ferris, Thomas Lloyd Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
28 Aug 2012 - 25 Mar 2018 |
Morgan, Phillipa Adrienne Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
25 May 2016 - 25 Mar 2018 |
Ferguson, Lynaire Caroline Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
13 Nov 2014 - 25 Mar 2018 |
Graham, Adrian Eruera Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
27 Jan 2016 - 25 Mar 2018 |
Hill, Gareth Alexander Richard Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
21 Mar 2016 - 10 Mar 2017 |
Tregilgas, Brian Individual |
R D 4 Rotorua 3074 |
26 Jan 1995 - 16 Oct 2014 |
Phipps, Robert Grant Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
10 Jan 2007 - 16 Oct 2014 |
Packer, Anne Elizabeth Individual |
R D 4 Rotorua 3074 |
26 Jan 1995 - 16 Oct 2014 |
Later, Kevin Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
10 Jan 2007 - 17 Feb 2014 |
Todd, Phillip Bruce Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
10 Jan 2007 - 16 Jan 2013 |
Watt, Paula Dorothy Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua |
10 Jan 2007 - 04 May 2011 |
Douch, Gayle Theresa Individual |
R D 4 Rotorua |
26 Jan 1995 - 10 Jan 2007 |
Andrews, Glenda Leah Individual |
R D 4 Rotorua |
26 Jan 1995 - 10 Jan 2007 |
Green, Peter Edward Maurice Individual |
Ostend Waiheke Island |
26 Jan 1995 - 10 Jan 2007 |
Evans, Richard Allan Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
17 Feb 2014 - 10 Feb 2019 |
Evans, Lynette Anne Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
17 Feb 2014 - 10 Feb 2019 |
Later, Celia Elizabeth Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
10 Jan 2007 - 17 Feb 2014 |
Smith, Gregory Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
10 Jan 2007 - 05 Oct 2019 |
Rust, Sheryl Janine Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
10 Jan 2007 - 16 Jan 2013 |
Davidson, Bruce Stephen Individual |
Ngongotaha |
26 Jan 1995 - 10 Jan 2007 |
Jenkins, Peter John Individual |
R D 4 Rotorua |
26 Jan 1995 - 10 Jan 2007 |
Voysey, Jane Catriona Individual |
R D 4 Rotorua 3074 |
26 Jan 1995 - 25 Jul 2016 |
Hawke, Martin Frank Individual |
R D 4 Rotorua |
26 Jan 1995 - 10 Jan 2007 |
Bidwell, Allan John Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua |
26 Jan 1995 - 10 Jan 2007 |
Williams, Karen Margaret Individual |
R D 4 Rotorua |
26 Jan 1995 - 10 Jan 2007 |
Bidwell, Leone Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua |
26 Jan 1995 - 10 Jan 2007 |
Payne, Bernadette Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
04 May 2011 - 18 Sep 2017 |
Ferris, Lynette Maureen Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
28 Aug 2012 - 25 Mar 2018 |
Tls Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031896849 Company Number: 2326848 Entity |
Rotorua Rotorua 3010 |
27 Jan 2016 - 25 Mar 2018 |
Quay Trustee Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037519582 Company Number: 972170 Entity |
Whakatane Whakatane 3120 |
17 Feb 2014 - 10 Feb 2019 |
Zohs, Vicki Kathryn Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua |
10 Jan 2007 - 26 Aug 2010 |
Deuchars, Sheila Mcrae Individual |
15 Hawthornden Drive Rd 4, Rotorua 3074 |
10 Jan 2007 - 28 Aug 2012 |
Jefford, June Lesley Individual |
Rd 2 Rotorua 3074 |
07 May 2007 - 14 Oct 2015 |
Davidson, Christina Jamie Individual |
Ngongotaha |
26 Jan 1995 - 10 Jan 2007 |
Alemann Architecture Limited 11 Essendon Place |
|
Shane Hooker Limited 94 Brunswick Drive |
|
Geohazard Environmental Limited 25 Glenroy Place |
|
Emmkays Limited 103 Brunswick Drive |
|
Lall Holdings Limited 103 Brunswick Drive |
|
Kanuka Point Limited 4 Flemington Place |