Mackintosh Forestry Limited (issued a business number of 9429038416620) was incorporated on 06 Dec 1995. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: Level 4, 7 Winston Avenue, Papanui, Christchurch, 8053 (type: physical, service). C/- P S Alexander & Associates, Level 1, Unit 1, Amuri Park, 25 Churchill Street, Christchurch had been their registered address, until 07 Mar 2000. 300 shares are issued to 8 shareholders who belong to 7 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 49 shares (16.33 per cent of shares), namely:
Sdk Trustee Limited As Trustee Of Dougal Mackintosh Trust (an other) located at Richmond, Richmond postcode 7020. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 2 shareholders hold 2 per cent of all shares (exactly 6 shares); it includes
Milnes, Aaron Joseph (an individual) - located at Rangiora, Rangiora,
Mackintosh, Neil Alexander (an individual) - located at Rd 2, Rangiora. The third group of shareholders, share allocation (49 shares, 16.33%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Mackintosh, William Andrew, located at Coorow, Wa (an individual). The Businesscheck database was updated on 03 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 4, 7 Winston Avenue, Papanui, Christchurch, 8053 | Physical & service & registered | 18 Dec 2018 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Neil Alexander Mackintosh
Rd 2, Rangiora, 7472
Address used since 05 Aug 2013 |
Director | 06 Dec 1995 - current |
William Andrew Mackintosh
Coorow, Wa, 6518AO
Address used since 01 May 2018
Northam, Wa, 6401
Address used since 11 Mar 2016 |
Director | 06 Dec 1995 - current |
Ewen Charles Mackintosh
Rd 4, Taupo, 3384
Address used since 07 May 2012 |
Director | 06 Dec 1995 - current |
Duncan Stuart Mackintosh
R D 2, Rangiora, 7472
Address used since 07 May 2012 |
Director | 06 Dec 1995 - current |
Lachlan James Mackintosh
Rd 2, Rangiora, 7472
Address used since 26 May 2014 |
Director | 06 Dec 1995 - 12 Feb 2016 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
C/- P S Alexander & Associates, Level 1, Unit 1, Amuri Park, 25 Churchill Street, Christchurch | Registered | 07 Mar 2000 - 07 Mar 2000 |
Unit 1, Level 1, Amuri Park, 25 Churchill Street, Christchurch, 8013 | Registered | 07 Mar 2000 - 18 Dec 2018 |
Pricewaterhousecoopers, Level 11, Price Waterhouse Centre, 119 Armagh Street, Christchurch | Registered | 17 Dec 1999 - 07 Mar 2000 |
C/- P S Alexander & Associates, Level 1, Unit 1, Amuri Park, 25 Churchhill Street, Christchurch | Physical | 17 Dec 1999 - 17 Dec 1999 |
C/ Pricewaterhousecoopers, Price Waterhouse Centre, Level 11, 119 Armagh Str, Christchurch | Physical | 17 Dec 1999 - 17 Dec 1999 |
Level 1, Unit 1, Amuri Park, 25 Churchhill Street, Christchurch | Physical | 17 Dec 1999 - 18 Dec 2018 |
C/ Pricewaterhousecoopers, Price Waterhouse Centre, Level 11, 119 Armagh Str, Christchurch | Registered | 01 Mar 1999 - 17 Dec 1999 |
Price Waterhouse, Price Waterhouse Centre, Level 11,, 119 Armagh Street, Christchurch | Registered | 04 Nov 1998 - 01 Mar 1999 |
Price Waterhouse, Price Waterhouse Centre, 119 Armagh Street, Christchurch | Registered | 06 Mar 1997 - 04 Nov 1998 |
Price Waterhouse, Price Waterhouse Centre, 119 Armagh Street, Christchurch | Physical | 06 Dec 1995 - 17 Dec 1999 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Sdk Trustee Limited As Trustee Of Dougal Mackintosh Trust Other (Other) |
Richmond Richmond 7020 |
11 Jul 2024 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Milnes, Aaron Joseph Individual |
Rangiora Rangiora 7400 |
24 Jul 2024 - current |
Mackintosh, Neil Alexander Individual |
Rd 2 Rangiora 7472 |
06 Dec 1995 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mackintosh, William Andrew Individual |
Coorow Wa 6518AO |
06 Dec 1995 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mackintosh, Ewen Charles Individual |
Rd 4 Taupo 3384 |
06 Dec 1995 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mackintosh, Neil Alexander Individual |
Rd 2 Rangiora 7472 |
06 Dec 1995 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mackintosh, Lachlan James Individual |
Rd 2 Rangiora 7472 |
06 Dec 1995 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mackintosh, Duncan Stuart Individual |
R D 2 Rangiora 7472 |
06 Dec 1995 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mackintosh, Pamela Mary Individual |
Rangiora Rangiora 7400 |
29 Feb 2004 - 24 Jul 2024 |
Henry, Simon Individual |
Level 7, Ami House Auckland 1010 |
12 Dec 2006 - 11 Jul 2024 |
Mackintosh, Ewen Charles Individual |
Rd 4 Taupo 3384 |
12 Dec 2006 - 11 Jul 2024 |
Mackintosh, Alistair Robert Individual |
Rd 2 Rangiora |
29 Feb 2004 - 28 Feb 2012 |
Mackintosh, Dougal Robert Individual |
Rd 6 Ashburton |
29 Feb 2004 - 16 Feb 2005 |
Designa Electronics Limited Unit 5, Amuri Park, 404 Barbadoes Street |
|
Boulding Technology Limited 404 Barbadoes Street |
|
Pipiot Limited Unit 5, Amuri Park |
|
Spore Lab Limited 5 Amuri Park, 404 Barbadoes St |
|
Fabric House Limited Unit 5, 404 Barbadoes Street |
|
Tape Replacement Limited Unit 5, 404 Barbadoes Street |