Biomex Trustees Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429038409059) was registered on 16 Jan 1996. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 11 Merton Place, Tahunanui, Nelson (type: registered, physical). Accounting & Taxation Centre Limited, 181 Bridge Street, Nelson had been their physical address, up until 18 Feb 2002. Biomex Trustees Limited used other names, namely: Biomex Trustees Limited from 17 Jun 2016 to 21 Jun 2016, Maclab (Nz) Limited (22 Apr 1996 to 17 Jun 2016) and Mussel Power Limited (16 Jan 1996 - 22 Apr 1996). 1000 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 500 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
Broadbent, Patricia Ann (an individual) located at Melbourne, Victoria postcode 3101. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50 per cent of all shares (exactly 500 shares); it includes
Broadbent, James Meredith (an individual) - located at Kew, Victoria. The Businesscheck database was updated on 04 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
11 Merton Place, Tahunanui, Nelson | Registered | 18 Feb 2002 |
11 Merton Place, Tahananui, Nelson | Physical & service | 18 Feb 2002 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
James Meredyth Broadbent
Kew, Victoria, 3101
Address used since 25 Jul 2019
Ivanhoe East, Victoria, 3079
Address used since 31 Jul 2017
Melbourne, Victoria, 3000
Address used since 01 Jan 1970 |
Director | 16 Jan 1996 - current |
James Meredith Broadbent
Templestowe, Victoria, 3106
Address used since 17 Jul 2015
Melbourne, Victoria, 3000
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Ivanhoe East, Victoria, 3079
Address used since 31 Jul 2017
Melbourne, Victoria, 3000
Address used since 01 Jan 1970 |
Director | 16 Jan 1996 - current |
Andrew Christopher Broadbent
Melbourne, 3000
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Kew, Victoria, 3101
Address used since 03 Jul 2020
Tahunanui, Nelson, 7010
Address used since 17 Jul 2015
Hawthon, Victoria, 3122
Address used since 31 Jul 2017 |
Director | 27 Apr 1999 - current |
Sarah Janet Broadbent
Kew, Victoria, 3124
Address used since 01 Jul 2024
Camberwell, Victoria, 3124
Address used since 24 Jun 2021 |
Director | 24 Jun 2021 - current |
William Ramsden Broadbent
Melbourne, Victoria, 3000
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Kew, Victoria, 3101
Address used since 17 Jul 2015
Melbourne, Victoria, 3000
Address used since 01 Jan 1970 |
Director | 16 Jan 1996 - 18 Jul 2018 |
Phillip John Wilson
Nelson, 7011
Address used since 06 Oct 2006 |
Director | 06 Oct 2006 - 03 Oct 2013 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Accounting & Taxation Centre Limited, 181 Bridge Street, Nelson | Physical | 16 Aug 2001 - 18 Feb 2002 |
11 Merton Place, Nelson | Physical | 16 Aug 2001 - 16 Aug 2001 |
181 Bridge Street, Nelson | Registered | 04 Aug 2001 - 18 Feb 2002 |
Accounting & Taxation Centre Limited, 181 Bridge Street, Nelson | Physical | 04 Aug 2001 - 16 Aug 2001 |
C/- Neville Parker & Associates, 48 Trafalgar Street, Nelson | Physical | 25 Aug 1998 - 04 Aug 2001 |
C/- Neville Parker & Associates, 48 Trafalgar Street, Nelson | Registered | 13 Jun 1997 - 04 Aug 2001 |
Hinton & Associates, 2nd Floor Network Tasman Building, 281 Queen Street, Richmond, Nelson | Registered | 16 Jan 1996 - 13 Jun 1997 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Broadbent, Patricia Ann Individual |
Melbourne, Victoria 3101 |
28 Aug 2023 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Broadbent, James Meredith Individual |
Kew Victoria 3101 |
16 Jan 1996 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Broadbent, William Ramsden Individual |
Kew Victoria 3101 |
16 Jan 1996 - 28 Aug 2023 |
The Depot (nelson) Trust 75 Pascoe Street |
|
Brightwater Cabinet Makers & Joinery Limited 8c Merton Place |
|
Vergo Investments Limited 15 Orion Street |
|
Nelmac Limited 2 Bullen Street |
|
Anything Electronic (nz) Limited 7 Bullen Street |
|
Neltech Finance Limited 95 Pascoe Street |