Glenbrook Holdings Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429038388507) was launched on 22 Nov 1995. 7 addresess are currently in use by the company: 5 Mccready Road, Tuakau, Tuakau, 2121 (type: postal, office). 4 Seaview Terrace, Maraetai Beach, Manukau 2018 had been their physical address, up until 27 Apr 2015. 100 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Von Sturmer, Arthur Churton Norries (an individual) located at Maraetai Beach, Auckland 1705. "Investment - financial assets" (business classification K624040) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Glenbrook Holdings Limited. The Businesscheck data was updated on 28 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
5 Mccready Road, Tuakau, Tuakau, 2121 | Other (Address For Share Register) & shareregister (Address For Share Register) | 18 Apr 2015 |
5 Mccready Road, Tuakau, Tuakau, 2121 | Physical & registered & service | 27 Apr 2015 |
5 Mccready Road, Tuakau, Tuakau, 2121 | Office & delivery | 14 Apr 2019 |
5 Mccready Road, Tuakau, Tuakau, 2121 | Postal | 27 Apr 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Arthur Churton Norries Von Sturmer
Maraetai Beach, Manukau 2018, 2018
Address used since 07 Apr 2016 |
Director | 22 Nov 1995 - current |
Philippa Anne Hooper
Tuakau, 2121
Address used since 01 Apr 2014 |
Director | 01 Apr 2014 - current |
Gayle Sheryl Clark
Kohimaramara, 1071
Address used since 03 May 2023 |
Director | 03 May 2023 - current |
Karen Gail Reid
Brookfield, Tauranga, 3110
Address used since 03 May 2023 |
Director | 03 May 2023 - current |
Kim Janine Von Sturmer
Rd 5, Big Omaha, 0985
Address used since 03 May 2023 |
Director | 03 May 2023 - current |
Gillian Bronwyn Mackay
Queenwood, Hamilton, 3210
Address used since 16 May 2023 |
Director | 16 May 2023 - current |
Gayle Sheryl Clark
St Heliers, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 05 May 2023 |
Director | 05 May 2023 - 05 May 2023 |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
5 Mccready Road, Tuakau, Tuakau, 2121 | Postal | 27 Apr 2020 |
5 Mccready Road , Tuakau , Tuakau , 2121 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
4 Seaview Terrace, Maraetai Beach, Manukau 2018 | Physical | 20 Mar 2009 - 27 Apr 2015 |
4 Seaview Terrace, Maraetai Beach, Manukau City 2018 | Registered | 05 Apr 2007 - 05 Apr 2007 |
4 Seaview Terrace, Maraetai Beach, Auckland 1705 | Registered | 09 Apr 2002 - 05 Apr 2007 |
4 Seaview Terrace, Maraetai Beach, Auckland 1705 | Registered | 22 Nov 1995 - 09 Apr 2002 |
4 Seaview Terrace, Maraetai Beach, Auckland 1705 | Physical | 22 Nov 1995 - 20 Mar 2009 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Von Sturmer, Arthur Churton Norries Individual |
Maraetai Beach Auckland 1705 |
22 Nov 1995 - current |
B J Hooper Limited 5 Mccready Road |
|
Corsia Limited 11 Mccready Road |
|
Gardens With Attitude Limited 248 Dominion Road |
|
David & Raewyn Investments Limited 252 Dominion Road |
|
B1 & B2 Holdings Limited 186a Dominion Road |
|
Seacrest Farms Limited 201 Dominion Road |
Naidu Investment Trust Limited 40 Friedlander Road |
Broadlands Forest Limited Runciman Road |
Ross And Walls Investments Limited 37 Harris Street |
Chiswick Financial Investments Limited Level 2, 1 Wesley Street |
Linden Veterinary Limited Level 2, 1 Wesley Street |
Crosten Investments Limited Level 2, 1 Wesley Street |