Stamford Auckland (1996) Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429038372544) was launched on 26 Jan 1996. 3 addresses are currently in use by the company: Level 5, 79 Queen Street, Auckland, 1010 (type: registered, registered). Stamford Plaza Auckland, Lower Albert Street, Auckland had been their registered address, up to 01 Sep 2014. Stamford Auckland (1996) Limited used more aliases, namely: Goldenlines Investments Limited from 26 Jan 1996 to 19 Jul 2017. Businesscheck's information was last updated on 22 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
The Regent Hotel, Lower Albert Street, Auckland | Other (Address for Records) & records (Address for Records) | 19 Sep 1997 |
Stamford Plaza Auckland, 22-26 Albert Street, Auckland, 1010 | Registered | 01 Sep 2014 |
Level 5, 79 Queen Street, Auckland, 1010 | Registered | 15 Nov 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Yew Heng Ow
Singapore, 266495
Address used since 10 Oct 2017
Singapore, 258427
Address used since 23 Jan 2013 |
Director | 23 Jan 2013 - current |
Yiling Kiersten Ow
Singapore, 259553
Address used since 01 Sep 2023
#04-16, Singapore, 098328
Address used since 01 Mar 2019 |
Director | 01 Mar 2019 - current |
Sameer Talpade
22-26 Albert Street, Auckland, 1010
Address used since 15 Sep 2009 |
Person Authorised For Service | unknown - unknown |
John Thorman
Level 5, 79 Queen Street, Auckland, 1010
Address used since 15 Sep 2009 |
Person Authorised for Service | unknown - current |
Li Huang Lee
#12-141 Eunos Damai Ville, Singapore, 410663
Address used since 01 Mar 2019 |
Director | 01 Mar 2019 - 26 Jan 2023 |
Chio Kiat Ow
Singapore, 258427
Address used since 29 Jan 1996 |
Director | 29 Jan 1996 - 01 Mar 2019 |
Cheo Guan Ow
Singapore, 248617
Address used since 07 Nov 1997 |
Director | 07 Nov 1997 - 01 Mar 2019 |
Chee Keong Ong
Nsw, 2111
Address used since 08 Mar 2016 |
Director | 08 Mar 2016 - 01 Mar 2019 |
Li Huang Lee
#09-01 Southpoint, Singapore, 089763
Address used since 26 Sep 2016 |
Director | 26 Sep 2016 - 01 Mar 2019 |
Johnson Winiata Bristowe
New Lynn, Auckland, 0600
Address used since 05 Dec 2017 |
Director | 05 Dec 2017 - 06 Sep 2018 |
Marija Gecan
Kingsland, Auckland, 1021
Address used since 02 Aug 2016 |
Director | 02 Aug 2016 - 28 Jul 2017 |
Siew Hwi Chua
#01-01, Singapore, 117703
Address used since 17 Jul 2014 |
Director | 17 Jul 2014 - 26 Sep 2016 |
Angela Doran
Auckland, 1010
Address used since 07 Aug 2014 |
Director | 23 Jan 2013 - 08 Mar 2016 |
Lai Wat Tay
Singapore, 548038
Address used since 01 Sep 1997 |
Director | 01 Sep 1997 - 17 Jul 2014 |
Dharmend Prakash
Wattle Downs, Auckland, 2103
Address used since 03 Jun 2012 |
Director | 03 Jun 2012 - 27 Nov 2013 |
John Stuart Andrews
187 Liverpool Street, Sydney Nsw 2000, Australia,
Address used since 29 Jan 1996 |
Director | 29 Jan 1996 - 03 Jan 1997 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Stamford Plaza Auckland, Lower Albert Street, Auckland, 1010 | Registered | 10 Sep 2010 - 01 Sep 2014 |
The Regent Hotel, Lower Albert Street, Auckland | Registered | 25 Sep 1997 - 25 Sep 1997 |
Stamford Plaza Auckland, Lower Albert Street, Auckland | Registered | 25 Sep 1997 - 10 Sep 2010 |
Scarlet Trustee Limited Apartment 2302 Stamford Residences, 26 Albert Street |
|
Meredith Limited Apartment 1506 Stamford Residences, 26 Albert Street |
|
New Zealand Private Capital Association Incorporated C/-chapman Tripp |
|
Yss Limited Suite 10a |
|
Ze Investments Limited Suite 10a |
|
Alicena Investments Limited Suite 10a |