Bad Badger Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429038310393) was incorporated on 05 Jun 1996. 2 addresses are in use by the company: Level 4, 7 Winston Avenue, Papanui, Christchurch, 8053 (type: registered, physical). Unit 1, Level 1, Amuri Park, 25 Churchill Street, Christchurch had been their physical address, up until 14 Dec 2018. 100 shares are allotted to 14 shareholders who belong to 6 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 1 share (1% of shares), namely:
Alexander, Pita Shand (an individual) located at Hanmer Springs postcode 7334. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 1% of all shares (exactly 1 share); it includes
Alexander, Jane Patricia (an individual) - located at Swannanoa, Kaiapoi. The next group of shareholders, share allotment (69 shares, 69%) belongs to 3 entities, namely:
Hedges, Gregory Watson, located at Ilam, Christchurch (an individual),
Alexander, Paul Robert, located at Saint Albans, Christchurch (an individual),
Alexander, Jane Patricia, located at Swannanoa, Kaiapoi (an individual). The Businesscheck information was updated on 09 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 4, 7 Winston Avenue, Papanui, Christchurch, 8053 | Registered & physical & service | 14 Dec 2018 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Jane Patricia Alexander
Swannanoa, Kaiapoi, 7692
Address used since 27 Apr 2017 |
Director | 05 Jun 1996 - current |
Paul Robert Alexander
Saint Albans, Christchurch, 8014
Address used since 20 Dec 2010 |
Director | 05 Jun 1996 - current |
Pita Shand Alexander
Mairehau, Christchurch, 8013
Address used since 21 Dec 2012 |
Director | 05 Jun 1996 - 08 Jun 2023 |
Maureen Frances Alexander
Queenspark, Christchurch,
Address used since 05 Jun 1996 |
Director | 05 Jun 1996 - 29 Sep 2008 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Unit 1, Level 1, Amuri Park, 25 Churchill Street, Christchurch, 8013 | Physical | 05 Nov 1997 - 14 Dec 2018 |
31a Bampton Street, Christchurch | Physical | 05 Nov 1997 - 05 Nov 1997 |
31a Bampton Street, Christchurch | Registered | 05 Jun 1997 - 05 Jun 1997 |
Unit 1, Level 1, Amuri Park, 25 Churchill Street, Christchurch, 8013 | Registered | 05 Jun 1997 - 14 Dec 2018 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Alexander, Pita Shand Individual |
Hanmer Springs 7334 |
17 Dec 2009 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Alexander, Jane Patricia Individual |
Swannanoa Kaiapoi 7692 |
05 Jun 1996 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hedges, Gregory Watson Individual |
Ilam Christchurch 8041 |
14 Mar 2016 - current |
Alexander, Paul Robert Individual |
Saint Albans Christchurch 8014 |
17 Dec 2009 - current |
Alexander, Jane Patricia Individual |
Swannanoa Kaiapoi 7692 |
05 Jun 1996 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Alexander, Paul Robert Individual |
Saint Albans Christchurch 8014 |
17 Dec 2009 - current |
Alexander, Jane Patricia Individual |
Swannanoa Kaiapoi 7692 |
17 Dec 2009 - current |
Alexander, Pita Shand Individual |
Hanmer Springs 7334 |
17 Dec 2009 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Alexander, Pita Shand Individual |
Hanmer Springs 7334 |
17 Dec 2009 - current |
Alexander, Jane Patricia Individual |
Swannanoa Kaiapoi 7692 |
05 Jun 1996 - current |
Hedges, Gregory Watson Individual |
Ilam Christchurch 8041 |
14 Mar 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Alexander, Jane Patricia Individual |
Swannanoa Kaiapoi 7692 |
05 Jun 1996 - current |
Alexander, Paul Robert Individual |
Saint Albans Christchurch 8014 |
17 Dec 2009 - current |
Alexander, Pita Shand Individual |
Hanmer Springs 7334 |
17 Dec 2009 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Alexander, Maureen Frances Individual |
Christchurch |
05 Jun 1996 - 04 Nov 2011 |
Alexander, Maureen Frances Individual |
Christchurch |
05 Jun 1996 - 04 Nov 2011 |
Alexander, Paul Robert Individual |
Christchurch |
05 Jun 1996 - 03 Oct 2008 |
Alexander, Paul Robert Individual |
Christchurch |
05 Jun 1996 - 03 Oct 2008 |
Junkman Limited 31 New Brighton Road |
|
Gfr Developments Limited 31 New Brighton Road |
|
Junkman NZ Limited 31 New Brighton Road |
|
Acts 29 Trust 31 New Brighton Road |
|
Windsor House Board Of Governors 47 New Brighton Rd |
|
Gavcon Limited 43 Achilles Street |