Anderson Bricklaying Limited (issued a business number of 9429038166365) was launched on 17 Jan 1997. 10 addresess are in use by the company: 5 Goulding Avenue, Hornby, Christchurch, 8042 (type: postal, office). 2Nd Floor, 137 Victoria Street, Christchurch had been their physical address, up to 19 Jun 2014. Anderson Bricklaying Limited used other names, namely: Camomile No 51 Limited from 17 Jan 1997 to 26 Nov 1999. 100 shares are allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
Anderson, Maureen Therese (an individual) located at Ilam, Christchurch 8041. "Stonework on construction projects" (business classification E322220) is the classification the ABS issued Anderson Bricklaying Limited. Our information was last updated on 02 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
2a Worthy Street, Ilam, Christchurch, 8041 | Records & other (Address for Records) | 11 Jun 2014 |
7 Goulding Avenue, Hornby, Christchurch, 8042 | Registered & physical & service | 19 Jun 2014 |
7 Goulding Avenue, Hornby, Christchurch, 8042 | Postal & office & delivery | 05 Jun 2019 |
5 Goulding Avenue, Hornby, Christchurch, 8042 | Postal & office & delivery | 02 Jun 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Maureen Therese Anderson
Ilam, Christchurch, 8041
Address used since 16 May 2008 |
Director | 24 Nov 1997 - current |
Brian Anderson
Ilam, Christchurch, 8041
Address used since 16 May 2008 |
Director | 21 Dec 2002 - current |
Robert Wilson Purchas
Christchurch,
Address used since 17 Jan 1997 |
Director | 17 Jan 1997 - 24 Nov 1997 |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
5 Goulding Avenue, Hornby, Christchurch, 8042 | Postal & office & delivery | 02 Jun 2023 |
7 Goulding Avenue , Hornby , Christchurch , 8042 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
2nd Floor, 137 Victoria Street, Christchurch, 8013 | Physical & registered | 17 Jun 2011 - 19 Jun 2014 |
2nd Floor, 137 Victoria Street, Christchurch | Registered & physical | 23 May 2008 - 17 Jun 2011 |
2a Worthy St, Avonhead, Christchurch | Registered & physical | 06 Aug 2007 - 23 May 2008 |
Witty Smith Limited, First Floor, 149 Victoria Street, Christchurch | Physical & registered | 19 Jul 2005 - 06 Aug 2007 |
C/-witty & Smith, First Floor, 149 Victoria Street, Christchurch | Registered & physical | 28 Jul 2004 - 19 Jul 2005 |
C/-b D O Christchurch, Level 6, Clarendon Tower, 78 Worcester Street, Christchurch | Registered | 17 Apr 2000 - 28 Jul 2004 |
C/-b D O Hogg Young Cathie, Level 6, Clarendon Tower, 78 Worcester Street, Christchurch | Registered | 11 Apr 2000 - 17 Apr 2000 |
C/-b D O Hogg Young Cathie, Level 6, Clarendon Tower, 78 Worcester Street, Christchurch | Registered | 09 Jul 1998 - 11 Apr 2000 |
Polson Higgs & Co, Level 6, Clarendon Tower, 78 Worcester Street, Christchurch | Physical | 20 Jan 1997 - 28 Jul 2004 |
B D O Christchurch, Level 6, Clarendon Tower, 78 Worcester Street, Christchurch | Physical | 20 Jan 1997 - 20 Jan 1997 |
C/-b D O Hogg Young Cathie, Level 6, Clarendon Tower, 78 Worcester Street, Christchurch | Physical | 20 Jan 1997 - 20 Jan 1997 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Anderson, Maureen Therese Individual |
Ilam Christchurch 8041 |
17 Jan 1997 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Anderson, Brian Individual |
Ilam Christchurch 8041 |
17 Jan 1997 - 21 Jul 2004 |
Tim Ford Automotive Limited 7 Goulding Avenue |
|
Double Parkin Limited 7 Goulding Avenue |
|
Hornby Barbers Limited 9 Goulding Avenue |
|
Blarney Investments Limited Hornby Business And Tax Centre |
|
Paint Lab Limited 15 Goulding Avenue |
|
Parallel 9 Limited Shop 86, The Hub, 402-414, Main South Road, Hornby |
Pinnacle Masonry Limited 61 Victors Road |
Barron Masonry Limited 2 Brockham St |
Stoneface Limited 14 Gerald Street |
Dunns Stone Masonry Limited 47 Ashley Street |
Brad Karton Stone Masonry Limited Level 1 |
A F D Stonemasonry Limited 12 Loach Road |