Fairhaven Industries Limited (issued a business number of 9429038095627) was started on 15 May 1997. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 9 Strawbridge Square, Stoke, Nelson, 7011 (type: registered, physical). 10 Ardilea Avenue, Stoke, Nelson had been their registered address, up to 13 Aug 2018. 200 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 100 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Robinson, Steven Robert (an individual) located at Richmond, Richmond postcode 7020. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (exactly 100 shares); it includes
Miller, Heather Ruth (an individual) - located at Richmond, Richmond. "Internet retailing" (business classification G431050) is the classification the ABS issued to Fairhaven Industries Limited. Our data was updated on 04 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
9 Strawbridge Square, Stoke, Nelson, 7011 | Service & physical | 11 Aug 2017 |
9 Strawbridge Square, Stoke, Nelson, 7011 | Registered | 13 Aug 2018 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Steven Robert Robinson
Richmond, Richmond, 7020
Address used since 02 Aug 2022
Stoke, Nelson, 7011
Address used since 01 Aug 2014
Stoke, Nelson, 7011
Address used since 03 Aug 2018 |
Director | 15 May 1997 - current |
Heather Ruth Miller
Richmond, Richmond, 7020
Address used since 02 Aug 2022
Stoke, Nelson, 7011
Address used since 03 Aug 2018
Stoke, Nelson, 7011
Address used since 01 Aug 2014 |
Director | 15 May 1997 - current |
9 Strawbridge Square , Stoke , Nelson , 7011 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
10 Ardilea Avenue, Stoke, Nelson, 7011 | Registered | 11 Aug 2014 - 13 Aug 2018 |
10 Ardilea Avenue, Stoke, Nelson, 7011 | Physical | 11 Aug 2014 - 11 Aug 2017 |
24b Tuckett Place, Nelson | Registered & physical | 19 Feb 2005 - 11 Aug 2014 |
95 Pascoe St, Nelson | Physical & registered | 01 Sep 2004 - 19 Feb 2005 |
Richards Woodhouse, 105 Trafalgar Street, Nelson | Registered & physical | 18 Apr 2004 - 01 Sep 2004 |
9 Buxton Square, Nelson | Registered | 11 Apr 2000 - 18 Apr 2004 |
9 Buxton Square, Nelson | Physical | 16 May 1997 - 18 Apr 2004 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Robinson, Steven Robert Individual |
Richmond Richmond 7020 |
15 May 1997 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Miller, Heather Ruth Individual |
Richmond Richmond 7020 |
15 May 1997 - current |
Living Wisdom Limited 8 Ardilea Avenue |
|
Living Wisdom Trust Board 8 Ardilea Avenue |
|
Tasman Education Trust C/o Mr A B Mclean |
|
Wilsfield Holdings Limited 2 Ardilea Avenue |
|
Vision New Zealand Limited 22 Woodstock Place |
|
New Zealand Dairy Dessert Company Limited 26a Mcmahon Street |
Quartermaster Supplies (nz) Limited 415 Suffolk Road |
Bat Country Clothing Limited 14 Aldinga Avenue |
Eamazing007 Limited 411b Main Road Stoke |
Millymac Supplies Limited 62 Arapiki Road |
Mr G Group Limited 29a Martin Street |
Team Kiwiscot Limited 30 Park Drive |