Clarkson Electrical Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429038088490) was launched on 15 May 1997. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 22 Catherine Street, Henderson, Auckland, 0612 (type: physical, service). Uhy Haines Norton (Auckland) Ltd, 22 Catherine Street, Henderson, Auckland 0650 had been their registered address, until 01 Sep 2010. 100 shares are allocated to 5 shareholders who belong to 4 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 34 shares (34% of shares), namely:
Bbw Trustees Limited (an entity) located at Henderson, Auckland postcode 0612. When considering the second group, a total of 2 shareholders hold 28% of all shares (exactly 28 shares); it includes
Clarkson, Jade Victoria (an individual) - located at Greenhithe, Auckland,
Clarkson, David Terence (an individual) - located at Greenhithe, Auckland. Next there is the third group of shareholders, share allotment (1 share, 1%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Clarkson, Jade Victoria, located at Greenhithe, Auckland (an individual). Our data was updated on 09 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
22 Catherine Street, Henderson, Auckland, 0612 | Physical & service & registered | 01 Sep 2010 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Terence Mark Clarkson
Orewa, Auckland, 0931
Address used since 24 Aug 2010 |
Director | 15 May 1997 - current |
David Terence Clarkson
Greenhithe, Auckland, 0632
Address used since 01 Mar 2018 |
Director | 01 Mar 2018 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Uhy Haines Norton (auckland) Ltd, 22 Catherine Street, Henderson, Auckland 0650 | Registered & physical | 21 May 2009 - 01 Sep 2010 |
Brownlee & Co, Chartered Accountants, 23 Lincoln Road, Henderson Auckland | Physical | 01 Jul 2000 - 01 Jul 2000 |
15-17 Edsel St, Henderson | Physical | 01 Jul 2000 - 21 May 2009 |
Brownlee & Co, Chartered Accountants, 23 Lincoln Road, Henderson Auckland | Registered | 01 Jul 2000 - 21 May 2009 |
Brownlee & Co, Chartered Accountants, 23 Lincoln Road, Henderson Auckland | Registered | 11 Apr 2000 - 01 Jul 2000 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Bbw Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038047930 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Henderson Auckland 0612 |
14 Jul 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Clarkson, Jade Victoria Individual |
Greenhithe Auckland 0632 |
23 Apr 2018 - current |
Clarkson, David Terence Individual |
Greenhithe Auckland 0632 |
23 Apr 2018 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Clarkson, Jade Victoria Individual |
Greenhithe Auckland 0632 |
23 Apr 2018 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Clarkson, David Terence Individual |
Greenhithe Auckland 0632 |
23 Apr 2018 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Clarkson, Terence Mark Individual |
Orewa Auckland 0931 |
15 May 1997 - 06 May 2019 |
Clarkson, Terence Mark Individual |
Orewa Auckland 0931 |
15 May 1997 - 06 May 2019 |
Clarkson, Terence Mark Individual |
Orewa Auckland 0931 |
15 May 1997 - 06 May 2019 |
Clarkson, Irene Frances Individual |
Orewa Auckland 0931 |
15 May 1997 - 06 May 2019 |
Clarkson, Irene Frances Individual |
Orewa Auckland 0931 |
15 May 1997 - 06 May 2019 |
Clarkson, Terence Mark Individual |
Orewa Auckland 0931 |
15 May 1997 - 06 May 2019 |
Clarkson, Terence Mark Individual |
Orewa Auckland 0931 |
15 May 1997 - 06 May 2019 |
Clarkson, Irene Frances Individual |
Orewa Auckland 0931 |
15 May 1997 - 06 May 2019 |
Clarkson, Irene Frances Individual |
Orewa Auckland 0931 |
15 May 1997 - 06 May 2019 |
Bbw Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038047930 Company Number: 865155 Entity |
22 Catherine Street Henderson, Auckland 0612 |
21 Dec 2004 - 06 May 2019 |
Bbw Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038047930 Company Number: 865155 Entity |
22 Catherine Street Henderson, Auckland 0612 |
21 Dec 2004 - 06 May 2019 |
Clarkson, Terence Mark Individual |
Orewa Auckland 0931 |
15 May 1997 - 06 May 2019 |
Clarkson, Terence Mark Individual |
Orewa Auckland 0931 |
15 May 1997 - 06 May 2019 |
Clarkson, Irene Frances Individual |
Orewa Auckland 0931 |
15 May 1997 - 06 May 2019 |
Clarkson, Irene Frances Individual |
Orewa Auckland 0931 |
15 May 1997 - 06 May 2019 |
Bbw Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038047930 Company Number: 865155 Entity |
22 Catherine Street Henderson, Auckland 0612 |
21 Dec 2004 - 06 May 2019 |
Clarkson, Terence Mark Individual |
Orewa Auckland 0931 |
15 May 1997 - 06 May 2019 |
Bbw Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038047930 Company Number: 865155 Entity |
22 Catherine Street Henderson, Auckland 0612 |
21 Dec 2004 - 06 May 2019 |
Tm Clarkson Trust Other |
Orewa Orewa 0931 |
06 May 2019 - 14 Jul 2020 |
If Clarkson Trust Other |
Orewa Orewa 0931 |
06 May 2019 - 14 Jul 2020 |
David & Jade Clarkson Trust Other |
Greenhithe Auckland 0632 |
06 May 2019 - 14 Jul 2020 |
Clarkson, Irene Frances Individual |
Orewa Auckland 0931 |
15 May 1997 - 06 May 2019 |
Bbw Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038047930 Company Number: 865155 Entity |
22 Catherine Street Henderson, Auckland 0612 |
21 Dec 2004 - 06 May 2019 |
Bbw Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038047930 Company Number: 865155 Entity |
22 Catherine Street Henderson, Auckland 0612 |
21 Dec 2004 - 06 May 2019 |
Clarkson, Irene Frances Individual |
Orewa Auckland 0931 |
15 May 1997 - 06 May 2019 |
Clarkson, Terence Mark Individual |
Orewa Auckland 0931 |
15 May 1997 - 06 May 2019 |
Clarkson, Terence Mark Individual |
Orewa Auckland 0931 |
15 May 1997 - 06 May 2019 |
Bbw Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038047930 Company Number: 865155 Entity |
22 Catherine Street Henderson, Auckland 0612 |
21 Dec 2004 - 06 May 2019 |
Clarkson, Irene Frances Individual |
Orewa Auckland 0931 |
15 May 1997 - 06 May 2019 |
Clarkson, Irene Frances Individual |
Orewa Auckland 0931 |
15 May 1997 - 06 May 2019 |
Norwest Wholesale Limited 22 Catherine Street |
|
West City Motor Sport Limited 22 Catherine Street |
|
Riddell Developments Limited 22 Catherine Street |
|
Railedge Developments Limited 22 Catherine Street |
|
Howe Singh Investments Limited 22 Catherine Street |
|
On2it Builders Limited 22 Catherine Street |