Leaders Commercial Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429037994846) was started on 17 Oct 1997. 4 addresses are currently in use by the company: Level 1, 77 Thorndon Quay, Pipitea, Wellington, 6011 (type: registered, service). Level 1, Findex House, 57 Willis Street, Wellington had been their registered address, until 14 Feb 2020. Leaders Commercial Limited used other aliases, namely: Auto Express Limited from 17 Oct 1997 to 16 Oct 2013. 120000 shares are allotted to 18 shareholders who belong to 8 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 4 entities and holds 6039 shares (5.03% of shares), namely:
Cramond, Geoffrey (an individual) located at Seatoun, Wellington postcode 6022,
Charles, Leigh (an individual) located at Seatoun, Wellington postcode 6022,
Cramond, Anthony (an individual) located at Seatoun, Wellington postcode 6022. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 57.84% of all shares (69407 shares); it includes
Property Shop Limited (an entity) - located at Pipitea, Wellington. Next there is the third group of shareholders, share allotment (4646 shares, 3.87%) belongs to 3 entities, namely:
Platt, David, located at Khandallah, Wellington (an individual),
Staines, Carlene, located at Khandallah, Wellington (an individual),
Platt, Stephen, located at Plimmerton, Porirua (an individual). Businesscheck's information was last updated on 30 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 1, Findex House, 57 Willis Street, Wellington, 6011 | Physical & registered & service | 14 Feb 2020 |
Level 1, 77 Thorndon Quay, Pipitea, Wellington, 6011 | Registered & service | 14 Aug 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Robert Graham Garlick
Thorndon, Wellington, 6011
Address used since 05 Jul 2016 |
Director | 17 Oct 1997 - current |
Marie Anne Baker
Khandallah, Wellington, 6035
Address used since 11 Mar 2020 |
Director | 11 Mar 2020 - current |
Peter Te Rangi Scott
Ngaio, Wellington, 6035
Address used since 11 Mar 2020 |
Director | 11 Mar 2020 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 1, Findex House, 57 Willis Street, Wellington, 6011 | Registered & physical | 24 May 2019 - 14 Feb 2020 |
Level 1, Crowe Horwath House, 57 Willis Street, Wellington, 6011 | Registered & physical | 06 May 2019 - 24 May 2019 |
Level 1, Crowe Horwath House, 57 Willis Street, Wellington, 6011 | Registered & physical | 02 Mar 2018 - 06 May 2019 |
Level 6 Westfield Tower, 45 Knights Road, Lower Hutt | Physical & registered | 25 Feb 2010 - 02 Mar 2018 |
Whk Sherwin Chan & Walshe, Level 6, Westfield Tower, 45 Knights Road, Lower Hutt | Registered & physical | 21 Feb 2008 - 25 Feb 2010 |
C/-sherwin Chan & Walshe, Chartered Accountants, Level 6, Transalta Building, Lower Hutt | Registered | 11 Apr 2000 - 21 Feb 2008 |
C/-sherwin Chan & Walshe, Chartered Accountants, Level 6, Transalta Building, Lower Hutt | Physical | 20 Oct 1997 - 21 Feb 2008 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Cramond, Geoffrey Individual |
Seatoun Wellington 6022 |
19 Mar 2020 - current |
Charles, Leigh Individual |
Seatoun Wellington 6022 |
19 Mar 2020 - current |
Cramond, Anthony Individual |
Seatoun Wellington 6022 |
19 Mar 2020 - current |
Independent Trust Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038181900 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Lower Hutt 5010 |
19 Mar 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Property Shop Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429040753362 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Pipitea Wellington 6011 |
19 Mar 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Platt, David Individual |
Khandallah Wellington 6035 |
19 Mar 2020 - current |
Staines, Carlene Individual |
Khandallah Wellington 6035 |
19 Mar 2020 - current |
Platt, Stephen Individual |
Plimmerton Porirua 5026 |
19 Mar 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Warren, Geoffrey Robert Individual |
Paparangi Wellington 6037 |
19 Mar 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Scott, Michele Margaret Individual |
Ngaio Wellington 6035 |
19 Mar 2020 - current |
Scott, Peter Te Rangi Director |
Ngaio Wellington 6035 |
19 Mar 2020 - current |
Gemmell, Ashley John Individual |
Ngaio Wellington 6035 |
19 Mar 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Aspell, Everard Joseph Individual |
Oriental Bay Wellington 6011 |
19 Mar 2020 - current |
Dentice, Paul Trevor Individual |
Oriental Bay Wellington 6011 |
19 Mar 2020 - current |
Aspell, Antonella Therese Individual |
Oriental Bay Wellington 6011 |
19 Mar 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Baker, Marie Anne Director |
Khandallah Wellington 6035 |
19 Mar 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Reeve, Catherine Elizabeth Individual |
Seatoun Wellington 6022 |
19 Mar 2020 - current |
Reeve, Nicholas Liam Denis Individual |
Seatoun Wellington 6022 |
19 Mar 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Scott, Michelle Margaret Individual |
Ngaio Wellington 6035 |
19 Mar 2020 - 19 Mar 2020 |
Garlick, Robert Graham Individual |
Thorndon Wellington 6011 |
17 Oct 1997 - 19 Mar 2020 |
Mcauley Finance Limited Level 4, Willbank House |
|
Beco Builders & Contractors Limited Level 4, Willbank House |
|
Abby Builders Limited Level 4, Willbank House |
|
Lausanne Office Services Limited Level 4, Willbank House |
|
Active Communications Limited Level 4, Willbank House |
|
Hania Street Limited Level 4, Willbank House |