Rhoda Morrison Limited (NZBN 9429037887155) was incorporated on 18 Mar 1998. 5 addresess are currently in use by the company: 229 Metcalfe Road, R D 1, Matakohe, 0593 (type: postal, office). Withers & Co, Chartered Accountants, 23 Neville Street, Warkworth had been their registered address, until 25 Feb 2010. 1000 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 1000 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Morrison, Rhoda Jean (an individual) located at Rd 1, Matakohe. The Businesscheck database was updated on 06 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
229 Metcalfe Road, Rd 1, Matakohe, 0593 | Registered & physical & service | 25 Feb 2010 |
229 Metcalfe Road, R D 1, Matakohe, 0593 | Postal | 04 Mar 2020 |
229 Metcalfe Rd, Matakohe, 0593 | Office | 04 Mar 2020 |
229 Metcalfe Road, Matakohe, Matakohe, 0593 | Delivery | 04 Mar 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Rhoda Jean Morrison
Rd 1, Matakohe, 0593
Address used since 01 Apr 2008 |
Director | 19 Mar 1998 - current |
Richard Thomas Salisbury
Matangi, Hamilton,
Address used since 18 Mar 1998 |
Director | 18 Mar 1998 - 19 Mar 1998 |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
229 Metcalfe Road, Matakohe, Matakohe, 0593 | Delivery | 04 Mar 2020 |
229 Metcalfe Rd , Matakohe , 0593 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Withers & Co, Chartered Accountants, 23 Neville Street, Warkworth | Registered | 12 Apr 2000 - 25 Feb 2010 |
Withers & Co, Chartered Accountants, 23 Neville Street, Warkworth | Physical | 19 Mar 1998 - 25 Feb 2010 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Morrison, Rhoda Jean Individual |
Rd 1 Matakohe |
18 Mar 1998 - current |
Pookin & Gumdigger Limited 229 Metcalfe Road |
|
Vision North Limited 229 Metcalfe Rd |
|
NZ Farmstead Limited 240 Metcalfe Road |
|
Edlin Marine Limited 213 Metcalfe Road |
|
Village Boatworks Limited 29 Matakohe Wharf Road |
|
Calibre Plastics Limited 37 Manurere Rise |