Forex Limited (NZBN 9429037884598) was started on 26 Mar 1998. 4 addresses are in use by the company: P O Box 692, Wellington, 6140 (type: postal, delivery). Level 9, Terenco Finance House, 86 Victoria Street, Wellington had been their registered address, until 30 Sep 2010. 100 shares are allocated to 3 shareholders who belong to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 3 entities and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Walsh, Stephen David (an individual) located at Newlands, Wellington postcode 6037,
Poppe, Philip John (an individual) located at Paekakariki Hill Road, Porirua postcode 5381,
Poppe, Helen Anne (an individual) located at Paekakariki Hill Road, Porirua postcode 5381. The Businesscheck data was last updated on 30 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 9, 86 Victoria Street, Wellington Central, Wellington, 6011 | Physical & service | 30 Sep 2010 |
Level 9, 86 Victoria Street, Wellington Central, 6011 | Registered | 30 Sep 2010 |
P O Box 692, Wellington, 6140 | Postal | 05 Sep 2019 |
Level 9, 86 Victoria Street, Wellington Central, 6011 | Delivery | 05 Sep 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Philip John Poppe
Paekakariki Hill, Porirua, 5381
Address used since 30 Sep 2015 |
Director | 26 Mar 1998 - current |
Patrick Francis Gilligan
Havelock North, Havelock North, 4130
Address used since 01 Feb 2022
Hataitai, Wellington, 6021
Address used since 18 Jan 2010 |
Director | 21 Jan 2009 - 02 Aug 2022 |
Timothy Ian Coney
Oriental Bay, Wellington,
Address used since 26 Mar 1998 |
Director | 26 Mar 1998 - 02 Aug 2001 |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
Level 9, 86 Victoria Street, Wellington Central, 6011 | Delivery | 05 Sep 2019 |
Level 9, 86 Victoria Street , Wellington , 6011 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 9, Terenco Finance House, 86 Victoria Street, Wellington | Registered & physical | 29 Aug 2003 - 30 Sep 2010 |
Level 9 10 Brandon Street, Wellington | Registered | 12 Apr 2000 - 29 Aug 2003 |
Level 9 10 Brandon Street, Wellington | Physical | 16 Jul 1999 - 16 Jul 1999 |
6th Floor Todd Tower, 36 Brandon Street, Wellington | Physical | 16 Jul 1999 - 29 Aug 2003 |
Level 9 10 Brandon Street, Wellington | Registered | 16 Jul 1999 - 12 Apr 2000 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Walsh, Stephen David Individual |
Newlands Wellington 6037 |
28 Apr 2009 - current |
Poppe, Philip John Individual |
Paekakariki Hill Road Porirua 5381 |
28 Apr 2009 - current |
Poppe, Helen Anne Individual |
Paekakariki Hill Road Porirua 5381 |
28 Apr 2009 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Greig, Simon Neil Ross Director |
Island Bay Wellington 6023 |
27 Mar 2012 - 12 Aug 2022 |
Apatu, Paul Kenneth Individual |
Rd 2 Havelock North 4172 |
28 Apr 2009 - 12 Aug 2022 |
Gilligan, Patrick Francis Individual |
Havelock North Havelock North 4130 |
28 Apr 2009 - 12 Aug 2022 |
Gilligan, Justine Maria Individual |
Havelock North Havelock North 4130 |
28 Apr 2009 - 12 Aug 2022 |
Null - Pf & Jm Gilligan Family Trust Other |
16 Aug 2005 - 01 Aug 2006 | |
Null - Poppe Family Trust Other |
26 Mar 1998 - 28 Apr 2009 | |
Pf & Jm Gilligan Family Trust Other |
16 Aug 2005 - 01 Aug 2006 | |
Poppe Family Trust Other |
26 Mar 1998 - 28 Apr 2009 | |
Poppe, Philip John Individual |
Pauatahanui Wellington |
26 Mar 1998 - 16 Aug 2005 |
Pooja Foods Limited Level 1, 50 Customhouse Quay |
|
M G Bale Trustees (hill 16) Limited Level 7, 234 Wakefield Street |
|
Sounds Lifestyle Investments Limited Level 7, 234 Wakefield Street |
|
Customs Agents Wellington Limited Level 1, 50 Customhouse Quay |
|
Ppem Nominees Limited Level 14, 1-3 Willeston Street |
|
Glading Family Trustees Limited Level 10, Greenock House, 39 The Terrace |