Bays Health Centre Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429037845995) was launched on 02 Jun 1998. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 1 Ihumata Road, Milford, Auckland, 0620 (type: physical, registered). 1 Ihumata Road, Milford, Auckland had been their physical address, up until 16 Apr 2020. 1000 shares are allocated to 0 shareholders who belong to 0 shareholder groups. Businesscheck's data was last updated on 09 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
1 Ihumata Road, Milford, Auckland, 0620 | Physical & registered & service | 16 Apr 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Pramod Giri
Waiake, Auckland, 0630
Address used since 05 Sep 2023
Waiake, North Shore City, 0630
Address used since 11 Sep 2009 |
Director | 02 Jun 1998 - current |
Ranjula Giri
Waiake, North Shore City, 0630
Address used since 11 Sep 2009 |
Director | 02 Jun 1998 - 28 Sep 2020 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
1 Ihumata Road, Milford, Auckland, 0620 | Physical & registered | 26 Nov 2019 - 16 Apr 2020 |
145 Kitchener Road, Milford, Auckland, 0620 | Registered & physical | 24 Sep 2010 - 26 Nov 2019 |
C/-hall & Parsons Ca Ltd, Chartered, Accountants, 145 Kitchener Rd, Milford, North Shore City 0620 | Physical & registered | 18 Sep 2009 - 24 Sep 2010 |
C/-hall & Parsons Ca Ltd, Chartered Accountants, 145 Kitchener Road, Milford | Registered & physical | 20 Sep 2006 - 18 Sep 2009 |
C/- Alan Hall Ca Ltd, Chartered Accountants, 145 Kitchener Road, Milford | Physical & registered | 14 Apr 2005 - 20 Sep 2006 |
C/-alan R Hall, Chartered Accountants, 221 Shakespeare Road, Takapuna 9 | Registered | 12 Apr 2000 - 14 Apr 2005 |
C/-alan R Hall, Chartered Accountants, 221 Shakespeare Road, Takapuna 9 | Physical | 03 Jun 1998 - 14 Apr 2005 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Giri, Pramod Individual |
Browns Bay North Shore City 0630 0630 |
02 Jun 1998 - 25 May 2021 |
Giri, Ranjula Individual |
Browns Bay North Shore City 0630 |
02 Jun 1998 - 25 May 2021 |
Lord, Christopher Norman Individual |
Mt Eden Auckland 1024 |
02 Jun 1998 - 25 May 2021 |
Giri, Ranjula Individual |
Browns Bay North Shore City 0630 |
02 Jun 1998 - 25 May 2021 |
Giri, Pramod Individual |
Browns Bay North Shore City 0630 |
02 Jun 1998 - 25 May 2021 |
Giri, Pramod Individual |
Browns Bay North Shore City 0630 |
02 Jun 1998 - 25 May 2021 |
Magebinary Limited 11/145 Kitchener Rd |
|
Urgent Care Limited 145 Kitchener Road |
|
North Shore Orthopaedic Surgeons Limited 145 Kitchener Road |
|
Kmu Surveys Limited 145 Kitchener Road |
|
Whale Pumps Limited 145 Kitchener Road |
|
Esuwaai Living Water Limited 145 Kitchener Road |