Papakura Joinery Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429037841782) was incorporated on 18 May 1998. 2 addresses are in use by the company: Level 2, 1 Wesley Street, Pukekohe, 2120 (type: physical, service). 116 Great South Road, Papakura had been their physical address, up until 02 Aug 2022. 1000 shares are issued to 8 shareholders who belong to 4 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 1 share (0.1% of shares), namely:
Haszard, Glenn Anthony (an individual) located at Pukekohe, Pukekohe postcode 2120. When considering the second group, a total of 3 shareholders hold 49.9% of all shares (499 shares); it includes
Frith, Shevaun (an individual) - located at Pukekohe, Pukekohe,
Haszard, Kharyn Jocelyn (an individual) - located at Pukekohe, Pukekohe,
Haszard, Glenn Anthony (an individual) - located at Pukekohe, Pukekohe. The 3rd group of shareholders, share allotment (499 shares, 49.9%) belongs to 3 entities, namely:
Sla Trustees Limited, located at Pukekohe, Pukekohe (an entity),
Haszard, Glenn Anthony, located at Pukekohe, Pukekohe (an individual),
Camilleri, Dianne Mary, located at Cockle Bay, Auckland (an individual). Our database was last updated on 01 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 2, 1 Wesley Street, Pukekohe, 2120 | Physical & service & registered | 02 Aug 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Glenn Anthony Haszard
Pukekohe, Pukekohe, 2120
Address used since 13 Dec 2012 |
Director | 26 Mar 2008 - current |
David Paul Burnside
Rd 2, Papakura, 2582
Address used since 12 May 2015 |
Director | 18 May 1998 - 31 Mar 2016 |
Brian John Burnside
Papakura,
Address used since 18 May 1998 |
Director | 18 May 1998 - 03 Oct 2005 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
116 Great South Road, Papakura, 2110 | Physical & registered | 20 Dec 2019 - 02 Aug 2022 |
16 Elliott Street, Papakura | Registered | 15 May 2000 - 20 Dec 2019 |
16 Elliott Street, Papakura, Auckland | Physical | 15 May 2000 - 15 May 2000 |
C/- Keugler & Associates Limited, Chartered Accountants, Unit A 181 Gt South Road, Takanini | Registered & physical | 28 Apr 2000 - 15 May 2000 |
320 Great South Road, Papakura | Registered | 12 Apr 2000 - 28 Apr 2000 |
320 Great South Road, Papakura | Registered | 02 Aug 1999 - 12 Apr 2000 |
320 Great South Road, Papakura | Physical | 02 Aug 1999 - 28 Apr 2000 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Haszard, Glenn Anthony Individual |
Pukekohe Pukekohe 2120 |
30 Sep 2008 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Frith, Shevaun Individual |
Pukekohe Pukekohe 2120 |
30 Sep 2008 - current |
Haszard, Kharyn Jocelyn Individual |
Pukekohe Pukekohe 2120 |
30 Sep 2008 - current |
Haszard, Glenn Anthony Individual |
Pukekohe Pukekohe 2120 |
30 Sep 2008 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Sla Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035524038 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Pukekohe Pukekohe 2120 |
30 Sep 2008 - current |
Haszard, Glenn Anthony Individual |
Pukekohe Pukekohe 2120 |
30 Sep 2008 - current |
Camilleri, Dianne Mary Individual |
Cockle Bay Auckland 2014 |
10 May 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Camilleri, Dianne Mary Individual |
Cockle Bay Auckland 2014 |
10 May 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Sla Trustees (2013) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030366879 Company Number: 4250158 Entity |
12 Mar 2013 - 23 Mar 2016 | |
Burnside, Sheryl Margaret Individual |
Papakura |
18 May 1998 - 23 Mar 2016 |
Lay, Gregory Mark Individual |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
18 May 1998 - 12 Mar 2013 |
Burnside, David Paul Individual |
Papakura |
18 May 1998 - 23 Mar 2016 |
Burnside, David Arthur Individual |
Ardmore |
18 May 1998 - 25 Mar 2015 |
Burnside, Brian John Individual |
Papakura |
18 May 1998 - 27 Oct 2005 |
Temm, Stephen Individual |
Papakura |
18 May 1998 - 30 May 2005 |
Inder Lynch Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035709374 Company Number: 1425959 Entity |
20 May 2008 - 25 Mar 2015 | |
Camilleri, Joseph Individual |
Botany Downs |
30 Sep 2008 - 16 May 2014 |
Camilleri, Dianne Individual |
Botany Downs |
30 Sep 2008 - 10 May 2016 |
Sla Trustees (2013) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030366879 Company Number: 4250158 Entity |
12 Mar 2013 - 23 Mar 2016 | |
Inder Lynch Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035709374 Company Number: 1425959 Entity |
20 May 2008 - 25 Mar 2015 | |
Sla Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035524038 Company Number: 1485681 Entity |
20 May 2008 - 25 Mar 2015 | |
Burnside, Laurel Jane Individual |
Papakura |
18 May 1998 - 30 May 2005 |
Sla Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035524038 Company Number: 1485681 Entity |
20 May 2008 - 25 Mar 2015 |
Rosie Enterprises Limited 16 Elliott Street |
|
Moontan Properties Limited 16 Elliott Street |
|
Insane Investments Limited 16 Elliott Street |
|
Kid's Klub New Zealand Limited 16 Elliot Street |
|
Dynamic Market Systems Limited Suite 1, 16 Elliot Street |
|
White Star Products Limited Partnership Skipper Lay & Associates |