Thornton Orchard Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429037765941) was launched on 10 Sep 1998. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 26 Hikurangi Street, Whakatane, Whakatane, 3120 (type: registered, service). C/- Tait Fleming Limited, Chartered Accountants, 29 Elliot St, Opotiki 3092 had been their registered address, up to 23 Oct 2001. 140 shares are issued to 13 shareholders who belong to 7 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 2 entities and holds 6 shares (4.29% of shares), namely:
Holland Beckett Trustee No.12 Limited (an entity) located at Tauranga postcode 3110,
Stewart, Caroline Mary Bartlett (an individual) located at Whakatane, Whakatane postcode 3120. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 3 shareholders hold 6.43% of all shares (exactly 9 shares); it includes
Atmore, Graeme Kenneth (an individual) - located at Ohope, Ohope,
Hamertons Trustee Services Limited (an entity) - located at Whakatane, Whakatane,
Atmore, Robert Graeme (an individual) - located at Ohope, Ohope. Next there is the 3rd group of shareholders, share allocation (5 shares, 3.57%) belongs to 3 entities, namely:
Atmore, Graeme Kenneth, located at Ohope, Ohope (an individual),
Hamertons Trustee Services Limited, located at Whakatane, Whakatane (an entity),
Atmore, Edith Winifred, located at Ohope, Ohope (an individual). The Businesscheck information was updated on 19 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
29 Elliot Street, Opotiki, 3092 | Physical | 23 Oct 2001 |
26 Hikurangi Street, Whakatane, Whakatane, 3120 | Registered & service | 18 Mar 2024 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Donald Ross Murray
R D 2, Opotiki, 3199
Address used since 01 Mar 2016
Whakatane, Whakatane, 3120
Address used since 19 Dec 2017 |
Director | 10 Sep 1998 - current |
Joseph Ririwhenua Williams
Opotiki, Opotiki, 3122
Address used since 01 Mar 2016 |
Director | 10 Sep 1998 - current |
Sandra Murrell
Rd 2, Opotiki, 3198
Address used since 18 Jun 2014 |
Director | 18 Jun 2014 - current |
Luke Andrew Stewart
Otumoetai, Tauranga, 3110
Address used since 10 Jun 2015 |
Director | 10 Jun 2015 - current |
Ian Mark Coventry
Ohope, Ohope, 3121
Address used since 31 Aug 2015 |
Director | 31 Aug 2015 - 03 May 2021 |
Craig Murray Thompson
Rd 2, Opotiki, 3198
Address used since 14 Feb 2013 |
Director | 30 Oct 2008 - 31 Aug 2015 |
Robert Graeme Atmore
Ohope,
Address used since 01 Oct 2010 |
Director | 10 Sep 1998 - 10 Jun 2015 |
Kenneth Richard Murrell
R D 2, Opotiki,
Address used since 10 Sep 1998 |
Director | 10 Sep 1998 - 19 Feb 2014 |
David John Emslie
R D 1, Opotiki,
Address used since 10 Sep 1998 |
Director | 10 Sep 1998 - 30 Oct 2008 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
C/- Tait Fleming Limited, Chartered Accountants, 29 Elliot St, Opotiki 3092 | Registered & physical | 23 Oct 2001 - 23 Oct 2001 |
29 Elliot Street, Opotiki, 3092 | Registered & service | 23 Oct 2001 - 18 Mar 2024 |
C/- Tait Fleming, Chartered Accountants, 29 Elliot St, Opotiki 3092 | Registered | 31 Oct 2000 - 23 Oct 2001 |
Opotiki Packing & Coolstorage Ltd, Factory Road, Opotiki | Registered | 12 Apr 2000 - 31 Oct 2000 |
Tait Fleming, Chartered Accountants, 128 Church Street, Opotiki | Registered | 10 Mar 1999 - 12 Apr 2000 |
C/- Tait Fleming, Chartered Accountants, 29 Elliot St, Opotiki 3092 | Physical | 10 Mar 1999 - 23 Oct 2001 |
C/- Opotiki Packing & Coolstorage Ltd, Factory Road, Opotiki | Physical | 10 Mar 1999 - 10 Mar 1999 |
Opotiki Packing & Coolstorage Ltd, Factory Road, Opotiki | Registered | 30 Nov 1998 - 10 Mar 1999 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Holland Beckett Trustee No.12 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030796324 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Tauranga 3110 |
10 Jul 2015 - current |
Stewart, Caroline Mary Bartlett Individual |
Whakatane Whakatane 3120 |
10 Jul 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Atmore, Graeme Kenneth Individual |
Ohope Ohope 3121 |
10 Jul 2015 - current |
Hamertons Trustee Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038282553 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Whakatane Whakatane 3120 |
10 Jul 2015 - current |
Atmore, Robert Graeme Individual |
Ohope Ohope 3121 |
10 Jul 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Atmore, Graeme Kenneth Individual |
Ohope Ohope 3121 |
10 Jul 2015 - current |
Hamertons Trustee Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038282553 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Whakatane Whakatane 3120 |
10 Jul 2015 - current |
Atmore, Edith Winifred Individual |
Ohope Ohope 3121 |
10 Jul 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Williams, Joseph Ririwhenua Individual |
Opotiki |
10 Sep 1998 - current |
Williams, Julia Individual |
Opotiki |
10 Sep 1998 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Opac Properties Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038602702 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Rd1 Opotiki 3197 |
11 Nov 2008 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Murrell, Sandra Individual |
R D 2 Opotiki |
10 Sep 1998 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Dr Murray, Kj Murray And Tait Fleming Trustees Limited Other (Other) |
R D 2 Opotiki 3198 |
10 Sep 1998 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Opotiki Packing And Cool Storage Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039506870 Company Number: 374655 Entity |
10 Sep 1998 - 18 Nov 2004 | |
Fraser Road Orchard Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037938475 Company Number: 889084 Entity |
10 Sep 1998 - 10 Jul 2015 | |
Fraser Road Orchard Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037938475 Company Number: 889084 Entity |
10 Sep 1998 - 10 Jul 2015 | |
Opotiki Packing And Cool Storage Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039506870 Company Number: 374655 Entity |
10 Sep 1998 - 18 Nov 2004 | |
Murrell, Kenneth Richard Individual |
R D 2 Opotiki |
10 Sep 1998 - 13 Feb 2015 |
Hiwinui Properties Limited Elliott House |
|
Basically Bush Limited Elliott House, 29 Elliott Street |
|
Twin Oaks Orchard Limited Elliott House |
|
White Island Orchards Limited Elliott House |
|
Pask Holdings Limited Elliott House |
|
Opotiki Fibre And Fleece Trust Carlesen Dodds Chartered Accoutants |